Maloof v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah Dee Maloof
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 9:2020cv00116
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Dee Maloof. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Rasmusson, Eric)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons Issued - Regional Chief). (Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiff's Counsel for service.) (NOS)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/6/2020. (NOS)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Deborah Dee Maloof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) ($400 filing fee/IFP pending.) (NOS) (Modified on 8/6/2020 to remove "Lodged;" Complaint filed per Order, Doc. 3.) (NOS)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Attorney Eric Rasmusson appearing for Plaintiff Deborah Dee Maloof. (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maloof v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Dee Maloof
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?