Wildearth Guardians et al v. Skipwith et al
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Watch and Wilderness Workshop
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Aurelia Skipwith
Case Number: 9:2020cv00097
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Margaret Spatz on behalf of All Defendants (Spatz, Michelle)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 USFWS Summons and Certified Mail Receipts) (Mellgren, John)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. Aurelia Skipwith served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Skipwith Summons and Certified Mail Receipts) (Mellgren, John)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop re #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mellgren, John) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney John R. Mellgren for Wildearth Guardians and Wilderness Workshop. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/6/2020. (ASG) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS).
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION John R. Mellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2504737.) Sarah K. McMillan appearing for Plaintiffs Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 declaration re: PHV) (McMillan, Sarah) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aurelia Skipwith, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Originals mailed to counsel for plaintiffs (TAG)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (TAG) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS)
July 1, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2504592 (TAG)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Modified to correct plaintiffs.) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildearth Guardians et al v. Skipwith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Sarah K. McMillan
Represented By: John R. Mellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Watch
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Sarah K. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Sarah K. McMillan
Represented By: John R. Mellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Michelle Margaret Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Represented By: Michelle Margaret Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?