Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Western Insurance Fire Protection Company
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Western States Fire Protection Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv00040
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Western States Fire Protection Company filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company in Missoula County District Court on February 21, 2020. (Attachments: #1 2 - Summons Issued) (File transmitted electronically from state court.) (NOS)
March 20, 2020 Intra-district Transfer to Missoula Division - new Missoula case number: 9:20-cv-40-M-DWM. (CDH)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - case was filed in the Butte Division of the District of Montana in error. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is transferred to the Missoula Division of the District of Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/20/2020. (CDH)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western Insurance Fire Protection Company Amended Notice of Removal from Fourth Judicial District, Missoula County, case number 20-243. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26OAQOJM), filed by Western Insurance Fire Protection Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B WSFP MT SOS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on March 27, 2020, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/19/2020. (HEG)
March 18, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2458948 (TAG) Modified on 3/19/2020 to correct receipt number(HEG).
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western Insurance Fire Protection Company from Montana Fourth Judicial District, Missoula County, case number DV-20-243. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Western Insurance Fire Protection Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Slavik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western States Fire Protection Company
Represented By: Michael J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?