Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. Neesvig et al
Plaintiff: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Shanna Neesvig, Craig A Neesvig, Christopher Rash and Stephanie Rash
Case Number: 9:2020cv00127
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/13/2020. (ASG)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Handelman, Leah)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: Stipulation of Dismissal. Defendants Stephanie Rash and Christopher Rash are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/9/2020. (ASG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Stephanie Rash and Christopher Rash by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Handelman, Leah)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to the Honorable Dana L. Christensen for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/25/2020. (ASG)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/24/2020. (APP)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (TAG)
August 21, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX9-15356 (TAG)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. Neesvig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Leah T. Handelman
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanna Neesvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig A Neesvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Rash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?