Godfrey v. Salmonson
Petitioner: Tracey Godfrey
Respondent: Jim Salmonson
Case Number: 9:2020cv00122
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 USCA CASE NUMBER 20-35833 re #4 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment (TAG)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Pursuant to Rule 60(b) by Tracey Godfrey. (TAG) Modified on 9/23/2020 to correct document type and description; NEF regenerated (TAG).
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/20/2020. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Tracey Godfrey. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godfrey v. Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracey Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?