Harvie et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Harvie and Joleen Harvie
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and United States Forest Service
Case Number: 9:2020cv00065
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joleen Harvie. United States Forest Service served on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) (McLean, Kris)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service Region 1. (Emailed to Plaintiffs' counsel.) (NOS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to United States Forest Service, re #1 Complaint (McLean, Kris)
May 12, 2020 Filing fee paid: $400; receipt number MTX9-15031. (NOS)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service filed by Ronnie Harvie, Joleen Harvie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvie et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Harvie
Represented By: Kris McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joleen Harvie
Represented By: Kris McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?