McDonald v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rayellen McDonald
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv00100
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Bell on behalf of Rayellen McDonald (Bell, Robert)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Erik M. Anderson, Christopher R. Hedican. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/24/2020. (APP)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Walmart, Inc.. (Hedican, Christopher)
July 20, 2020 Set Deadlines: Walmart, Inc. answer due 8/5/2020 per Doc. 4 - Summons Returned Executed. (NOS)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Summons in a Civil Action, and Preliminary Pretrial Order served on Walmart Inc. on 7/15/2020, filed by Rayellen McDonald. (Anderson, Erik)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/1/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/1/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/1/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/9/2020. (TXB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Walmart, Inc. (Emailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS)
July 8, 2020 Filing fee paid: $400; receipt number 0977-2506864. (NOS)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart, Inc. filed by Rayellen McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayellen McDonald
Represented By: Erik M. Anderson
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?