WILLIAM LEONARD V. E.K.MCDANIEL
Case Number: 2:1999cv00360
Filed: March 25, 1999
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Correct Clerical Error (ECF No. 206 ) is granted. Claims 1(A), 1(B)(1), 1(B)(3), 1(E), 1(I), 1(J), 1(M), 1(O), 1(P), 1(R)(2-4), 1(T)(3), 3(A)(2)(a), 3(A)(2)(b), 3(E), 3(F), 3(G), 3(H), and 3(J) are no t dismissed and the Order of May 14, 2020 (ECF No. 205 ) is vacated to the extent it indicates otherwise. The Court will consider Martinez arguments in relation to these claims when it rules upon the merits of Leonard's Petition. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER - Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 151) in response to Petitioner's first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 138 / 184 ) is granted in part and denied in part as specified herein. (See pdf order for specifics.) It is further ordered that Respondents must file an answer within 120 days from the entry of this order (9/11/2020) responding to the remaining claims in Petitioner's first amended habeas corpus petition. (ECF No. 138 /[ 184]) It is further ordered that Petitioner's motion for evidentiary hearing (ECF No. 188 ) and motion for discovery (ECF No. 190 ) are denied. It is further ordered that, in all other respects, the scheduling order of December 28, 2016 (ECF No. 120 ), continues to govern proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER that Petitioner's motion (ECF No. 169 ) is denied; the scheduling order of December 28, 2016 (ECF No. 120 ) continues to govern proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying ECF No. 130 Motion for reconsideration; granting ECF No. 132 Motion for Extension of Time to file first amended petition; amended petition due by 1/15/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting ECF No. 121 Motion for Leave to Supplement Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying ECF No. 124 petitioner's Motion to re-impose stay; granting ECF No. 127 Motion to Extend Time to file first a mended petition. Amended Petition due by 10/17/2017. In all otherrespects, the scheduling order of12/28/2016 ECF No. [120[ will govern futureproceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAM LEONARD V. E.K.MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?