Knudson v. Paws Up Ranch, LLC
Plaintiff: Traci L. Knudson
Defendant: Paws Up Ranch, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv00053
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paws Up Ranch, LLC. (Henkel, Eric)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Paws Up Ranch, LLC. (Henkel, Eric)
June 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Summons served on 5/29/2020; Paws Up Ranch, LLC answer due 6/19/2020. (NOS)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial, Summons served on Mindy Marcum, Paws Up Ranch on May 29, 2020, filed by Traci L. Knudson. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Hunt, James)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paws Up Ranch, LLC. Orgl emailed to counsel (APP)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/23/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/23/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/30/2020. (SMD)
April 29, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2475203. (ASG)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Traci L. Knudson. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knudson v. Paws Up Ranch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paws Up Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Eric Ryan Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci L. Knudson
Represented By: James G. Hunt
Represented By: Patrick T. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?