Nelson v. Avantax Planning Partners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Molly Nelson
Defendant: Avantax Planning Partners, Inc. and Avantax, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2024cv00013
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion (Doc. 25) is GRANTED. These proceedings shall be stayed until April 1, 2024, and all briefing deadlines shall be stayed until further order by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report on or before April 1, 2024, updating the Court as whether mediation was successful or resuming the litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if mediation is unsuccessful, the parties shall submit a revised briefing schedule by April 1, 2024.Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/12/2024. (APP)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 3/11/2024. Motions ripe 3/11/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/12/2024. (APP)
March 11, 2024 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Reply to Response to Motion, #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration . Joshua B. Kirkpatrick appearing for Defendants Avantax Planning Partners, Inc., Avantax, Inc.. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
March 11, 2024 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Proceedings. Joshua B. Kirkpatrick appearing for Defendants Avantax Planning Partners, Inc., Avantax, Inc.. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
March 11, 2024 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Avantax Planning Partners, Inc., Avantax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
March 1, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay or Enjoin Arbitration and, Alternatively, Motion to Change Arbitration Venue. Joel Andersen appearing for Plaintiff Molly Nelson. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion to Enjoin or Stay Arbitration and, Alternatively, Motion to Change Arbitration Venue) (Andersen, Joel)
February 23, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Molly Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly Nelson in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Katie M. Connolly in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration (with Exhibit A)) (Andersen, Joel)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Christensen. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/22/2024. (APP)
February 16, 2024 Filing 20 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
February 16, 2024 Filing 19 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
February 2, 2024 Filing 18 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/16/2024. (APP)
February 2, 2024 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Avantax Planning Partners, Inc., Avantax, Inc.. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
February 2, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration. Joshua B. Kirkpatrick appearing for Defendants Avantax Planning Partners, Inc., Avantax, Inc.. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
February 2, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Molly Nelson. Amendment to #12 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order . (Andersen, Joel)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Molly Nelson re #11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Connolly, Katie)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Molly Nelson re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Ruska, Christopher)
February 1, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Molly Nelson re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Andersen, Joel)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katie M. Connolly. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/22/2024. (APP)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joel Andersen. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/22/2024. (APP)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher T. Ruska. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/22/2024. (APP)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Molly Nelson (Faure, Jean)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Molly Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Faure, Jean)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION Katie M. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3195429.). Jean E. Faure appearing for Plaintiff Molly Nelson. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Katie M. Connolly, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Faure, Jean)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION Joel Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3195424.). Jean E. Faure appearing for Plaintiff Molly Nelson. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Joel Andersen, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Faure, Jean)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION Christopher T. Ruska to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3195420.). Jean E. Faure appearing for Plaintiff Molly Nelson. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Ruska, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Faure, Jean)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/17/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/17/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/17/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/18/2024. (TXB)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (TAG)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Molly Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
January 18, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3194508 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Avantax Planning Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Nelson
Represented By: Jason T. Holden
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Represented By: Katie Marie Connolly
Represented By: Christopher T. Ruska
Represented By: Joel Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avantax Planning Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avantax, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?