Ernst et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Larry A. Ernst and Maureen A. Ernst
Defendant: United States Forest Service and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 9:2020cv00064
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry A. Ernst. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit proof of service on US Attorney General, #2 Affidavit proof of service on US Attorney Montana) (McLean, Kris)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service Region 1. (Emailed to Plaintiffs' counsel.) (NOS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to United States Forest Service, re #1 Complaint (McLean, Kris)
May 12, 2020 Filing fee paid: $400; receipt number MTX9-15031. (NOS)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service, filed by Larry A. Ernst, Maureen A. Ernst. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (CDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernst et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry A. Ernst
Represented By: Kris McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen A. Ernst
Represented By: Kris McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?