June 24, 2021 |
Filing
285
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, in accordance with the Ninth Circuits 281 order expanding the limited remand, respondents 269 motion for reconsideration is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Sonners 282 motion for reconsideration is DENI ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Sonner shall have 60 days from the date of this order within which to file points and authorities in support of excusing the procedural default of his claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 259 the scheduling order entered 10/2/2019, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
March 17, 2021 |
Filing
280
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 269 respondents motion for reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court issues the following indicative ruling under Rule 62.1 regarding the respondents motion: See Order for Details. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that 276 respondents unopposed motion for extension of time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of 11/16/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 278 petitioners motion for leave to file a sur- reply is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
October 2, 2019 |
Filing
259
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 254 petitioner's motion for reconsideration of this court's order denying his prior Rule 60(b) motion is GRANTED. This court's order of 6/23/2013, is vacated to the extent it dismissed claims in Sonner� 39;s amended petition ECF No. 96 as untimely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 45 days from the date on which this order is entered within which to file their answer to the following claims in the amended petition ECF No. 96 : C laims A-F, J-Z, AA-FF, HH, JJ-WW (except for PP4, TT2, TT10, and TT11), AAA-FFF, and LLL-YYY (except for XXX). Petitioner shall have 45 days following service of an answer by respondents to file and serve a reply. Respondents shall thereafter have 30 days following service of a reply to file and serve a response to the reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 255 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing
238
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS granting petitioner's motion to extend time 237 . Petitioner shall have until and including November 6, 2017, to file his reply in support of his motion to alter or amend judgment 233 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JRB)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing
231
ORDER that 96 Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability is issued as to the court's resolution of Claim PP(4). Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 23, 2015 |
Filing
229
ORDER that 228 Ex Parte Motion to Relieve Counsel Nicholas J Seymour as associate counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
224
ORDER that 223 Motion to Substitute Attorney is GRANTED. Brian C McComas is relieved as petitioner's associate counsel, and Nicholas Seymour is appointed as petitioner's associate counsel. Mr. Seymour is directed to file a verified petition pursuant to Local Rule IA 10-2 within 45 days of the filing of petitioner's application. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 14, 2014 |
Filing
222
ORDER that 186 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 187 Motion for Leave to Expand the Record is GRANTED under the terms discussed in the order. FURTHER ORDERED that 181 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and [2 18] Motion for Stay and Abeyance are DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 216 and 220 Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages are GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of February 20, 2014, and March 19, 2014, respectively. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 23, 2013 |
Filing
175
MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's Motion 174 to extend the time within which to file a reply to respondents' answer 171 and a motion for an evidentiary hearing. Both filings are now due September 23, 2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JRB) Modified on 7/23/2013 (JRB).
|
June 5, 2013 |
Filing
173
MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's Motion 172 to extend the time within which to file a reply to respondents' answer 171 and a motion for an evidentiary hearing. Both filings are now due August 8, 2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JRB)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
170
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 132 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 156 Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary hearing is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents shall have 45 days from the date on which thi s order is entered to file answer to remaining claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 165 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of 3/17/13. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing
144
MINUTE ORDER granting petitioner's motion for enlargement of time 143 . Petitioner shall have until 8/20/12 within which to file his opposition to respondents' motion to dismiss 132 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JRB)
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing
128
ORDER Granting 127 Motion to Lift Stay. Clerk shall administratively reopen case and substitute Renee Baker for E.K. McDaniel. Attorney General and Renee Baker answer due 3/9/2012. Replies due 45 days after service of answer. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|