Martin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kristin Martin
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2024cv00042
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/13/2024. (NOS)
May 7, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cockrell, Dale)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/29/2024. (NOS)
April 26, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cockrell, Dale)
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by Kristin Martin in Flathead County District Court on 3/4/2024. (NOS)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED (from Flathead County District Court, case number DV-15-2024-0000315-PI). (Attachments: #1 2.00_Summons Issued, #2 3.00_Motion to Dismiss, #3 4.00_Brief in Support, #4 5.00_Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #5 6.00_Summons Served, #6 7.00_Notice of Removal), #7 Transfer Receipt). (NOS)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint. Dale R. Cockrell appearing for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV-15-2024-0000315-PI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Civil ROA & Case Documents, #2 Exhibit B-Bad Faith Verdicts, #3 Exhibit C-Cavin Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
April 5, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3240261 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Martin
Represented By: Alexander Kendall Evans
Represented By: Wayne E Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Represented By: Eric M. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?