W.H. and Z.H. v. Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: W.H. and Z.H.
Defendant: Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Inc., Logan Health and Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The
Case Number: 9:2022cv00166
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by W.H. and Z.H. re #3 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (King, Brian)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by W.H. and Z.H.. Logan Health waiver sent on 10/10/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. (King, Brian)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by W.H. and Z.H.. Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Inc. waiver sent on 10/10/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. (King, Brian)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by W.H. and Z.H.. Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The waiver sent on 10/10/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. (King, Brian)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Brian S. King. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/4/2022. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/20/2022. (SGN)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION Brian S. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2955330.) David T. Lighthall appearing for Plaintiff W.H. and Z.H. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian S. King) (Lighthall, David)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by W.H. and Z.H. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SGN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/3/2022) (MPB).
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing fee paid in the shell case: $402, receipt number AMTDC-2942325 (SGN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.H. and Z.H. v. Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.H. and Z.H.
Represented By: David T. Lighthall
Represented By: Brian Smith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiance Benefit Plan Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Benefit Plan for Employees of Kalispell Regional Healthcare, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?