United States of America v. Jones et al
Trustee: Robert G. Drummond
Appellee: Levi L. Jones and Martha J. Jones
Appellant: United States of America
Case Number: 9:2019cv00194
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/20/2019. (NOS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America. (Watson, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT of Objection to Proof of Claim held on 8/29/19 before Judge Benjamin P. Hursh. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the clerk's office or the court reporter. NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact Court Reporter Rebecca Sabo, 406-855-6410, rebeccasabo2017@gmail.com. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the Court Reporters page of our website. Redaction Request due 1/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (RMS)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. (ASG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-60110. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Memorandum of Decision, #3 Order Appealed, #4 Election to DC, #5 Notice of Errata, #6 Notice of Referral, #7 Transmittal Memorandum) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Robert G. Drummond
Represented By: Robert G. Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Levi L. Jones
Represented By: Edward A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Martha J. Jones
Represented By: Edward A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Ryan S. Watson
Represented By: Kurt G. Alme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?