Holly et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Katrina Holly, Jodie Nordness and Sienna Lilly
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2024cv00051
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting: Oral Argument set for 7/11/2024 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2024 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/21/2024. Contract Court Reporter is Needed. Email sent to JoAnn re availability. JoAnn will court report. (APP)
June 20, 2024 Filing 22 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
June 20, 2024 Filing 21 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly, Jodie Nordness. (Evans, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Filing 20 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly, Jodie Nordness. (Evans, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Filing 19 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly, Jodie Nordness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits for Statement of Facts) (Evans, Alexander)
June 7, 2024 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly, Jodie Nordness. (Olson, Wayne)
May 24, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand re: SFMAIC's Response to Motion to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Complaint - Willer v Allied, #2 Exhibit 2) Supp to NOR - Martinez v Geico, #3 Exhibit 3) Minute Order - Martinez v Geico, #4 Exhibit 4) Glacier Law Website, #5 Exhibit 5) Article by Alex Evans) (Cockrell, Dale)
May 24, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
May 24, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
May 13, 2024 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. (SGN)
May 10, 2024 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly, Jodie Nordness. (Evans, Alexander)
May 10, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly, Jodie Nordness. (Evans, Alexander)
May 10, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand . Alexander Kendall Evans appearing for Plaintiffs Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly, Jodie Nordness. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Evans, Alexander)
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
May 2, 2024 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
May 1, 2024 Filing 8 STATE COURT PLEADINGS (APP)
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Jodie Nordness, Katrina Holly, Sienna Lilly. (APP)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/13/2024. (APP)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/20/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/20/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/20/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/29/2024. (APP)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cockrell, Dale)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint. Dale R. Cockrell appearing for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Cockrell, Dale)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV-15-2024-0000468-PI. (Attachments: #1 A) Civil ROA & Case Documents, #2 B) Bad Faith Verdicts, #3 C) Cavin Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (TAG)
April 26, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3252060 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holly et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Holly
Represented By: Wayne E Olson, Jr
Represented By: Alexander Kendall Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Nordness
Represented By: Alexander Kendall Evans
Represented By: Wayne E Olson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sienna Lilly
Represented By: Wayne E Olson, Jr
Represented By: Alexander Kendall Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Represented By: Eric M. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?