IN RE: NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD; SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION HCII, MISSOURI/KANSAS DIVISION; MIDWEST DIVISION - RMC, LLC D/B/A RESEARCH MEDICAL CENTER, 373 NLRB NO. 36, DECISION AND ORDER ISSUED ON MARCH 20, 2024
Case Number: MCP NO. 181
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE FOR CONSOLIDATION ORDER -- re: pldg. (2 in 07/1:24-ca-01439, 2 in 08/1:24-ca-01680, #3 in MCP No. 181) -- Received from National Labor Relations Board Associated Cases: MCP No. 181, 07/1:24-ca-01439, 08/1:24-ca-01680 (Habenstreit, David)
April 12, 2024 Filing 4 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CONSOLIDATION ORDER (MCP-181) re: pldg. (2 in 07/1:24-ca-01439, 2 in 08/1:24-ca-01680, #3 in MCP No. 181) ACTION REQUIRED BY: David Habenstreit, Esq., National Labor Relations Board Proof of Service due on or before 4/19/2024.The Panel has served the consolidation order on the National Labor Relations Board, however the individual or individuals, or anyone designated by the agency, shall serve the Panel's consolidation order on all parties in all petitions for review included in the Panel's consolidation order, and shall submit proof of that service to the Clerk of the Panel by the date noted above.Notification of service can be via email in PDF format to PANELMDL@jpml.uscourts.gov or via CM/ECF, in which filing registration is required. Please visit #http://www.jpml.uscourts.gov for instructions on how to register for CM/ECF.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 4/12/2024. Associated Cases: MCP No. 181, 07/1:24-ca-01439, 08/1:24-ca-01680 (LH)
April 12, 2024 Filing 3 CONSOLIDATION ORDER FILED - RANDOM SELECTION HELD Consolidating 2 appeals that were pending in 2 circuits. The United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit was DESIGNATED Signed by RANDOM SELECTOR, Ajonee Miller, Case Administrator, and WITNESS, Shawnte McGee, Case Administrator, FOR THE PANEL, on 4/12/2024. Associated Cases: MCP No. 181, 07/1:24-ca-01439, 08/1:24-ca-01680 (LH)
April 12, 2024 Filing 2 MCP Number 181 Assigned -- MULTICIRCUIT PETITION ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending MCP No. 9) Associated Cases: Pending MCP No. 9, 07/1:24-ca-01439, 08/1:24-ca-01680 (LH)
April 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF MULTICIRCUIT PETITIONS FOR REVIEW AND REQUEST FOR RANDOM SELECTION -- Filed by National Labor Relations Board, seeking judicial review of 2 petitions pending in the following circuit courts of appeals: Seventh Circuit, Eighth Circuit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NLRB Decision and Order, #2 Exhibit 7th Cir Petition for Review 24-1439, #3 Exhibit 8th Cir Petition for Review 24-1680) (Habenstreit, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD; SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION HCII, MISSOURI/KANSAS DIVISION; MIDWEST DIVISION - RMC, LLC D/B/A RESEARCH MEDICAL CENTER, 373 NLRB NO. 36, DECISION AND ORDER ISSUED ON MARCH 20, 2024
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?