O'Neil et al v. Montana Supreme Court et al
Plaintiff: Jerry O'Neil, Gene Kirschbaum, Russell Sias, Barbara Levitt, Darell Levit and Assembled Voters
Defendant: Montana Supreme Court, State Bar of Montana, The Montana Supreme Court and the State Bar of of Montana, joined together as the Integrated Bar of Montana and Christi Jacobsen
Case Number: 9:2023cv00161
Filed: December 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
2 Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Injunctive/Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Terminate Deadlines as to #13 Amended Pleadings ddl 2/2/24 (ACC)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 Pro Se Amended Complaint, filed by Jerry O'Neil. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (O'Neil, Jerry)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: O'Neil shall have until February 2, 2024, to file his amended complaint as an independent filing. Should O'Neil fail to file an amended complaint by the February 2, 2024, the Court view O'Neil as having abandoned his motion to leave to file an amended complaint, and this matter will proceed on O'Neil's initial complaint (Doc. 1). Defendants shall have 30 days to respond to O'Neil's amended complaint, assuming it has been filed independently. All other deadlines set by the Court's previous order (Doc. 6) will remain in effect. DATED this 1st day of February 2024. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/2/2024. (MMS)
February 1, 2024 Terminate Deadlines as to Amended Pldgs ddl 1/31/24. (ACC)
January 31, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Curt Glen Drake on behalf of State Bar of Montana (Drake, Curt)
January 31, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Hope Klanke on behalf of State Bar of Montana (Klanke, Patricia)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. O'Neil shall have until January 31, 2024, to file his amended complaint. Defendants shall have 30 days to respond to O'Neil's amended complaint, should he choose to file one. All other deadlines created by the Court's order #6 remain in effect. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/24/2024. (MMS)
January 24, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2024. (MMS)
January 22, 2024 Filing 9 Proof of Service filed by Jerry O'Neil. (SGN)
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jerry O'Neil. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibits to Amended Complaint) (SGN)
January 22, 2024 Filing 7 PRO SE REGISTRATION FORM by Plaintiff Jerry O'Neil. (SGN)
January 22, 2024 REMARK: E-filing request approved and sent to PACER for Plaintiff Jerry O'Neil. (SGN)
January 22, 2024 Amended Pleadings Deadline of 01/19/2024 Terminated (TLO)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED the following schedule will govern the filing of the Amended Petition for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and responsive pleadings: Deadline for Plaintiffs to File an Amended Petition: January 19, 2024. Deadline for Defendants' Responsive Pleadings: February 19, 2024. Deadline for Plaintiffs' Response Brief(s): March 11, 2024. Deadline for Defendants' Replies: April 1, 2024. Motion Hearing: April 22, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. at the PaulHatfield Federal Courthouse, Helena, MT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/12/2024. (Order mailed to Plt O'Neil and Kirschbaum) (ACC)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION Request for Briefing Schedule . Thomas J. Leonard appearing for Defendant Montana Supreme Court. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Leonard, Thomas)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian Morris for all further proceedings. Judge Dana L. Christensen and Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/3/2024. (SGN) Modified on 1/3/2024 - Copy mailed to O'Neil and Kirschbaum (SGN).
December 29, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christi Jacobsen, Montana Supreme Court, State Bar of Montana. (TAG)
December 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint. Mailed to O'Neil and Kirschbaum with docket sheets (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent to Electronic Service) (TAG)
December 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gene Kirschbaum, Jerry O'Neil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (TAG)
December 29, 2023 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number MTX9-18390 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neil et al v. Montana Supreme Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Kirschbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Sias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darell Levit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assembled Voters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Supreme Court
Represented By: Matthew B. Hayhurst
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of Montana
Represented By: Curt Glen Drake
Represented By: Patricia Hope Klanke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Montana Supreme Court and the State Bar of of Montana, joined together as the Integrated Bar of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?