Wilderness Watch et al v. Marten et al
Plaintiff: Wilderness Watch, Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force and Conversation Congress
Defendant: Leanne Marten and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 9:2021cv00082
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/31/2021. (ASG)
August 31, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Conversation Congress, Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Friends of the Wild Swan, Wilderness Watch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Withdrawal Notice) (Bechtold, Timothy)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting: Status Report due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/9/2021. (ASG)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 Joint NOTICE by Leanne Marten, U.S. Forest Service re #12 Order. (Duffy, Sean) (NOS)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re #3 Motion for Injunctive Relief by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Conversation Congress, Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Friends of the Wild Swan, Wilderness Watch re #12 Order. (Bechtold, Timothy) (NOS)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order: the responsive briefing deadline currently scheduled for July 27, 2021 and motions hearing currently scheduled for July 29, 2021 are VACATED, to be reset, if necessary, by future order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint notice on or before August 6, 2021 outlining a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' motion #3 or otherwise advising the Court how the parties wish to proceed as to the motion, in light of Defendants' delayed implementation. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/26/2021. (ASG)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Hearing and NOTICE by Leanne Marten, U.S. Forest Service re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Duffy, Sean) (Modified on 7/26/2021.) (NOS)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gerald Freeborne on behalf of All Defendants (Freeborne, Paul)
July 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/24/2021. (ASG)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Duffy on behalf of All Defendants (Duffy, Sean)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #6 Notice (Other) [Declaration of Sara Mayben, Acting Forest Supervisor for the Helena-Lewis and Clark National Forest] by Leanne Marten, U.S. Forest Service. (Smith, Mark)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Leanne Marten, U.S. Forest Service re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE RESPONSE BRIEF OPPOSING TRO & PI] (Smith, Mark)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steger Smith on behalf of Leanne Marten, U.S. Forest Service (Smith, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Conversation Congress, Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Friends of the Wild Swan, Wilderness Watch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Nickas Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 FWP Decision Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 FWP EA, #4 Exhibit 4 FS MRDG, #5 Exhibit 5 FS Decision Memo, #6 Exhibit 6 Former FS letters, #7 Exhibit 7 WW comments) (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Conversation Congress, Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Friends of the Wild Swan, Wilderness Watch (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Leanne Marten, U.S. Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. May be downloaded and printed for service (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (TAG)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilderness Watch, Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Conversation Congress. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
July 22, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2701478 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilderness Watch et al v. Marten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Watch
Represented By: Dana M. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Dana M. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Wild Swan
Represented By: Dana M. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force
Represented By: Dana M. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conversation Congress
Represented By: Dana M. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Marten
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Sean C. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Sean C. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?