Morin v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Tracey Morin
Defendant: Janice Nielsen, Jerry Nielsen and John Does A, B, C
Case Number: 9:2019cv00206
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kent Dawson
2 Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Janice Nielsen, Jerry Nielsen. (Tranel, Paul)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Janice Nielsen, Jerry Nielsen. (Tranel, Paul)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Janice Nielsen, Jerry Nielsen. (Tranel, Paul)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Continue: Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Preliminary pretrial statements, joint discovery plan, and joint statement of stipulated facts on or before February 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 2/5/2020. (APP) Copy mailed to Morin Modified on 2/6/2020 to reflect changing the judge, regenerated NEF (APP).
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Paul N. Tranel appearing for Defendants Janice Nielsen, Jerry Nielsen Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Tranel, Paul)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/20/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/20/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/13/2020. (APP) Copy to Morin this date
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Mailing of Consent: Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Paul N. Tranel, Brandon R. Shannon and to Plaintiff Tracey Morin via USPS. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/24/2020. (APP)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Notice of Removal. Mailed to Morin with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2418681 (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Janice Nielsen, Jerry Nielsen from Montana Fourth Judicial District, Missoula County, case number V-32-2019-0000823. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/23/2019) (TAG). Modified on 12/23/2019 to correctly attach exhibit 1; NEF regenerated (TAG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morin v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Nielsen
Represented By: Paul N. Tranel
Represented By: Brandon R. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Nielsen
Represented By: Paul N. Tranel
Represented By: Brandon R. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A, B, C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?