Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Gassman et al
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Defendant: Nathan Gassman, Chad Benson, Keith Lannom, U.S. Forest Service and U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Case Number: 9:2021cv00105
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Forest Resource Council, Kootenai Forest Stakeholders Coalition, Lincoln County. (APP)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene Mark L. Stermitz appearing for Interested Parties American Forest Resource Council, Kootenai Forest Stakeholders Coalition, Lincoln County. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tom Partin, #2 Declaration of Barry Dexter, #3 Declaration of Brent Teske, #4 Declaration of Edward Levert, #5 Answer, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Text of Proposed Order) (APP)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case Management Order: Motions due by 1/20/2022. Cross Motions due by 2/17/2022. Responses due by 3/10/2022. Replies due by 3/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 11/18/2021. (APP)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Chad Benson, Nathan Gassman, Keith Lannom, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service. (Tustin, John)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Chad Benson, Nathan Gassman, Keith Lannom, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service. (Tustin, John)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/24/2021. (APP)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Turner, Rickey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Tustin on behalf of All Defendants (Tustin, John)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service. (APP) (Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiffs' Counsel for service.)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: #1 USFWS Summons) (Smith, Rebecca)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Case Management Plan shall be filed on or before November 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/21/2021. (NOS)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (TAG)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
September 21, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2732021 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Gassman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Gassman
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Benson
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lannom
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?