Marble v. Missoula County et al
Plaintiff: Cody Marble
Defendant: Michael Dominick, Missoula County Attorney's Office, Brad Giffin, Missoula County, Andrew Paul, Jennifer Clark, Dorothy Brownlow, Robert Taylor, Jeremy Meeder, Missoula County Sheriff's Office, John Does 1-5, Fred Van Valkenburg and Michael McMeekin
Case Number: 9:2020cv00089
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER (no document attached) re #2 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference and all associated deadlines are VACATED and will be reset by the Court at a later date. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/11/2020. (ASG)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Defendants' various motions to dismiss. Responses due 8/21/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/6/2020. (ASG)
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6), #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Ross Thomas Johnson appearing for Plaintiff Cody Marble (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Johnson, Ross)
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Daniel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Dorothy Brownlow, Jennifer Clark, Andrew Paul re #6 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6), #7 Brief/Memorandum in Support ( of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Raugust - Opinion and Order) (Dahle, Jared)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/9/2020. (ASG)
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6), #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Ross Thomas Johnson appearing for Plaintiff Cody Marble (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Johnson, Ross)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/30/2020. (ASG)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/26/2020. (APP)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fred Van Valkenburg. (Jones, Natasha)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Natasha Prinzing Jones appearing for Defendant Fred Van Valkenburg Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Jones, Natasha)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Dominick, Brad Giffin, Michael McMeekin, Jeremy Meeder, Robert Taylor. (Manning, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Michael P. Manning appearing for Defendants Michael Dominick, Brad Giffin, Michael McMeekin, Jeremy Meeder, Robert Taylor Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Manning, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by Dorothy Brownlow, Jennifer Clark, Andrew Paul. (Dahle, Jared)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) Jared S. Dahle appearing for Defendants Dorothy Brownlow, Jennifer Clark, Andrew Paul Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Dahle, Jared)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Missoula County, Missoula County Attorney's Office, Missoula County Sheriff's Office. (Carey, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT DOCS (APP)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cody Marble. (APP)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/18/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/18/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/18/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/19/2020. (TXB)
June 19, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2498133 (TAG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fred Van Valkenburg from Montana Fourth Judicial District, Missoula County, case number DV-19-14. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marble v. Missoula County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dominick
Represented By: Michael P. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missoula County Attorney's Office
Represented By: Steven S. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Giffin
Represented By: Michael P. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missoula County
Represented By: Steven S. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Paul
Represented By: Jared S. Dahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clark
Represented By: Jared S. Dahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Brownlow
Represented By: Jared S. Dahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Taylor
Represented By: Michael P. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Meeder
Represented By: Michael P. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missoula County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Steven S. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Van Valkenburg
Represented By: Tracey Neighbor Johnson
Represented By: William L. Crowley
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McMeekin
Represented By: Michael P. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Marble
Represented By: Gale R. Gustafson
Represented By: Ross Thomas Johnson
Represented By: Daniel T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?