Evenson-Childs v. Ravalli County Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff: Teri Lea Evenson-Childs and Daniel O'Toole
Defendant: Ravalli County Sheriff's Office, Ravalli County Justice Court and 21st Judicial District, Ravalli County
Case Number: 9:2021cv00089
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Jail Diversion Order, #2 Exhibit B - Evenson-Childs Decl., #3 Exhibit C - Evenson-Childs Sept. 2021 Decl., #4 Exhibit D - O'Toole Decl., #5 Exhibit E - Pfau Decl., #6 Exhibit F - Johnson Decl., #7 Exhibit G - Leonard Decl., #8 Exhibit H - Hadley Decl., #9 Exhibit I - Churchill Decl., #10 Exhibit J - Turner Decl., #11 Exhibit K - Evans Decl., #12 Exhibit L - Heinzman Decl., #13 Exhibit M - Sellers Decl., #14 Exhibit N - Voth Decl., #15 Exhibit O - Sutton Decl., #16 Exhibit P - Sample Alcohol Monitoring Contract, #17 Exhibit Q - Sample 24-7 Sobriety Program Contract) (Sommers-Flanagan, Rylee)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan appearing for Plaintiffs Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Sommers-Flanagan, Rylee)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to 21st Judicial District, Ravalli County. (KJL)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Baker, Natasha)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole re #7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Telfeyan, Phil)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Natasha Baker. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/8/2021. (APP)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phil Telfeyan for Teri Lea Evenson-Childs,Phil Telfeyan for Daniel O'Toole. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/8/2021. (APP)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole. Ravalli County Justice Court waiver sent on 8/19/2021, answer due 10/18/2021; Ravalli County Sheriff's Office waiver sent on 8/19/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Van Kley, Constance)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Natasha Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2722430.) Constance Van Kley appearing for Plaintiffs Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Van Kley, Constance)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Phil Telfeyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2722425.) Constance Van Kley appearing for Plaintiffs Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Van Kley, Constance)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT Teri Lea Evenson-Childs and Daniel O'Toole against All Defendants, filed by Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, Daniel O'Toole. (Van Kley, Constance)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/8/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/8/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/8/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/10/2021. (TXB)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Ravalli County Sheriff's Office filed by Teri Lea Evenson-Childs, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)
August 9, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number 0977-2709304. (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evenson-Childs v. Ravalli County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Lea Evenson-Childs
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Represented By: Natasha Baker
Represented By: Phil Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Toole
Represented By: Natasha Baker
Represented By: Phil Telfeyan
Represented By: Rylee K. Sommers-Flanagan
Represented By: Constance Van Kley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravalli County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravalli County Justice Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Judicial District, Ravalli County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?