H. et al v. Allegiance Benefit Plan Management et al
Plaintiff: W. H. and Z. H.
Defendant: Allegiance Benefit Plan Management and Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The
Case Number: 9:2022cv00072
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The. (Mellem, Alissa)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #16 Stipulated Motion for Extension for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' response shall be due on or before May 20, 2022. Absent compelling reasons, no further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/6/2022. (NOS)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that on or before May 20, 2022, the parties shall obtain local counsel as required by District of Montana Local Rule 83.1(d). No more than two pro hac vice attorneys will be admitted to represent any party. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/6/2022. (NOS)
May 5, 2022 Filing 16 Stipulated Motion For Extension For Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Alissa M. Mellem appearing for Defendants Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension) (Mellem, Alissa)
April 6, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:21-cv-00684. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (TAG, )
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Motion to Change Venue and to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint: This case will be transferred to the District of Montana (Missoula). Defendants shall respond to the Complaint within thirty (30) days after this matter is transferred to the District of Montana (Missoula). Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 4/6/22. (dla) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
April 5, 2022 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue and to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Attorney Angela Shewan added to party Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The(pty:dft)(Shewan, Angela) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 2/15/22. (dla) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond filed by Defendant Allegiance Benefit Plan Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Shewan, Angela) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
February 14, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by W. H., Z. H. as to Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The Waiver sent on 2/7/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
February 8, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C. Houpt on behalf of Allegiance Benefit Plan Management (Houpt, Timothy) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Allegiance Benefit Plan Management answer due 3/4/2022. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/20/2022. (nl) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendant Allegiance Benefit Plan Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Attorney Angela Shewan added to party Allegiance Benefit Plan Management(pty:dft)(Shewan, Angela) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/22/21. (dla) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/21/2021. (mjm) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by W. H., Z. H. as to Allegiance Benefit Plan Management Waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4170093) filed by W. H., Z. H.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiffs W. H., Z. H. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) [Transferred from utd on 4/6/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. et al v. Allegiance Benefit Plan Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. H.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. H.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiance Benefit Plan Management
Represented By: Angela Shewan
Represented By: Timothy C. Houpt
Represented By: Alissa M. Mellem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The
Represented By: Angela Shewan
Represented By: Alissa M. Mellem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?