Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company v. Beecroft et al
Plaintiff: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Defendant: Denice Yuill Beecroft, Dylan Ann Balulis, Elizabeth A. Snyder, Mary Ann Grotewiel, Laura Elizabeth Johnson, Logan Health, Sharyn Schrader, Derek Johnathon Smith and Meaghan Cassendra Smith
Case Number: 9:2023cv00147
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Dylan Balulis and Laura Johnson are DISMISSED as defendants in this action. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/29/2024. (NOS)
January 29, 2024 Terminate Answer deadlines for Balulis and Johnson. (NOS)
January 24, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dylan Balulis, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Mary Ann Grotewiel, #3 Exhibit C - 1/18/2024 Email from Laura Johnson) (Bancroft, Thomas)
January 18, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Logan Health waiver sent on 12/19/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Sharyn Schrader waiver sent on 12/19/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
January 2, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Mary Ann Grotewiel served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
January 2, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Dylan Ann Balulis served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
January 2, 2024 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company as to Laura Elizabeth Johnson. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Derek Johnathon Smith waiver sent on 12/19/2023, answer due 2/20/2024; Meaghan Cassendra Smith waiver sent on 12/19/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Denice Yuill Beecroft waiver sent on 12/19/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Elizabeth A. Snyder on 12/19/2023 by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Derek Johnathon Smith and Meaghan Cassendra Smith on 12/19/2023 by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sharyn Schrader on 12/19/2023 by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Logan Health on 12/19/2023 by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Denice Yuill Beecroft on 12/19/2023 by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2024. (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 18, 2023 Filing 7 Remark: Check from Progressive in the amount of $1,000,000.00 receipted 12/18/23; receipt # 9-18368. (SGN)
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 Sealed Document Unredacted Notice of Tax ID Number re: #5 Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Bancroft, Thomas) (Copy to finance.) (NOS)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Authorized deposit in the amount of $1,000,000.00. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/7/2023. (NOS) Copy to Finance. (NOS)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S. C. Section 1335) . Thomas C. Bancroft appearing for Plaintiff Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Registry Deposit Information Form) (Bancroft, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Bancroft, Thomas) (Modified on 12/4/2023; corporate parents added.) (NOS)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Denice Yuill Beecroft. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (TAG) Modified on 12/4/2023 to include additional issued summonses, NEF regnerated (SGN).
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER OF LIABILITY INSURANCE POLICY LIMITS, filed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
December 1, 2023 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3170320 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company v. Beecroft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Represented By: Randall G. Nelson
Represented By: Thomas C. Bancroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denice Yuill Beecroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Ann Balulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Grotewiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Elizabeth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharyn Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Johnathon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meaghan Cassendra Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?