Berkley Insurance Company v. Mikesell et al
Plaintiff: Berkley Insurance Company
Defendant: Clayton C. Bolles, Robin C. Bolles and Joyce Mikesell
Case Number: 9:2020cv00137
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER reassigning case to the Honorable Dana L. Christensen for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference set for December 4, 2020 is VACATED and will be reset in the future by separate order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/13/2020. (ASG)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 10/13/2020. (TAG)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J. Colbert on behalf of Berkley Insurance Company (Colbert, Randall)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Berkley Insurance Company. Clayton C. Bolles waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Condra, Philip)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Berkley Insurance Company. Robin C. Bolles waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Condra, Philip)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Berkley Insurance Company. Joyce Mikesell waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Condra, Philip)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Clayton C. Bolles, Robin C. Bolles, Joyce Mikesell. (Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiffs' Counsel for service.) (APP)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/25/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/25/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/25/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/31/2020. (SMD)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Berkley Insurance Company, re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons- Robin Bolles, #2 Summons - Clayton Bolles) (Condra, Philip)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Berkley Insurance Company.. (Condra, Philip)
August 28, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2534586 (TAG)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Berkley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Insurance Company v. Mikesell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton C. Bolles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin C. Bolles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Mikesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip B. Condra
Represented By: Randall J. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?