Rideg v. Berleth et al
Plaintiff: William Rideg
Defendant: Nadia Berleth and Robert Berleth
Case Number: 9:2021cv00021
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Clerk of Court's office to Montana Fourth Judicial District Court. (CD with case file and copy of docket sheet sent to Clerk of District Court, Missoula County.) (NOS) Modified on 8/16/2021; case file sent via email. (NOS) Modified on 8/20/2021; receipt confirmation received via USPS; Missoula County clerk's office received file on 8/16/21. (NOS)
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (NOS)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Judge DeSotos Findings and Recommendation #15 IN FULL, and Rideg's Motion for Remand to State District Court #2 is GRANTED. This case is remanded to the Fourth Judicial District Court for the State of Montana. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions #13 and #16 are DENIED, because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/9/2021. (ASG)
May 13, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Correction: re #17 Brief/Memo in Support. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ASG)
May 13, 2021 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Strike. Gregory A. McDonnell appearing for Plaintiff William Rideg (McDonnell, Gregory) Modified on 5/13/2021 (ASG).
May 13, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Gregory A. McDonnell appearing for Plaintiff William Rideg (McDonnell, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by William Rideg. Judge Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto termed. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand should be GRANTED, and Plaintiff's request for attorney fees should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/7/2021. (TAG)
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Nadia Berleth, Robert Berleth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Schacht, Nathan)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Nathan A. Schacht appearing for Defendants Nadia Berleth, Robert Berleth Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Schacht, Nathan)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/26/2021. (TXB)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Remand Nathan A. Schacht appearing for Defendants Nadia Berleth, Robert Berleth Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Schacht, Nathan)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by William Rideg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (McDonnell, Gregory)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nadia Berleth answer due 5/4/2021; Robert Berleth answer due 5/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/20/2021. (SMD)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Nathan A. Schacht appearing for Defendants Nadia Berleth, Robert Berleth Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A) (Schacht, Nathan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Remand : Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Motion for Remand to State District Court filed by Nadia Berleth, Robert Berleth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Schacht, Nathan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Schacht on behalf of Nadia Berleth, Robert Berleth (Schacht, Nathan)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants response to Plaintiffs motion to remand shall be due on or before April 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/19/2021. (APP)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Nadia Berleth, Robert Berleth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Declarations Page) (Berleth, Robert) Modified on 3/19/2021 to change event from Response to Motion (APP).
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by William Rideg Notice that Plaintiff's Motion for Remand is Ripe for Ruling (McDonnell, Gregory)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand Gregory A. McDonnell appearing for Plaintiff William Rideg Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 4) (McDonnell, Gregory)
February 26, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2623850 (KJL)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number 18-1317., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rideg v. Berleth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadia Berleth
Represented By: Robert Berleth
Represented By: Nathan A. Schacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Berleth
Represented By: Robert Berleth
Represented By: Nathan A. Schacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rideg
Represented By: Thomas C. Orr
Represented By: Matthew Anthony McKeon
Represented By: Gregory A. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?