Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Native Ecosystem Council
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Randy Moore, Mary Erickson and Leanne Marten
Case Number: 9:2021cv00084
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Native Ecosystem Council (Newman, Claudia)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court's office to PHV Counsel Newman regarding CM/ECF registration. (Copy emailed to Counsel Newman.) (NOS)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Claudia Newman for Plaintiffs. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/22/2021. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/7/2021. Served on Local Counsel for Plaintiffs via CM/ECF. (ASG)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION Claudia M. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2721918.) Laura King appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Native Ecosystem Council (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (King, Laura)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. May be downloaded and printed for service (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (TAG)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Native Ecosystem Council. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
July 26, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2702564 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Laura King
Represented By: Claudia M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystem Council
Represented By: Laura King
Represented By: Claudia M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Marten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?