Cavanaugh v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Zackary Cavanaugh
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 9:2022cv00065
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Becia, Franco)
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 Proof of Service filed by Zackary Cavanaugh. Service by Certified Mail on May 17, 2022. (Koenig, Andrew)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (APP) (Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiffs' Counsel for service.)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/29/2022. (APP)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to Standing Order DLC-51 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (APP)
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 SERVICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/13/2022. (APP)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Zackary Cavanaugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (APP)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Andrew Thomas Koenig appearing for Plaintiff Zackary Cavanaugh. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavanaugh v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackary Cavanaugh
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?