Card et al v. Mitchell
Plaintiff: Steven Card and Patricia Card
Defendant: Thomas Mitchell
Case Number: 9:2021cv00079
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thomas Mitchell. Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiffs' counsel for service. (NOS)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Submission of Proposed Summons as to All Plaintiffs, re #1 Complaint (Rhoades, Quentin)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/5/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/5/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/5/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/9/2021. (TXB)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Mitchell, filed by Steven Card, Patricia Card. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
July 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2694057 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Card et al v. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Card
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Card
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?