Godfrey v. Salmonson
Petitioner: Tracey Godfrey
Respondent: Jim Salmonson
Case Number: 9:2020cv00132
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. COA denied. Unless Godfrey contemporaneously provides an authorization from the Circuit permitting a second/successive petition, the Clerk of Court shall accept no further filings from Godfrey challenging his 2013 state court conviction. If no authorization is provided, future documents from Godfrey will be discarded by the Clerk and will not be considered by the Court. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/8/2020. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (32 pgs.)) (TAG)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 ADDENDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Tracey Godfrey. (Attachments: #1 Addendum 2) (TAG)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Tracey Godfrey. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godfrey v. Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracey Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?