O'Yates v. Pluid et al
Plaintiff: Jesicca O'Yates
Defendant: Laura Pluid, Regan Lewis, Fortine School, Fortine School District No 14 and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 9:2024cv00035
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesicca O'Yates. Fortine School waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
May 14, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesicca O'Yates. Fortine School District No 14 waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
May 14, 2024 Filing 18 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the preliminary pretrial conference scheduled for June 27, 2024, and all associated deadlines, are VACATED pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/8/2024. (APP)
May 8, 2024 Filing 16 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
May 8, 2024 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. (APP)
May 7, 2024 Filing 15 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/21/2024. (APP)
May 7, 2024 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fortine School, Fortine School District No 14, Regan Lewis, Laura Pluid. (Jones, Natasha)
May 7, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Natasha Prinzing Jones appearing for Defendants Fortine School, Fortine School District No 14, Regan Lewis, Laura Pluid. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Jones, Natasha)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/3/2024. (TXB)
April 23, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons. Served on Laura Pluid on April 18, 2024, filed by Jesicca O'Yates. Laura Pluid answer due date 5/9/2024. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
April 16, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons. Served on Regan Lewis on April 1, 2024, filed by Jesicca O'Yates. Regan Lewis answer due date 4/22/2024. (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
March 29, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Shaw on behalf of Jesicca O'Yates (Kirchhoff, Maxwell) Modified on 4/10/2024 to correct name of attorney entering appearance (MPB).
March 22, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Fortine School, Fortine School District No 14, Regan Lewis, Laura Pluid. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (APP)
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Laura Pluid, re #1 Complaint (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Regan Lewis, re #1 Complaint (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Fortine School, re #1 Complaint (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Fortine School District No 14, re #1 Complaint (Kirchhoff, Maxwell)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/20/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/20/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/20/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/21/2024. (TXB)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (TAG) Modified on 3/21/2024 COUNSEL CALLED AND ASKED THAT THESE SUMMONS BECOME INVALID AS THERE WAS AN ERROR. SHE WILL REFILE THE SUMMONS AT A LATER DATE (APP).
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jesicca O'Yates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
March 21, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3231553 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Yates v. Pluid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesicca O'Yates
Represented By: Cole Radovich
Represented By: Jory C. Ruggiero
Represented By: Maxwell E. Kirchhoff
Represented By: Adam M. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Pluid
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regan Lewis
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortine School
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortine School District No 14
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?