Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC et al v. Dusek et al
Plaintiff: Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin and Darryl C. Slattengren
Defendant: Matt Dusek and Rachel Dusek
Case Number: 9:2022cv00019
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2022. Discovery due by 11/14/2022. Motions due by 12/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/21/2022. Contract Court Reporter is Needed. (TXB)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/18/2022. (TXB)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Setting: Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset for 3/18/2022 at 10:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/7/2022. Contract Court Reporter is Not Needed. (TXB)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/7/2022. (TXB)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren. (Simpson, Fred)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Matt Dusek, Rachel Dusek. (Coleman, Shane)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren. (Simpson, Fred)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Buy-Sell Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- Inspection Notice, #3 Exhibit C- Dusek Letter to SDarkenwald, #4 Exhibit D -Dusek email to SDarkenwald) (Simpson, Fred)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/4/2022. Contract Court Reporter is Not Needed. (TXB)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear by Zoom Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/2/2022. (HSW)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Appear Remotely - Videoconference or Telephone Shane Coleman appearing for Counter Claimants Matt Dusek, Matt Dusek, Rachel Dusek, Rachel Dusek, Defendants Matt Dusek, Rachel Dusek (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Remotely) (Coleman, Shane)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Matt Dusek, Rachel Dusek, filed by Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren, Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC. (Simpson, Fred)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint (Second Amended), First COUNTERCLAIM (First Amended) against Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren by Rachel Dusek, Matt Dusek. (McClafferty, Brianne)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren. (Simpson, Fred)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM against Matt Dusek, Rachel Dusek, filed by Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren, Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC. (Simpson, Fred)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (APP)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren (Simpson, Fred)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DUSEKS' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (First Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC, Gail L. Goodwin, Darryl C. Slattengren by Matt Dusek, Rachel Dusek. (McClafferty, Brianne)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SERVICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/7/2022. (APP)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/7/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/7/2022. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/7/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/21/2022. (APP)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eleventh Judicial District, Flathead County, case number DV 21-1445C, filed by Matt Dusek and Rachel Dusek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) Modified on 1/21/2022: CV 21-19-M-DLC-KLD (TAG).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-2799486 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC et al v. Dusek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC
Represented By: Sean S. Frampton
Represented By: Fred Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail L. Goodwin
Represented By: Sean S. Frampton
Represented By: Fred Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl C. Slattengren
Represented By: Sean S. Frampton
Represented By: Fred Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Dusek
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Dusek
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?