Forseth et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Klinton Forseth and Rae Ann Forseth
Defendant: John Does I-X, Cyprexx Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A., PennyMac Loan Servicing, LLC and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv00103
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (State Court - Missoula County) against Bank of America, N.A., Cyprexx Services, LLC, John Does I-X, PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed by Rae Ann Forseth, Klinton Forseth on June 18, 2020. (NOS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 COMPLAINT (State Court - Missoula County) against Bank of America, N.A., John Does I-X, PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed by Rae Ann Forseth, Klinton Forseth on February 18, 2020. (NOS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court Record from Lewis and Clark County District Court. Original paper file shelved in Missoula clerk's office. (Attachments: #1 1 - Missoula County Record, #2 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 3 - Minute Entry, #4 Transfer Receipt - L & C to Missoula County) (NOS)
September 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case as to settlement. (APP)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting: Dismissal Papers due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/1/2020. (dle)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: Settlement Conference held on 8/27/2020. (SLL)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyprexx Services, LLC. (Laird, Cory)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A., PennyMac Loan Servicing, LLC. (James, Doug)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pennymac Financial Services, Inc. for PennyMac Loan Servicing, LLC.. (James, Doug)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (James, Doug)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting: Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 7/21/2020. (CDH)
July 20, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/20/2020. (NOS)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cyprexx Services, LLC. (Laird, Cory)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT Order Setting: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/20/2020 at 03:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The call in information is as follows: 877-402-9753; access code: 5136505. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 7/16/2020. (SLL)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Bank of America, N.A. answer due 8/17/2020; PennyMac Loan Servicing, LLC answer due 8/17/2020. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/16/2020. (dle)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Doug James appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., PennyMac Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER) (James, Doug)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John Johnston for the limited purpose of conducting a formal settlement conference. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/16/2020. (dle)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference Robert Farris-Olsen appearing for Plaintiffs Klinton Forseth, Rae Ann Forseth (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing fee paid: $400; receipt number 0977-2508082. (NOS)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-32-2020-208-DS filed by Cyprexx Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Exhibit C - Summons to Bank of America, #5 Exhibit D - Summons to PennyMac, #6 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit F - Acknowledgment and Waiver of Service of Summons, #8 Exhibit G - Ps' First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #9 Exhibit H - Summons to Cyprexx, #10 Exhibit I - Ds' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3), #11 Exhibit J - Ds' Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer, #12 Exhibit K - Ds' Request for Judicial Notice, #13 Exhibit L - Return of Service, #14 Exhibit M - Response to Ds' Motion to Transfer, #15 Exhibit N - Affidavit of Andrew Goldberger). (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forseth et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprexx Services, LLC
Represented By: Cory R. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Doug James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Doug James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Doug James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klinton Forseth
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Ann Forseth
Represented By: Scott L. Peterson
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?