Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force v. State of Montana
Plaintiff: Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force and Wildearth Guardians
Defendant: State of Montana, Lesley Robinson and Greg Gianforte
Case Number: 9:2023cv00101
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Third Bader Declaration filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Martha Williams Letter to FWP, #2 Exhibit 2 Biologists' Opinion, #3 Exhibit 3 Lamb report, #4 Exhibit 4 Lamb Article) (Bechtold, Timothy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/6/2023 by clerk due to inability to open; NEF regenerated to parties.) (NOS)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Declaration of Michael Bader filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Declaration of Carter Niemeyer filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Lance Craighead filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Declaration of David Mattson filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Declaration of Barrie Gilbert filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Declaration of Brian Horesji filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Greg Gianforte, Lesley Robinson, State of Montana. Amendment to #19 Response to Motion, for Preliminary Injunction. (Clerget, Sarah)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Greg Gianforte, Lesley Robinson, State of Montana. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ken McDonald, #2 Affidavit of Quentin Kujala, #3 Affidavit of Nathan Kluge, #4 Affidavit of Cecily M. Costello, #5 Affidavit of Lee Anderson) (Clerget, Sarah)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Greg Gianforte, Lesley Robinson, State of Montana. (Clerget, Sarah)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Answer to #4 Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Responses due by 10/23/2023. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/18/2023. (SGN)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Sarah Montana Clerget appearing for Defendants Greg Gianforte, Lesley Robinson, State of Montana. (Clerget, Sarah)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Alex Neill withdrawing from the case, filed by Greg Gianforte, Lesley Robinson, State of Montana (Clerget, Sarah) Modified on 10/18/2023 to correct docket text per Counsel's request (SGN).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 and Answer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint #4 are to be filed on or before October 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/10/2023. (MPB)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Montana Clerget on behalf of Greg Gianforte (Clerget, Sarah) (NOS)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Answer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Sarah Montana Clerget appearing for Defendants Greg Gianforte, Lesley Robinson, State of Montana. (Clerget, Sarah)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M Neill on behalf of Lesley Robinson, State of Montana (Neill, Alex)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' pending motion for preliminary injunction is set for oral argument on November 20, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, Montana. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/28/2023. (NOS) Contract court reporter Lisa Lesofski to cover hearing remotely.) (NOS)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Barrie Gilbert filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M Neill on behalf of State of Montana. (Neill, Alex) (NOS)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Greg Gianforte, Lesley Robinson. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Gianforte) (NOS)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Mattson Declaration, #2 Kendall Declaration, #3 Niemeyer Declaration, #4 Boyd Declaration, #5 Horejsi Declaration, #6 Manley Declaration, #7 Bader Declaration, #8 Ames Declaration, #9 Rissien Declaration, #10 Bechtold Declaration) (Bechtold, Timothy)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Bechtold, Timothy)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Summons Robinson, #2 Summons Gianforte) (Bechtold, Timothy)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The parties shall file a proposed case management plan on or before December 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/12/2023. (NOS)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State of Montana. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (SGN)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Montana, filed by Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SGN)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3124901 (SGN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force v. State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flathead-Lolo-Bitterroot Citizen Task Force
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: Sarah Montana Clerget
Represented By: Alex M Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Robinson
Represented By: Sarah Montana Clerget
Represented By: Alex M Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Gianforte
Represented By: Sarah Montana Clerget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?