John Bejarano vs. E.K. McDaniel, et al (DEATH PENALTY)
Case Number: |
2:1998cv01016 |
Filed: |
July 13, 1998 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert J. Johnston |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip M. Pro |
Nature of Suit: |
Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 23, 2020 |
Filing
201
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 199 petitioner's motion for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b) is DENIED. Beyond the court's lack of jurisdiction to grant relief, the court concludes that the motion otherwise fails to establish grounds f or relief from judgment or raise a substantial issue sufficient to warrant remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
193
ORDER that 186 Bejarano's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration is granted only to the extent that the foregoing clarifies this court's order of July 2, 2015. The motion is otherwise denied. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
191
ORDER granting 189 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 186 Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration. ( Replies due by 9/8/2015.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 25, 2015 |
Filing
190
MINUTE ORDER granting 184 Motion to Substitute Party. Catherine Cortez Masto is replaced by Adam Paul Laxalt. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JRB)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing
185
ORDER re 176 USCA Order remanding this case for the limited purpose of deciding two specific issues. This court concludes that intervening law does not warrant reconsideration of either (1) Petitioner's appellate ineffective assistance of counsel claims or (2) Claim 2(A) (ineffective assistance of counsel at sentencing). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 26, 2011 |
Filing
175
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 9/26/2011. granting 174 Motion to Substitute Party. The Clerk of the Court shall substitute Renee Baker for E.K. McDaniel, on the docket, as the respondent warden; shall substitute Catherine Cortez Masto for Frankie Sue Del Papa, on the docket, as the respondent attorney general; and shall update the caption of the action to reflect these changes. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing
162
ORDER that Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 106 is DENIED. A Certificate of Appealability is issued as to the following issues: (1) Whether this Court erred in denying Bejaranos request for an evidentiary hearing. (2) W hether Claim Two(A), alleging petitioners rights under the Sixth Amendment were violated as a result of trial counsels performance in the penalty phase of his trial, fails on the merits. Petitioners Motion for Reconsideration 158 is DENIED. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?