August 28, 2018 |
Filing 1100
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1099 Order for Release of Exhibits addressed to Paris W. Robert. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward - Not at This Address. No new address. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing 1099
ORDER for Release of Exhibits. Deadline to return exhibits set for 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing 1098
JUDGMENT in favor of Securities & Exchange Commission against Global Express Capital Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC. (See Order for Details) Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing 1097
JUDGMENT in favor of Securities & Exchange Commission against Global Express Capital Mortgage Corp. (See Order for Details) Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing 1096
JUDGMENT in favor of Securities & Exchange Commission against Global Express Securities, Inc. (See Order for Details) Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing 1095
JUDGMENT in favor of Securities & Exchange Commission against Dawn M. Reese (See Order for Details). Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing 1094
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1092 Settlement Agreement, #1090 Settlement Agreement, #1091 Settlement Agreement, #1093 Settlement Agreement, by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Van Havermaat, David)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing 1093
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Van Havermaat, David)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing 1092
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Van Havermaat, David)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing 1091
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Van Havermaat, David)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing 1090
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Van Havermaat, David)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing 1089
NOTICE of Change of Address by David J Van Havermaat. (Van Havermaat, David)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 1088
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1087 Order on Mandate addressed to Said Mobin. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Attempted; Not Known - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing 1087
ORDER on Mandate as to #1083 USCA Order and #1085 USCA Mandate Affirming the judgment of the District Court re #1047 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/12/2014. (SLD)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 1085
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1083 USCA Order AFFIRMING the Judgment of the District Court re #1047 Notice of Appeal. (MMM)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing 1084
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1047 Notice of Appeal. Appellant's "petition for rehearing en banc" is construed as a timely motion for reconsideration en banc of the courts March 10, 2014 order. So construed, the motion for reconsideration en banc is denied on behalf of the court. No further motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of the court's March 10, 2014 order will be entertained in this closed case. (MMM)
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing 1083
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1047 Notice of Appeal. AFFIRMED. (MMM)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing 1082
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1078 Order addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing 1081
ORDER Denying as moot #1064 , #1066 , #1067 , and #1070 MOTIONS. Defendant intended to and actually did file these motions in her appellant proceeding before the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing 1080
ORDER Granting #1065 Motion for Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF ; CC: Connie Farris with Required forms - SLR)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing 1079
ORDER Granting #1041 Motion to Remove Attorney Gregory L. Wilde from Electronic Service List. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing 1078
ORDER Denying as moot #1039 Motion to Reconsider Order and #1044 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 3, 2013 |
Filing 1077
CORRECTION re #1047 Notice of Appeal; filed by Connie S. Farris (CC: USCA - AC)
|
June 27, 2013 |
Filing 1076
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1069 Transcript, addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR)
|
May 13, 2013 |
Filing 1075
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1074 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing 1074
ORDER Granting #1071 Motion Approving Application to Approve Receiver's Fees and Expenses Incurred After Final Account and Report. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing 1072
NOTICE Non-opposition re: re #1071 MOTION for Attorney Fees; filed by Canyon Lenders, LLC, James H Donell, Fred Han Mahkstedt, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
May 6, 2013 |
Filing 1073
LETTER from U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission requesting that this Court not expand the record on appeal. (AC)
|
April 18, 2013 |
Filing 1071
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc.. Responses due by 5/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
April 5, 2013 |
Filing 1070
EMERGENCY MOTION for Extension to File Opening. Motion ripe 4/5/2013. (SLR)
|
March 4, 2013 |
Filing 1069
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 1056 Reporter's Transcript of Motion Hearing, held on 12/5/2012, before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Court Reporter: Felicia Zabin, 702-676-1087. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing 1067
MOTION for Extension to File Opening Brief filed by Connie S. Farris. Motion ripe 2/19/2013. (SLR)
|
February 12, 2013 |
Filing 1068
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1047 Notice of Appeal. Appellants motion for extension to file the court transcript is granted. The transcript is due March 6, 2013. The opening brief is due April 15, 2013. The answering brief is due May 15, 2013. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. (EDS)
|
February 7, 2013 |
Filing 1066
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Court Transcript, filed by Connie S. Farris. Motion ripe 2/7/2013. ( CC: Court of Appeals. SLR)
|
January 25, 2013 |
Filing 1065
MOTION for Proof of Service, Notice of Court Filings, Motions and Order Filings by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Responses due by 2/11/2013. (SLR)
|
January 25, 2013 |
Filing 1064
MOTION to Amend "Motion to Prevent the Destruction of All Receivership Estate Records" by Defendants Connie S. Farris. Responses due by 2/11/2013. (CC: Court of Appeals SLR)
|
January 17, 2013 |
Filing 1063
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1047 Notice of Appeal filed by Canyon Lenders, LLC, Connie S. Farris, Roland Weinstein, Eleanor Weinstein, United States of America, Douglas Peterson, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, James H Donell. Appellants motions to prevent the destruction of records are denied. The motion to intervene, by James H. Donell, is granted for the limited purpose of resolving the motion to prevent the destruction of records and for any further proceedings regarding appellant's property held in receivership by Mr. Donell. (EDS)
|
January 15, 2013 |
Filing 1062
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 1/15/2013. A document requesting a Court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter (see F.R.C.P. 7). Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Connie Farris) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Transcript Order given to the ECRO's - SLR)
|
December 26, 2012 |
Filing 1061
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1060 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR)
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing 1060
ORDER Granting #1051 Final Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 18, 2012 |
Filing 1059
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1051 MOTION for Attorney Fees ; filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc.. (Moldo, Byron) .
|
December 17, 2012 |
Filing 1058
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 1056 Motion Hearing, addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR)
|
December 17, 2012 |
Filing 1057
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Defendants Connie S. Farris, re #1047 Notice of Appeal, 1056 Motion Hearing. (SLR)
|
December 6, 2012 |
Filing 1056
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2012 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Kandy Capozzi; Receiver's Counsel: Byron Moldo; Def Counsel: None Appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:10 AM - 9:20 AM; Courtroom: 6D; The Court notes that the only objection to Receiver's Motion #1051 was filed by Connie Farris #1055 . A discussion is held as to how all records could be retained. Although access to the records would not be as convenient, it is agreed that the records could be moved and retained in a less expensive storage facility where the boxes would be stacked. The Court would require Ms. Farris to fund the cost of storage in advance for a period of one year, together with the costs of moving if it is her desire to have them moved to a less expensive facility. Ms. Farris shall have thirty (30) days to pay these costs to the Receiver. If the Receiver has not received the costs at the end of the thirty-day period, then the Receiver is authorized to destroy the records. Mr. Maldo will send Ms. Farris a letter conveying the information and will submit a proposed order for the Court's approval. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KMC) Modified on 12/13/2012 to correct hearing date.(KMC).
|
November 30, 2012 |
Filing 1055
MOTION to Deny the Destruction of Records and Documents by Interested Parties Connie S. Farris. Responses due by 12/17/2012. (SLR)
|
November 29, 2012 |
Filing 1054
NOTICE of Appeals Paid re #1053 Appeal Fees Paid Connie S. Farris. (AC)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing 1053
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 15468 re #1047 Notice of Appeal. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (SLR)
|
November 14, 2012 |
Filing 1052
NOTICE of Hearing re #1051 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
November 14, 2012 |
Filing 1051
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Interested Party Receiver James H Donell, Responses due by 12/1/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
November 7, 2012 |
Filing 1050
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1047 Notice of Appeal filed by Connie S. Farris. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $455.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (AC)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing 1049
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #1047 Notice of Appeal filed by Connie S. Farris. USCA Case Number 12-17476. (AC)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing 1048
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #1047 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (AC)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing 1047
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1043 Judgment by Connie S. Farris. Filing fee NOT paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (SLR)
|
October 29, 2012 |
Filing 1046
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1043 Judgment addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not resend. (SLR)
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing 1045
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/25/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Kandy Capozzi. The Deputy Clerk has been notified by Byron Moldo, attorney for Receiver James Donell, that Mr. Robert has paid the specified sum pursuant to Order of the Court #1035 . ACCORDINGLY, the status hearing set 10/31/2012 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KMC)
|
October 22, 2012 |
Filing 1044
MOTION to Extend Time to file her brief by Interested Party Connie S. Farris. Motion ripe 10/22/2012. (SLR) (Main Document 1044 replaced on 10/22/2012) (SLR).
|
October 22, 2012 |
Filing 1043
JUDGMENT in favor of Securities & Exchange Commission and against Connie S. Farris in the amount of $120,000.00. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 18, 2012 |
Filing 1042
NOTICE filed by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Final Judgment)(Van Havermaat, David)
|
October 10, 2012 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1041 NOTICE: ERROR: Wrong event selected by Attorney Gregory Wilde; CORRECTION: Court modified event as #1041 MOTION to remove from the Electronic Service List in this case, which is located under the "Motions and Related Filings" section, then "Motions" category. (no image attached)(SRK)
|
October 9, 2012 |
Filing 1041
MOTION to remove from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Canyon Lenders, LLC, James H Donell, Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc., United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein. (Wilde, Gregory) Event type corrected on 10/10/2012 (SRK).
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing 1040
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1025 Order addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing 1039
OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider 1038 Order filed by Defendants Connie S. Farris. (SLR)
|
September 24, 2012 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1039 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider 1038 Order. Wrong event selected by court. Document converted from MOTION to Appoint Counsel to OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider 1038 Order. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing 1038
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 9/14/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Kandy Capozzi. Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief #1037 is GRANTED to the extent the time for Plaintiff and Defendant Connie Farris to file a brief regarding the disgorgement amount is extended to October 22, 2012. Regarding the request for appointment of counsel: There is no constitutional right to the appointment of counsel in civil cases. Ivey v. Bd. of Regents of Univ. of Alaska, 673 F.2d 266, 269 (9th Cir. 1982). In determining whether counsel should be appointed, the Court has discretion to consider three relevant factors: (1) the plaintiff's financial resources; (2) the efforts made by the plaintiff to secure counsel; and (3) the meritoriousness of the plaintiff's claim. Id. Plaintiff has not presented sufficient evidence to persuade this Court to appoint counsel to represent her. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel #1037 is DENIED.( Brief due by 10/22/2012.); (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KMC)
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing 1037
MOTION to Extend Time to File Brief and Appoint Counsel. by Connie S. Farris. Motion ripe 9/10/2012. (SLR)
|
August 28, 2012 |
Filing 1036
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1034 and #1035 Order, addressed to Said Mobin. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (Attachments: #1 Mail Returned) (SLR)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing 1035
ORDER that Robert shall pay $17,500.00 to the Receiver. The Pending Order to Show Cause is Continued to 10/31/2012 at 9:00 am as a Status Conference. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing 1034
ORDER Denying #1019 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Denying #1020 Motion for Violation of Sixth Amendment Right. Brief due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing 1033
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 1031 Show Cause Hearing,,, ; filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc. [[Proposed] Order Regarding Settlement of Order to Show Cause re Contempt Directed to Paris Robert (with Proof of Service attached)]; filed by James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver /. (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 16, 2012 |
Filing 1032
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 1031 Show Cause Hearing addressed to Sheryl Lubotsky. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR)
|
August 14, 2012 |
Filing 1031
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 8/14/2012 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Receiver's Counsel: Byron Moldo; Counsel for Paris Robert: T. Louis Palazzo; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:28 AM - 9:31 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell and Paris Robert are present. Counsel advise that the matter has been settled. Mr. Moldo outlines the settlement for the record. The Court directs Mr. Moldo to submit a proposed order within one week. Status Conference set for 10/31/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson, to be vacated if Mr. Robert complies with the payment of a specific amount by 10/15/2012. Submission of Proposed Order due by 8/21/2012.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
July 27, 2012 |
Filing 1030
NOTICE CHANGE OF HEARING DATE: As Order #1029 inadvertently scheduled the hearing on a date counsel had indicated they were unavailable, the Show Cause Hearing is rescheduled on 8/14/2012 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached)(KMC)
|
July 27, 2012 |
Filing 1029
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #1028 Stipulation to Continue Show Cause Hearing. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 26, 2012 |
Filing 1028
STIPULATION re 1027 Notice of Hearing, ; Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue Show Cause Hearing by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, Paris W. Robert, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc.. (Palazzo, T.)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing 1027
NOTICE of Hearing Change: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, Show Cause Hearing previously scheduled on 7/12/2012 is rescheduled on 7/31/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (Note: Mr. Robert notified telephonically by Courtroom Administrator.)(no image attached)(KMC)
|
June 8, 2012 |
Filing 1026
NOTICE re: 1024 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS; filed by Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Sheryl A. Lubotsky, Robert Mohr, Douglas Peterson, United States of America, Eleanor Weinstein, Roland Weinstein, Receiver James H Donell, Defendants Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction, Sundance Pool and Spas, Inc. (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing 1025
ORDER Granting #1022 Motion for Attorney Fees [Twenty-Sixth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses]. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing 1024
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2012 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Receiver's Counsel: Byron Moldo; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:08 AM - 9:11 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present. The Court notes that no one has opposed the motion and asks if anyone in the Courtroom has an objection. Hearing none, the Court makes findings for the record and GRANTS #1022 Twenty-Sixth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses. Also present in the Courtroom is Paris Robert. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that the contempt proceedings against Mr. Robert remains unresolved. A Show Cause Hearing is set for 7/12/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Mr. Robert is ordered to be present. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) Modified on 5/16/2012 to insert correct hearing date. (PAV).
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing 1023
NOTICE of Hearing on #1022 MOTION for Attorney Fees [Twenty-Sixth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses]by Receiver James H Donell, (Moldo, Byron) Docket entry relationship modified on 4/27/2012 (SRK).
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing 1022
MOTION for Attorney Fees [Twenty-Sixth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses]; filed by Receiver James H Donell, Responses due by 5/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron) Modified text on 4/27/2012 (SRK).
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing 1021
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 1/9/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court currently has custody of exhibits in this action. It having been determined these exhibits can be returned to the parties in accordance with LR 79-1, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties have 21 days from the date of this Order within which to claim the exhibits from the Clerk of Court in accordance with said Local Rule or said exhibits shall be destroyed by the Court. Please contact Peggie Vannozzi @ 702-464-5429 to make arrangements to have the exhibits picked up. Deadline to return exhibits set for 1/30/2012.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing 1020
MOTION in Pro Se of Violation of 6th Amendment Right to Effective Assistance of Counsel, to Vacate Judgment, District Court Failure to Follow the Order of the Order from the Appeal by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Responses due by 12/10/2011. (MMM)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing 1019
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Motion ripe 11/23/2011. (MMM)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing 1018
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1015 Order, addressed to Said Mobin. No other address available. Not remailed. (MMM)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing 1017
ERROR Filed in error. CORRECTION: document terminated by Court. NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1016 Notice (Other): ERROR: Wrong event selected; CORRECTION: Attorney Shawn W. Miller advised to refile document using the correct event, "Miscellaneous Relief requesting to be removed from the notification list, found under the Motions category. (no image attached) Modified on 9/21/2011(RFJ)
|
September 16, 2011 |
Filing 1016
NOTICE of discontinuance of direct notification of party; filed by Interested Party Douglas Peterson (Miller, Shawn)
|
September 13, 2011 |
Filing 1015
ORDER Granting #1012 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Twenty-Fifth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses) filed by James H Donell. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 13, 2011 |
Filing 1014
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2011 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Receiver's Counsel: Byron Moldo; Def Counsel: none; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:04 AM - 9:05 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present. No one has filed an opposition to the motion and no one is present to lodge an objection to the motion. The Court grants #1012 Receiver's Twenty-Fifth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses. The Court signs the proposed order. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that two items remain open in this matter: 1) the mediation with Fidelity Title was unsuccessful and that the case will need to be litigated and 2) the Order to Show Cause on Paris Robert. Mr. Moldo reports that Mr. Robert has not interfered with the Receiver's actions. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing 1013
NOTICE re: #1012 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Receiver James H Donell (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron) Added docket entry relationship on 8/26/2011 (RFJ).
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing 1012
MOTION for Attorney Fees [Twenty-Fifth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses] filed by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 9/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
August 5, 2011 |
Filing 1011
NOTICE of Executor filed by Interested Party Douglas Peterson Douglas Peterson, Executor of the Estate of Donald E. Goodsell (Miller, Shawn)
|
August 2, 2011 |
Filing 1010
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 8/2/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. It appearing that substantive issues have been litigated, this case is administratively terminated. Receiver/Receiver's counsel may continue to file any motions related to the receivership. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing 1009
NOTICE of Change of Address by Randolph L. Howard. (Howard, Randolph)
|
April 18, 2011 |
Filing 1008
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1007 Order on Motion, addressed to Said Mobin. No other address available, not remailed. (MMM)
|
April 14, 2011 |
Filing 1007
ORDER Granting #1004 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release With The Travelers Indemnity Company, American Exchange, Inc., Hacienda Structures LLC, Blackstone Structures, and Halston Michael. FURTHER ORDERED that the Settlement Agreement and Release attached as Exhibit "A" to the Motion is approved. FURTHER ORDERED that the Receiver is authorized and instructed to execute all documents and/or instruments, and to do all of the acts necessary to effect the Agreement. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 8, 2011 |
Filing 1006
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #1004 MOTION To Approve Settlement Agreement And Release With The Travelers Indemnity Company, American Exchange, Inc., Hacienda Structures LLC, Blackstone Structures, And Halston Michael; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of James H. Donell. [Notice Of Non-Opposition To Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, To Approve Settlement Agreement And Release With The Travelers Indemnity Company, American Exchange, Inc., Hacienda Structures LLC, Blackstone Structures, And Halston Michael] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing 1005
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1003 Order addressed to Said Mobin. No other address available, not remailed. (MMM)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing 1004
MOTION To Approve Settlement Agreement And Release With The Travelers Indemnity Company, American Exchange, Inc., Hacienda Structures LLC, Blackstone Structures, And Halston Michael; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of James H. Donell by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 4/4/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing 1003
ORDER Approving 24th Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing 1002
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2011 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:27 AM - 9:30 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel Byron Moldo. No one has opposed Receiver's 24th Interim Application for Fees and Expenses. No one is present in the courtroom to oppose the request. The Court makes findings for the record and GRANTS #1000 Receiver's MOTION for Twenty-Fourth Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that only one more related action remains at issue. Counsel hope to settle that action by mediation. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 1001
NOTICE re #1000 MOTION for Hearing; filed by Receiver James H Donell (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 1000
MOTION for Hearing; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 2/25/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing 999
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #996 Judgment addressed to Said Mobin. No other address available; not remailed. (MMM)
|
December 27, 2010 |
Filing 998
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #994 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law,, addressed to Said Mobin. (ECS, no new address, did not resend)
|
December 27, 2010 |
Filing 997
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #996 Judgment. (Went, Joseph)
|
December 23, 2010 |
Filing 996
JUDGMENT in favor of James H Donell against Samir Ghazal. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 21, 2010 |
Filing 995
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Receiver James H Donell [Proposed] Judgment Re: Ghazal Litigation (Case No. A477918). (Went, Joseph)
|
December 17, 2010 |
Filing 994
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. IT IS ORDERED that the Galaxy Lien is invalid and unenforceable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Galaxy Construction is not entitled to recover under that surety bond for release of court-ordered deposit posted by First American, Bond No. 7586815. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the surety bond for release of court-ordered deposit posted by First American, Bond No. 7586816, is discharged and First American is released from further responsibility in connection with said bond. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 6, 2010 |
Filing 993
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #991 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law addressed to Said Mobin. (Did not remail, no new address.) (DXS)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing 992
ORDER Exonerating Bond. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, cc: finance)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing 991
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 990
EXHIBIT LIST.(EDS)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 989
EXHIBIT LIST.(EDS)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 988
Trial EXHIBIT LIST.(ECS)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 987
EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Samir Ghazal.(PAV)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 986
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Bench Trial held on 11/29/2010 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Receiver's Counsel: Joseph Went; Other Counsel: Samir Ghazal (pro se); Gregory Wilde and Kevin Soderstrom for Galaxy Construction; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:32 AM - 2:32 PM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donell is present. The Court makes findings and DENIES the following motions: #962 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Galaxy Construction, #964 Motion in Limine filed by Receiver, and #974 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Receiver. Phase one of the trial concerns Samir Ghazal. Ghazal's exhibit 501 is marked and admitted. Receiver's exhibits marked and admitted. Witnesses called by Receiver: James H. Donell and Samir Ghazal. The Court makes findings that Ghazal is a unsecured claimant and not entitled to the proceeds of the bond #671 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that #691 is discharged and First American Title is released. Bond exonerated, to be returned to legal owner. The next phase of trial concerns Galaxy Construction. Exhibits marked and admitted. Witnesses called by Galaxy Construction: Ronald H. Byrd and Robert Richard Holgate. No witnesses called by Receiver. Arguments heard. Matter submitted to Court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 985
EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction.(Soderstrom, Kevin)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 984
PROPOSED Findings of Fact by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction.(Soderstrom, Kevin)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 983
EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction.(Soderstrom, Kevin)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 982
TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction.(Soderstrom, Kevin)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 981
TRIAL BRIEF Re: Ghazal Litigation (Case No. A477918) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 5, #2 Exhibit 6 thru 11)(Went, Joseph)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 980
TRIAL BRIEF Re: Galaxy Construction (Case No. A470858) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 5, #2 Exhibit 6 thru 10)(Went, Joseph)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 979
PROPOSED Findings of Fact by Receiver James H Donell re: Galaxy Construction Litigation (Case No. A470858).(Went, Joseph)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 978
PROPOSED Findings of Fact by Receiver James H Donell Re: Ghazal Litigation (Case No. A477918).(Went, Joseph)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing 977
EXHIBIT LIST Re: Ghazal Litigation (Case No. A477918) by Receiver James H Donell.(Went, Joseph)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing 976
EXHIBIT LIST Re: Galaxy Construction Litigation (Case No. A470858) by Receiver James H Donell.(Went, Joseph)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing 975
RESPONSE to #974 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction. Replies due by 12/4/2010. (MJZ)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing 973
REPLY to Response to #962 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction. Defendant/Counterclaimant's Reply to Receiver James H. Donnell's Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Fred Hans Mahlstedt d/b/a Galaxy Construction (Doc 962) and Defendant/Counterclaimant's Opposition to Countermotion for Summary Judgment (Wilde, Gregory)
|
November 15, 2010 |
Filing 972
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 11/15/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #969 Response to Motion. This response contains a countermotion for summary judgment. The countermotion should have been filed as a separate document. Responses to the Countermotion are due by 11/19/2010. ADDITIONALLY, IT IS ORDERED that Receiver is to furnish the Court with a courtesy copy of #969 forthwith. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing 971
RESPONSE to #964 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Fred Hans Mahlstedt d/b/a Galaxy Construction From Offering Any Evidence of Damages and Excluding Documents or Witnesses at Trial Not Previously Produced, filed by Defendant Fred Han Mahlstadt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Wilde, Gregory) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (SRK).
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing 970
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Calendar Call held on 11/9/2010 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Receiver's Counsel: Joseph Went ; Def Counsel: Gregory Wilde for Defendant Mahlstedt d/b/a Galaxy Construction and Samir Ghazal (pro se); Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:06 AM - 9:10 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Bench Trial is set for 11/29/2010 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are due by 11/24/2010. Courtesy copies of the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are to be provided to chambers on a CD, in WordPerfect format. Trial Briefs are due by 11/24/2010.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing 974
Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 12/2/2010. (MJZ)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing 969
RESPONSE to #962 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Receiver James H Donell. Replies due by 11/25/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Went, Joseph)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing 967
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 11/3/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #962 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment DefendantCounterclaimant's Motion For Summary Judgment, ( Responses due by 11/8/2010., Replies due by 11/10/2010.) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing 968
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #963 Klingele Minute Order, addressed to Said Mobin. New address unknown. Did not remail. (EDS)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing 966
ORDER REGARDING TRIAL. Bench Trial on construction claims set for 11/15/2010 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Calendar Call set for 11/9/2010 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Exhibit List due by 11/10/2010. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 11/10/2010. Proposed Voir Dire due by 11/10/2010. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 11/10/2010. Trial Briefs due by 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing 965
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 11/2/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #961 Proposed Order Submission, #958 Letter, #960 Response to Motion. The Court has reviewed these documents and determined that the Bench Trial set for 11/15/2010 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson will address the claims of Samir Ghazal as well as the claims of Fred Hans Mahlstedt d/b/a Galaxy Construction. Calendar Call set for 11/9/2010 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 1, 2010 |
Filing 964
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Fred Hans Mahlstedt d/b/a Galaxy Construction From Offering Any Evidence of Damages and Excluding Documents or Witnesses at Trial Not Previously Produced by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 11/18/2010. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing 963
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #962 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment DefendantCounterclaimant's Motion For Summary Judgment : Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/25/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing 962
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction. Responses due by 11/18/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wilde, Gregory)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing 961
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #944 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims Set Forth in Complaints Filed in Eight Judicial District Court, Case No. A470858 (Galaxy Construction) and Case No. A477918 (Ghazal) MOTION to Dismiss the Claims Set Forth in Complaints Filed in Eight Judicial District Court, Case No. A470858 (Galaxy Construction) and Case No. A477918 (Ghazal) ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 960
RESPONSE to #958 Letter ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Replies due by 10/30/2010. (Went, Joseph) Docket entry relationship modified on 10/22/2010 (SRK).
|
October 13, 2010 |
Filing 959
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 956 Order on Motion to Dismiss addressed to Said Mobin. New address unknown; did not remail. (EDS)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing 958
LETTER from Samir A. G. Ghazal. (EDS)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing 957
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2010 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:15 AM - 9:17 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present, represented by Byron Moldo. The Court has reviewed the motion. No one has filed an opposition to the motion. No one is present to object to the motion. The Court makes findings for the record and grants #954 Motion for Twenty-Third Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that one of the related cases has settled and settlement documents have been circulated. The Court and Mr. Moldo discuss what matters remain outstanding. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
October 4, 2010 |
Filing 956
ORDER granting in part and denying in part #944 Motion to Dismiss. Before the Court is Receiver James H. Donells Motion to Dismiss Claims (#944) of Galaxy Construction, Case No. A470858, and Ghazal, Case No. A477918. The cases were originally filed in the Eighth Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada. The Court, on April 10, 2009, entered its Order (#914), finding that it had diversity and ancillary jurisdiction over the claims raised in state court in both cases, and ordering that the cases be litigated to a conclusion before this, the receivership court. The instant motion seeks dismissal of both cases based on failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.. Pro 41(b). Galaxy Construction has filed an Opposition (#945). Ghazal has not responded. Galaxy argues that the reason the matter has not been tried to a conclusion is attributable to the Receiver who requested discovery and offered to initiate a proposed stipulation for limited discovery. Upon that representation, the Court deferred the setting of a trial date until completion of discovery. While those facts do not entirely absolve Galaxy of the responsibility to diligently prosecute its case, it is enough to support denial of a motion to dismiss after only 9 months of inactivity. However, with respect to claimant Ghazal, there has been no response to the instant motion or evidence of prosecution on claimants part for a much longer period. The Court has not heard from claimant Ghazal since the hearing of April 10, 2009, a period of 17 months. He has not contacted the Court, filed opposition to the current motion to dismiss or requested a trial setting. The case will soon be 7 years old. While there has been a stay for much of that time, it has been 17 months since the Court announced it was ready to set the matter for trial. Unlike Galaxy, there is no evidence Ghazal was waiting for a stipulation regarding discovery. Presumptively, Ghazal received mailed notice of the Receivers Motion to Dismiss yet did file an opposition. Additional warnings to Ghazal are not likely to produce a different response. Further delay is prejudicial to the receivership which was opened in 2003. It is should be closed in the near future and the remaining assets distributed to those entitled. Accordingly, the Receivers Motion to Dismiss (#944), is Granted in part and Denied in part. It is ordered that the motion to dismiss is granted as to the claim of Ghazal. It further ordered that the motion to dismiss is denied as to the claim of Galaxy Construction. It is furthered ordered that trial for the claim of Galaxy Construction is set on the stacked calendar of November 15, 2010, with calendar call November 9, 2010, at 9am in Courtroom 6D. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/4/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
September 24, 2010 |
Filing 955
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #954 MOTION for Hearing Twenty-Third Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, And Randolph L. Howard In Support Thereof. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
September 24, 2010 |
Filing 954
MOTION for Hearing Twenty-Third Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, And Randolph L. Howard In Support Thereof by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 9/24/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing 953
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #951 Order addressed to Said Mobin. (ECS, no new address, did not resend)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing 952
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #946 Notice (Other). Notice Of Entry Of Order Approving Twenty-Second Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 951
ORDER Approving Twenty-Second Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses re #949 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing 950
(1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Randolph L. Howard and Byron Z. Moldo are in violation of Special Order 109, manually filing document re: #949 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. All documents filed in connection with a case that has been assigned to the CM/ECF system will be filed electronically. Please review Special Order 109 available on the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov for compliance when electronically filing documents. (no image attached) (RFJ)
|
June 17, 2010 |
Filing 949
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Receiver James H Donell. (EDS)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing 948
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2010 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:48 AM - 9:55 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel Byron Moldo. The Court asks if anyone has filed any objections to the motion and whether anyone is present in the courtroom to object to the motion. The Court grants #947 Receiver's 22nd Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. Mr. Moldo will submit a proposed order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 947
MOTION for Hearing Twenty-Second Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James H. Donnell, Byron Z. Moldo, and Randolph L. Howard in Support Thereof by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 5/17/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2 Exh D Twenty Second Interim Application for Approval of Reeiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Decl. of James H. Donnell, Byron Z Moldo, and Randolph L. Howard in support thereof)(Moldo, Byron)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 946
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell Notice of Hearing on Receiver's Twenty-Second Interim Application For Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (Moldo, Byron)
|
March 19, 2010 |
Filing 945
RESPONSE to #944 Motion to Dismiss; filed by Defendant Fred Han Mahlstadt. Replies due by 3/29/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilde, Gregory) Docket entry relationship added on 3/29/2010. (MJZ)
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing 944
MOTION to Dismiss the Claims Set Forth in Complaints Filed in Eight Judicial District Court, Case No. A470858 (Galaxy Construction) and Case No. A477918 (Ghazal) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 3/22/2010. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit 6 through 11)(Went, Joseph)
|
March 2, 2010 |
Filing 943
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #941 Order. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Twenty-First Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing 942
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #941 Order addressed to Said Mobin. No new address available; unable to resend. (EDS)
|
January 20, 2010 |
Filing 941
ORDER APPROVING #936 Twenty-First Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 940
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2010 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM - 9:05 Am; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver's counsel Byron Moldo is present by telephone. No one is present in the Courtroom, and no opposition to the Receiver's motion has been filed. The Court makes findings for the record and grants #936 Receiver's 21st Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. The Court will sign the proposed order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing 939
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
December 21, 2009 |
Filing 938
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 12/21/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Hearing on #926 Twenty-First Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses is set for 1/14/2010 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. The Receiver and Receiver's counsel may participate by calling the Court's "Meet-me" line, 702-464-5625. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing 937
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell of Hearing on Receiver's Twenty-First Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached certificate of service) on 12/11/2009 @ 9:00 a.m. (Moldo, Byron)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing 936
MOTION for Hearing on Twenty-First Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, and Randolph L. Howard in Support Thereof (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 11/12/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
September 17, 2009 |
Filing 935
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #934 Order on Motion. Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing 934
ORDER granting James H. Donnell's #931 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/15/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 933
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #931 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada Inc. ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James J. Donell (with attached proof of service) MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada Inc. ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James J. Donell (with attached proof of service) ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Order Granting Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, To Approve Settlement Agreement And Release With Fidelity National Title Agency Of Nevada, Inc. (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 932
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to #931 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada Inc. ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James J. Donell (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron) Event type modified on 9/22/2009. (RFJ)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing 931
MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada Inc. ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James J. Donell (with attached proof of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 9/14/2009. (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing 930
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #929 Order addressed to Dixon. (ECS, no new address, did not resend)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing 929
ORDER re: anonymous letter and attachments received by the Court on 8/4/2009. Before the Court is an anonymous letter and attachments received from return address PO Box 1563, Las Vegas, NV 89125. The Court has reviewed the letter and documentations and determinated that the letter should be shared with counsel for the parties in this case, with counsel for related case 2:03-cv-1514-KJD-LRL and with the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to send copies of the subject letter to counsel in this case, to counsel in 2:03-cv-1514-KJD-LRL and to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada. The original letter and accompanying documentation will not be filed, however will be available for inspection in the Office of the Court Clerk. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; copies of the letter have been mailed to counsel as ordered by the Court; copy of order and letter have been mailed to U.S. Attorney for District of Nevada - PAV)
|
July 17, 2009 |
Filing 928
ORDER Approving #924 Receiver's 20th Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. See document for specifics. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/27/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
July 17, 2009 |
Filing 927
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2009 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM - 9:05 Am; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell appears with counsel, Byron Moldo. The Court has reviewed Receiver's 20th Interim Application for Approval of Fees and Expenses #924 . No one has filed an opposition, and no one appears in the courtroom to oppose the motion. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED THAT #924 Receiver's 20th Interim Application for Approval of Fees and Expenses is granted. The Court signs the proposed order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 926
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell Of Change Of Hearing Date On Receivers Twentieth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 925
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell of Hearing on Twentieth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 924
MOTION for Hearing on Twentieth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, And Randolph L. Howard In Support Thereof (with attached proof of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 7/2/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing 923
ORDER granting #921 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Richard A Schonfeld withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 6/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS; cc: Connie Farris)
|
June 19, 2009 |
Filing 922
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #921 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Counsel Richard A. Schonfeld's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Richard A. Schonfeld. by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
June 19, 2009 |
Filing 921
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Counsel Richard A. Schonfeld's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Richard A. Schonfeld. by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Motion ripe 6/19/2009. (Schonfeld, Richard) #922 Corrected image filed on 6/19/09. (MJZ)
|
May 22, 2009 |
Filing 920
ORDER GRANTING #919 Stipulation between James H. Donnell, Permanent Receiver, and the Travelers Indemnity Company, for Relief from the Stay to Authorize the Filing and Prosecution of a Complaint. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/22/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
May 21, 2009 |
Filing 919
STIPULATION Between James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, And The Travelers Indemnity Company, For Relief From The Stay To Authorize The Filing And Prosecution Of A Complaint; Order (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PART II)(Moldo, Byron)
|
April 15, 2009 |
Filing 918
DECLARATION of James Donell re #568 Response to Motion for Leave to File Document ; [Supplemental Declaration in Support of Receiver's Crossmotion for Summary Judgment] by Receiver James H Donell. (Howard, Randolph)
|
April 10, 2009 |
Filing 917
ORDER approving #911 Request for Nineteenth Interim application for approval of receiver's fees. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 10, 2009 |
Filing 916
ORDER on #909 Motion approving payment of IRS, and Finding that the receiver holds the funds in the receivership estate in constructive trust for defrauded investors. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 10, 2009 |
Filing 915
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2009 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: None appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:04 AM - 9:12 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Also Present: Receiver James Donnell with Byron Moldon and Randolph Howard, counsel; Kevin Soderstrom for Claimant Fred Hans Mahlstedt dba Galaxy Construction; Claimant Samir Ghazal in proper person. The Court, having received no objection and having heard no objection at this hearing ORDERS the following motions granted: #909 Motion Approving And Authorizing Payment Of Claim Of Internal Revenue Service; and 2) Finding That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Constructive Trust For The Defrauded Investors.; and #911 Nineteenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses. The Court makes findings for the record and signs the proposed orders. Mr. Howard asks the Court to rule on #68 Receiver's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment with regard to Mr. Ghazal's claims before setting a trial date. The Court will review that motion and issue a ruling and a trial date which the Court may set in the first week of May, 2009, depending upon its May 4, 2009 trial schedule. Mr. Howard requests a discovery plan for the Galaxy Construction claim. The Court directs counsel to file stipulation on discovery on this issue and include proposed dates for trial. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing 914
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 3/25/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Presently before the Court is Samir Ghazal's Motion for Leave of Court to Complete Litigation #551 . Also before the Court is Fred Hans Mahlstedt dba Galaxy Construction's Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation #775 and Motion for Hearing #804 . On January 15, 2009, the Court ordered 905 the Receiver and Mahlstedt to file simultaneous briefs on the issue of the Court extending its ancillary jurisdiction over the state court claims for trial in this Court. Only the Receiver replied #907 . Accordingly, the Court finds that it has diversity and ancillary jurisdiction over the claims raised in state court. Therefore, Motions [#551], #775 , and #804 are denied. A status conference is set for April 10, 2009 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson to set trial dates in these actions (Please note: This is the same time set for Receiver's 19th Interim Application for Fees and Expenses.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
March 18, 2009 |
Filing 913
ORDER Granting #908 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Byron Z. Moldo. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 912
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell Of Hearing On Receivers Nineteenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses (with attached Certificate of Service); Hearing Date: April 10, 2009 @ 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom 6D (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Hearing on 19th Interim App-PART II)(Moldo, Byron)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 911
MOTION for Hearing on Nineteenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, And James T. Schaefer In Support Thereof (with attached Certificate of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 3/17/2009. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 19th Interim Application-PART II, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-E, #5 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 910
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell Notice Of Hearing On Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order: 1) Approving And Authorizing Payment Of Claim Of Internal Revenue Service; And 2) Finding That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Constructive Trust For The Defrauded Investors (with attached Certificate of Service)-Hearing Date: April 10, 2009 @ 9:00 a.m.; Dept. 6D (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Hearing - Part II)(Moldo, Byron)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 909
MOTION 1) Approving And Authorizing Payment Of Claim Of Internal Revenue Service; and 2) Finding That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Constructive Trust For The Defrauded Investors ; Memoranduim Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration Of James H. Donell (with attached Certificate of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 4/4/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part I, #2 Exhibit A - Part II, #3 Exhibit A - Part III, #4 Exhibit A - Part IV, #5 Exhibit B & C, #6 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 908
MOTION to Substitute Attorney (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 3/17/2009. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Substitution of Attorney - Part II)(Moldo, Byron)
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing 907
BRIEF re 905 Minute Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,, ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. [Receiver James H. Donell's Brief Regarding This Court's Jurisdiction of Claims Presented in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A470858 as Requested in This Court's Minute Order of January 15, 2009] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-G, #3 Exhibit H-J)(Went, Joseph)
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing 906
REPLY to Response to filed by Receiver James H Donell. Reply of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Affidavit of Mr. Robert in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt Directed to Paris W. Robert [Request for Hearing] (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
January 15, 2009 |
Filing 905
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 1/15/2009. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #775 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation with Certificate of Service. Counsel are directed to file simultaneous briefs, by 1/30/2009, on the issue of whether this Court can conduct the trial on the claims contained in the state court litigation #A470858. Simultaneous Reply briefs are due by 2/6/2009. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
January 13, 2009 |
Filing 904
ORDER granting #892 Motion to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents. Receiver is authorized to donate or dispose of the remaining contents of the Storage Unit. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/13/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - OXC)
|
January 12, 2009 |
Filing 903
STIPULATION re #892 MOTION to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached proof of service) MOTION to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached proof of service) ; STIPULATION RE: MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO DONATE OR DISPOSE OF STORAGE UNIT CONTENTS; ORDER (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
January 12, 2009 |
Filing 902
AFFIDAVIT re 901 Ex Parte Document, ; Affidavit of Paris Robert in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, for Order to Show Cause re:Contempt Directed to Paris W. Robert; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo and Vera Panjanon by Interested Party Paris W. Robert. (Winterton, David)
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing 900
ORDER on Mandate as to 899 Proposed Order on Mandate affirming, reversing and remanding judgment of the District Court. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/12/08. (OXC)
|
December 11, 2008 |
Filing 898
MANDATE of USCA as to #529 Notice of Appeal; #615 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Connie S. Farris and #632 Notice of Appeal filed by Dawn M. Reese. The decision of the District Court affirmed in part; reversed and remanded in part. (SRK)
|
December 11, 2008 |
Filing 897
MEMORANDUM of USCA as to #529 Notice of Appeal; #615 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Connie S. Farris and #632 Notice of Appeal filed by Dawn M. Reese. The decision of the District Court is affirmed in part; reversed and remanded in part (SRK)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 896
RESPONSE to #892 MOTION to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached proof of service) MOTION to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached proof of service), filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Defendant Connie Farris' Opposition to Motion of James H. Donnell, Permanent Receiver, to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents; Declaration of James H. Donnell (w/attached proof of service) Replies due by 12/15/2008. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
November 18, 2008 |
Filing 895
ORDER Approving #890 Eighteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/18/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 18, 2008 |
Filing 894
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:14 AM - 9:16 AM; Courtroom: 6D; granting #890 Motion for Hearing. Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel, Byron Moldo. No one has filed or voiced an objection to Receiver's 18th Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses #890 . IT IS ORDERED that Receiver's 18th Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses #890 is granted. The order is signed in open court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 892
MOTION to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Donate or Dispose of Storage Unit Contents; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached proof of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 12/1/2008. (Moldo, Byron)
|
October 31, 2008 |
Filing 893
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/31/2008 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. Crtrm Administrator: Alana Kamaka; Pla Counsel: Byron Z. Moldo and Anthony A. Friedman; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:36:04-3:18:24; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3C; Also present: T. Louis Palazzo, Counsel for Contemnor; Paris Robert; and James H. Donnell, Receiver. Court confers with and hears representations of counsel. The Court finds the Receiver agrees the question of Mr. Roberts financial condition is now moot. The Receiver and Mr. Robert would like to proceed to the merits of the contempt citation. The Court will make recommendations to District Judge Dawson as stated on record. ORDER Mr. Robert shall file a response to the Receiver's motion for contempt by 1/12/2009. The Receiver shall reply by 2/2/2009. DETAILED MINUTE ORDER IS ATTACHED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AKK)
|
October 30, 2008 |
Filing 891
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell of Hearing on Receiver Eighteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver Fees and Expenses (with attached proof of service) - Hearing Date: 11/18/2008 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6D (Moldo, Byron)
|
October 30, 2008 |
Filing 890
MOTION for Hearing on Eighteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereof (with attached proof of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 10/30/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Exhibit D - E, #3 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
October 17, 2008 |
Filing 889
Supplemental BRIEF re 886 Status Conference,,,, ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Supplemental Brief of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, Re Status Conference Concerning Paris Robert (with attached certificate of service). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G - K)(Friedman, Anthony)
|
October 2, 2008 |
Filing 888
ORDER granting #874 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 10/02/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAP)
|
September 29, 2008 |
Filing 887
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 835 Evidentiary Hearing, held on 4/1/2008, before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Court Reporter: Felicia Zabin, 702-676-1087. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/20/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2008. (FRZ)
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 886
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/18/2008 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. Crtrm Administrator: Alana Kamaka; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:46-2:41:19; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3C; Present are: Attorney T. Louis Palazzo for Interested Party, Paris W. Robert who is present in court. Attorneys Byron Z. Moldo and Anthony A. Friedman for Receiver James H. Donnell. After conferring with and hearing representations of counsel, the Court determined that more time is needed to allow the parties and the Court an opportunity to familiarize themselves with the April 1, 2008, hearing before Judge Dawson and any previous history that might impact that hearing. Mr. Palazzo informs the Court that he does want to preserve the right to conduct discovery. ORDER Counsel will have until Friday, 10/17/08, to file any supplemental memoranda pertinent to the issues discussed at today's hearing. FURTHER ORDER Status Conference set for Friday, 10/31/2008 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. It was determined that Mr. Palazzo does not represent Mrs. Robert.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AKK)
|
September 17, 2008 |
Filing 885
RESPONSE to #877 filed by Trustee Paris W. Robert. RESPONSE TO RECEIVERS MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE TO BE HEARD ON SEPTEMBER 16, 2008 RE: UNILATERAL STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF PARIS ROBERT AND DORIS ROBERT Replies due by 10/1/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Palazzo, T.)
|
September 16, 2008 |
Filing 884
ORDER Approving Seventeenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses. Receiver's fees and expenses for the period 1/1/2008 through 3/31/2008, are approved. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/16/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - OXC)
|
September 16, 2008 |
Filing 883
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:06 AM - 9:16 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel Byron Moldo. David Bruggenwirth is present as counsel for Galaxy Construction. The Court hears the representations of counsel. IT IS ORDERED THAT #877 Motion for Approval of Receiver's 17th Interim Appliction for Fees and Expenses is granted. The order is signed in open court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
September 15, 2008 |
Filing 882
RESPONSE to #877 filed by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction. Response to Receiver's Seventeenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses Replies due by 9/29/2008. (Wilde, Gregory)
|
September 15, 2008 |
Filing 881
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt, on 9/15/2008. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Judge Leavitt will be out ill for a few days. Therefore, the Status Conference presently set for 9/16/08 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Leavitt is hereby vacated and rescheduled for THURSDAY, 9/18/08 AT 1:30 P.M. in LV Courtroom 3C.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAP)
|
August 27, 2008 |
Filing 880
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #874 MOTION Status Conference to be heard on Sept. 16, 2008 re #873 Status Report, Notice of Docket Correction, Receiver's Motion for Status Conference to Be Heard on September 16, 2008 Re: Unilateral Status Report Regarding Discovery of Paris Rob MOTION Status Conference to be heard on Sept. 16, 2008 re #873 Status Report, Notice of Docket Correction, Receiver's Motion for Status Conference to Be Heard on September 16, 2008 Re: Unilateral Status Report Regarding Discovery of Paris Rob. Notice of Status Conference Re: Discovery Issues Pertaining to Paris Robert and Doris Robert (with attached certificate of service). (Friedman, Anthony)
|
August 27, 2008 |
Filing 879
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re 876 Minute Order Setting Hearing,. Notice of Entry of Minute Order Setting Status Conference for September 16, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. re: Discovery Issues Pertaining to Paris Robert and Doris Robert (with attached certificate of service) (Friedman, Anthony)
|
August 26, 2008 |
Filing 878
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell of Hearing on Seventeenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, And James T. Schaefer In Support Thereof (with attached certificate of service) on 9/16/2008 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6D. (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 26, 2008 |
Filing 877
MOTION for Hearing Seventeenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receivers Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, And James T. Schaefer In Support Thereof (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 8/26/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
August 26, 2008 |
Filing 876
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt, on 8/26/2008. Status Conference set for TUESDAY, 9/16/2008 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAP)
|
August 20, 2008 |
Filing 875
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by DAVID J. WINTERTON on behalf of Interested Parties Canyon Lenders, LLC, Paris W. Robert. (WINTERTON, DAVID)
|
August 19, 2008 |
Filing 874
MOTION Status Conference to be heard on Sept. 16, 2008 re #873 Status Report, Notice of Docket Correction, Receiver's Motion for Status Conference to Be Heard on September 16, 2008 Re: Unilateral Status Report Regarding Discovery of Paris Robert and Doris Robert; Declaration of Anthony A. Friedman in Support (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 9/6/2008. (Friedman, Anthony)
|
August 19, 2008 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #873 Status Report: ERROR: Document has more than one event and should have been filed as two separate events; CORRECTION: Attorney Anthony Friedman advised to refile request for Status Conference using the event Motion for Miscellaneous Relief found under the Motions category. (no image attached)(RFJ)
|
August 15, 2008 |
Filing 873
STATUS REPORT Receiver's Unilateral Status Report Regarding Discovery of Paris Robert and Doris Robert; Request for Status Conference to Be Heard on September 16, 2008; Declaration of Anthony A. Friedman In Support (with attached Certificate of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Friedman, Anthony)
|
July 8, 2008 |
Filing 872
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #871 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion of James H. Donnell, Permanent Receiver, for Order that the Receiver Holds the Funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors is granted, and #789 is hereby withdrawn Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/7/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
July 1, 2008 |
Filing 871
STIPULATION re #789 MOTION for Order that the Receiver hold funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Cons ; Stipulation To Withdraw Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Constructive Trust For The Defrauded Investors With Attached Proposed Order (and attached Certificates of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
June 30, 2008 |
Filing 870
ORDER granting #869 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by James H Donell; Discovery due by 8/15/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 6/29/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
June 25, 2008 |
Filing 869
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Receiver James H Donell Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (with attached Certificate of Service). (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 24, 2008 |
Filing 868
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #866 Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Notice of Entry of Order Granting James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Distribute Settlement Funds Received from American Exchange Inc., Perpetual Investment Inc. and Robert Rippe (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 24, 2008 |
Filing 867
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #863 Order. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Sixteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver Fees and Expenses (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 23, 2008 |
Filing 866
ORDER Granting #857 Motion for Disbursement of Funds from American Exchange Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
June 20, 2008 |
Filing 865
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #864 Non-Opposition,, #857 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Distribute Settlement Funds Received From American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Order Granting Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, To Distribute Settlement Funds Received From American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., And Robert Rippe (with attached Certificate of Service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 20, 2008 |
Filing 864
NON-OPPOSITION to #857 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Distribute Settlement Funds Received From American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Notice Of Non-Opposition To Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, To Distribute Settlement Funds Received From American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., And Robert Rippe (with attached Certificate of Service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 17, 2008 |
Filing 863
ORDER Granting #859 Sixteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receivers Fees and Expenses; Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/17/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
June 17, 2008 |
Filing 862
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:06 AM - 9:09 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel Byron Moldo. The Court makes findings for the record and grants #859 16th Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
June 12, 2008 |
Filing 861
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 6/12/2008. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: 856 Show Cause Hearing. At the Show Cause hearing, the Court orally granted a Receiver's counsel's request to pursue discovery if Paris W. Robert was unwilling to voluntarily share the information contained in the Chapter 7 packet. The Court directs counsel to meet and confer and file a Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order on or before 6/27/2008. The discovery plan and scheduling order will be referred to Magistrate Judge Leavitt for review and approval. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
June 3, 2008 |
Filing 860
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #859 MOTION for Hearing Sixteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receivers Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereof with a. Notice of Hearing on Receivers Sixteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receivers Fees and Expenses with attached Certificate of Service (Hearing Date: 06/17/08 at 9:00 a.m.) (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 3, 2008 |
Filing 859
MOTION for Hearing Sixteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receivers Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereof with attached Certificate of Service (Hearing Date: 06/17/08 at 9:00 a.m.) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 6/3/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
May 28, 2008 |
Filing 858
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #857 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Distribute Settlement Funds Received From American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of. (with attached Certificate of Service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 28, 2008 |
Filing 857
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Distribute Settlement Funds Received From American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 6/15/2008. (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 21, 2008 |
Filing 856
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 5/21/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:07 AM - 9:16 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel Byron Moldo. Paris W. Robert is present, with counsel T. Louis Palazzo. Mr. Palazzo advises the Court that Mr. Robert has filled out the required Chapter 7 application documents. He provides the document ot Mr. Moldo. Mr. Moldo looks over the documents and advises the Court that some documents that should have been included are not in the packet. Mr. Palazzo lodges an objection to sharing the information in the packet with Receiver's counsel on 5th amendment grounds and states that the issue of appointment of counsel is moot, since Mr. Robert has retained him. The Court will allow Receiver's counsel to pursue discovery if Mr. Robert will not voluntarily share the information contained in the packet. Mr. Moldo returns the packet to Mr. Palazzo. The Court finds that Mr. Robert has not purged himself of the contempt order. A claim is still outstanding. A separate order setting deadlines will follow. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
May 13, 2008 |
Filing 855
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 5/13/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:05 AM - 9:06 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Byron Moldo and Anthony Friedman are present as counsel for Receiver James Donnell. Mr. Donnell is present. Monique Kirtley of the Federal Public Defender's Office is present. T. Louis Palazzo is present as counsel for Paris W. Robert. The Federal Public Defender was appointed as counsel for Mr. Robert when he appeared before Magistrate Judge Leen for initial appearance on the bench warrant. Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender is relieved as counsel of record. Ms. Kirtley is excused. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
May 13, 2008 |
Filing 854
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Further Proceedings: Contempt as to Paris W. Robert. Hearing held on 5/13/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:26 AM - 9:36 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Byron Moldo and Anthony Friedman are present as counsel for Receiver James Donnell. Mr. Donnell is present. T. Louis Palazzo is present as counsel for Paris Robert. Mr. Robert is present. Mr. Palazzo seeks clarification as to whether the Court required Mr. Robert to complete the Chapter 7 documents so that the Court could determine whether Mr. Robert could afford counsel. The Court ORDERS Mr. Robert to fully complete and sign the Chapter 7 packet. Mr. Palazzo asks for additional time to discuss this matter with Mr. Moldo and Mr. Friedman. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is continued to 5/21/2008 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson for Further Proceedings: Contempt. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
May 7, 2008 |
Filing 851
ORDER GRANTING #849 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond. Responses due by 6/30/2008 re #789 MOTION for Order that the Receiver hold funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/7/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
|
May 6, 2008 |
Filing 850
NOTICE of Change of Address by Defendant Samir Ghazal. (ES, address updated)
|
May 6, 2008 |
Filing 849
STIPULATION re #789 MOTION for Order that the Receiver hold funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Cons ; [Third and Final] Stipulation to Extend US Response Deadline by Interested Party United States of America. (Hulbig, Adam)
|
May 2, 2008 |
Filing 848
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney T. Louis Palazzo on behalf of Interested Party Paris W. Robert. (Palazzo, T.)
|
April 29, 2008 |
Filing 847
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #805 Order on Stipulation addressed to Said Mobin. (ES-no new address information, unable to forward)
|
April 24, 2008 |
Filing 845
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 4/24/2008. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller. Both the Minutes of Proceedings #843 and Minute Order #844 improvidently displayed an incorrect Courtroom for the scheduled hearing regarding the Contempt of Mr. Paris Roberts. IT IS ORDERED: Continued Contempt Proceedings of Mr. Paris Roberts is set for 5/13/2008 @ 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Any previous courtroom setting should be disregarded. The Clerk of Court shall notify counsel for the Receiver in this case of the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
April 23, 2008 |
Filing 844
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 4/23/2008. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller. RE: 843 Minutes of Initial Contempt Appearance of Paris Robert, IT IS ORDERED: The Clerk of Court shall notify counsel for the Receiver of the hearing scheduled for 05/13/08 @ 9:00am in Courtroom #3D as scheduled in Minutes of Proceedings #843. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
April 21, 2008 |
Filing 852
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Paris W. Robert. FPD appointed as counsel for Paris W. Robert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/21/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
|
April 21, 2008 |
Filing 846
PR BOND posted by Party Paris W. Robert. (AXM)
|
April 21, 2008 |
Filing 843
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re: Initial Appearance on Contempt Warrant for Paris Robert held on 4/21/2008 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Amber Craig; Def Counsel: Monique Kirtley, FPD; Court Reporter/FTR #: 3:26:15 - 3:31:42; Time of Hearing: 3:00pm; Courtroom: 3B; The Court canvasses Mr. Robert as to why he is being held in civil contempt. The Court further states that a meeting was held in chambers prior to the start of the hearing with the U.S. Attorney, The Federal Public Defender and Pretrial Services regarding Mr. Robert's Pretrial Services Report. Continued Contempt Proceedings set for 5/13/2008 @ 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Mr. Robert is RELEASED on PR Bond. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
April 18, 2008 |
Filing 840
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:06 AM - 9:15 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Byron Moldo is present as counsel for Receiver James Donnell. Mr. Donnell is not present. The Court has received and reviewed the objection (#838) from Sheryl Lubotsky. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that Mr. Donnell will send her a letter of explanation. Ms. Lubotsky has received some of the distributed estate already. The Court makes findings for the record and grants #836 Motion for Hearing on Receiver's Fifteenth Aplication for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. The order is signed in open court. Mr. Moldo asks the Court if it has read the Declaration of Byron Z. Moldo re Production of Documents by Paris W. Robert (#839.) The Court has reviewed the document and the documents produced by Mr. Robert. The Court FINDS that Paris W. Robert has not complied with the order of the Court and has not purged himself of the Contempt Order. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that a bench warrant is to issue for the arrest of Paris W. Robert. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) Modified on 4/21/2008. (PAV).
|
April 16, 2008 |
Filing 839
DECLARATION of Byron Z. Moldo Re Production Of Documents By Paris W. Robert re 835 Evidentiary Hearing,,,,,,, ; with attached certificate of service by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 838
OBJECTION/Interim Application to #837 Notice for Receiver's Fees. (AXM)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 837
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #836 MOTION for Hearing Fifteenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, And James T. Schaefer In Support Thereof. Notice Of Hearing On Receiver's Fifteenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses (with attached certificate of service) (Hearing Date: 4/18/08 @ 9:00 a.m.) (Moldo, Byron)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 836
MOTION for Hearing Fifteenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, And James T. Schaefer In Support Thereof (with attached certificate of service) (Hearing Date: 4/18/08 @ 9:00 a.m.) by Receiver James H Donell. Motion ripe 4/3/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Exhibit D - E, #3 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron)
|
April 1, 2008 |
Filing 835
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/1/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 10:05 AM - 11:50 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel, Byron Moldo and Anthony Friedman. Paris W. Robert is present and sworn. Mr. Moldo and the Court question Mr. Robert as to his financial condition. Mr. Moldo makes a statement. The Court makes findings for the record. THE COURT FINDS Mr. Robert to be in contempt of Court and SENTENCES Mr. Robert to 30 days incarceration, said sentence stayed pending the production of the Chapter 7 documents. Production of the required documents will purge the Contempt of Court citation. IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Robert is to fill out all information required by the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition forms, including all schedules, affidavits and disclosures contained in the packet and to produce any and all information requested by Receiver's Counsel on himself and all Paris Robert related entities. The completed Chapter 7 packet and the information requested by Receiver is to be delivered to Receiver's local counsel's office, Kolesar and Leatham, 3320 W. Sahara, Suite 380, Las Vegas, Nevada, telephone # 702-362-7800, no later than 5 p.m. on April 15, 2008. Mr. Moldo provides a Chapter 7 packet to Mr. Robert in open court. Mr. Robert asks if he can have someone help him fill out the forms. The Court tells Mr. Robert to call the Receiver if he has questions regarding the form. The Court admonishes Mr. Robert that he will be signing the documents under the penalty of perjury so he must answer all questions fully and truthfully. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
March 28, 2008 |
Filing 834
RESPONSE/OBJECTION by Paris W. Robert to #829 Order Setting Hearing. (ES)
|
March 28, 2008 |
Filing 833
DECLARATION of Jay L. Stone of Professional Investigators Inc. re Service on Paris Robert of Order filed by this Court on March 4, 2008 re #829 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, ; by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
March 28, 2008 |
Filing 832
DECLARATION of Trish Melendez, Assistant To Byron Z. Moldo, Re Service On Paris Robert Of Order Filed By This Court On March 4, 2008 re #829 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, ; by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
March 13, 2008 |
Filing 831
TRANSMITTAL RETURN from C/A on #830 Appeal Record Sent to USCA. (AXM)
|
March 5, 2008 |
Filing 830
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #632 (mailed with 6 RT's, 8 Sealed documents and copy of docket sheet) Notice of Appeal. (JAG)
|
March 4, 2008 |
Filing 829
ORDER setting hearing: #827 Response - Other, filed by James H Donell, ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 4/1/2008 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson.) Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/4/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 3, 2008 |
Filing 828
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #813 Order. Notice Of Entry Of Order Approving Fourteenth Interim Application For Approval Of Receiver's Fees And Expenses (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 27, 2008 |
Filing 827
RESPONSE to 812 Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,, Show Cause Hearing,,,,, 821 Order on Motion for Order of Sale,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, ; RESPONSE OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO INFORMATION SUPPLIED BY PARIS ROBERT; EXHIBITS A, B, C AND D; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C & D; Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 20, 2008 |
Filing 826
LETTER re: Investment Accounts from Paris W. Robert. (ASB)
|
February 11, 2008 |
Filing 825
ORDER Granting #808 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 02/11/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2008: #1 Exhibit) (PAV).
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 824
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #819 Stipulation, for time #789 MOTION for Order that the Receiver hold funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Cons. Responses due by 5/8/2008. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/8/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 823
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #808 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Howard, Randolph)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 822
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell [Notice of Filing of Bids] (Howard, Randolph)
|
February 8, 2008 |
Filing 821
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:15 AM - 9:45 AM; Courtroom: 6D; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)Receiver James Donnell is present, with counsel Byron Moldo (via telephone) and Randolph Howard. Paris W. Robert is present. Mr. Howard presents the overbid of Chris and Jillian Knutson and the sealed counterbid of Duncan and Bonnie Vezain on the property that is the subject of #808 Receiver's Motion for Order of Sale of real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, MT. The Court opens the sealed counterbid. The Court GRANTS #808 Motion for Order of Sale and accepts the Knutson overbid. Mr. Howard will prepare a proposed order and electronically file the overbids. The Court has received and reviewed Paris W. Robert's letter that indicates that he is not able to retain counsel. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Mr. Robert is to complete and file the affidavit of financial condition and the statement of affairs required in a Chapter 7 Bankruptcy filing. The affidavit and statement shall contain information for a period of 5 years.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Chapter 7 affidavit and statement is due by 2/22/2008. Mr. Robert is to mail a copy of the affidavit and statement to Mr. Moldo and attach a certificate of service by mail to the document. The Court cautions Mr. Robert not to use variable fonts and print sizes in his documents. Mr. Robert is to use 12 point font or higher in his future pleadings. Mr. Moldo asks if the Receiver may be allowed to depose Mr. Robert on the statements he makes in the filing. The Court will schedule a deposition if one is warranted. The Court will review Mr. Robert's filing and decide whether to refer him to the Clerk's Office for appointment of a panel attorney.
|
February 6, 2008 |
Filing 819
STIPULATION re #789 MOTION for Order that the Receiver hold funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Cons ; [Second] Stipulation to Extend US Response Deadline by Interested Party United States of America. (Hulbig, Adam)
|
February 4, 2008 |
Filing 818
DECLARATION of Byron Z. Moldo Re Personal Service of Ex Parte Application For Order To Show Cause Re Contempt Directed To Paris Robert filed by Receiver James H Donell. with attached certificate of service. (Moldo, Byron)
|
January 28, 2008 |
Filing 817
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice of Hearing on Receiver's Motion to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana by Receiver James H Donell re #816 Notice (Other). (Went, Joseph)
|
January 28, 2008 |
Filing 816
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #808 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana. [Notice of Hearing on Receiver's Motion] (Went, Joseph)
|
January 28, 2008 |
Filing 815
NOTICE of Hearing on #808 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2008 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached)(PAV)
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 814
NOTICE of Change of Address by Lawrence J Semenza, II. (Semenza, Lawrence)
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 813
ORDER granting #802 MOTION for Hearing Fourteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/18/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 812
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 1/18/2008 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:12 AM - 9:20 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Byron Moldo and Anthony Friedman are present as counsel for Receiver James Donnell. Mr. Donnell is present. No objections have been filed to Receiver's 14th Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses #802 , therefore IT IS ORDERED that #802 is granted. Paris W. Robert is present to answer to the Order to Show Cause. The Court advises Mr. Robert of his right to have counsel represent him at this proceeding, of his rights if he cannot afford to retain counsel, and of the possible penalties if he is found in contempt. Mr. Robert advises that he can retain counsel. This matter is set for confirmation of counsel and Status Conference for 2/8/2008 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. If an attorney enters an appearance on behalf of Mr. Robert, the status conference may be vacated. The Court would then set this matter for a hearing on the Order to Show Cause. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
January 17, 2008 |
Filing 811
AFFIDAVIT of Timothy A. Dillard (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 810
DECLARATION of Byron Z. Moldo re Costs Associated with Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt Directed to Paris W. Robert re 796 Show Cause Hearing,,,,,, ; with attached Certificate of Service by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
January 10, 2008 |
Filing 809
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana by Receiver James H Donell re #808 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana. (Went, Joseph)
|
January 8, 2008 |
Filing 808
MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2#2 Exhibit 3-6#3 Exhibit 7#4 Notice of Receiver's Motion to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana#5 Proposed Order)(Went, Joseph)
|
January 3, 2008 |
Filing 807
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 768 Notice of Hearing, addressed to Said Mobin. (no current address, did not forward). (OXC) Modified to change text on 1/8/2008 (OXC).
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 804
MOTION for Hearing Request for Hearing on Fred Hans Mahlstedt dba Galaxy Construction's Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation with Certificate of Service re #775 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation with Certificate of Service by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction. (Wilde, Gregory)
|
December 28, 2007 |
Filing 802
MOTION for Hearing Fourteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereof (with attached Certificate of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B and C#2 Exhibit D and E#3 Supplement Notice of Hearing on Receivers 14th Interim Application for Approval of Fees and Expenses with attached certificate of service#4 Proposed Order Order Approving 14th Interim Application for Approval of Receivers Fees and Expenses with attached Certificate of Service)(Moldo, Byron)
|
December 27, 2007 |
Filing 806
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 783 Order on Motion for Hearing,,, Motion Hearing,, addressed to Said Mobin. (did not remail, unable to forward) (AXM)
|
December 26, 2007 |
Filing 805
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #800 Stipulation, for time to file response to Motion #789 . Responses due by 2/8/2008. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/26/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
December 21, 2007 |
Filing 803
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #762 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney addressed to Said Mobin. No new address available; unable to forward. (ASB)
|
December 21, 2007 |
Filing 801
ORDER Granting #788 Motion for Order to Sale Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Serramonte Court, Henderson, Nevada. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/21/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
|
December 21, 2007 |
Filing 800
STIPULATION re #789 MOTION for Order that the Receiver hold funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Cons ; Stipulation to Extend US Response Deadline by Interested Party United States of America. (Hulbig, Adam)
|
December 21, 2007 |
Filing 799
NOTICE of Appearance. of Counsel for the United States (Hulbig, Adam)
|
December 19, 2007 |
Filing 798
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #788 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Serramonte Court, Henderson, Nevada ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
December 19, 2007 |
Filing 797
NON-OPPOSITION to #788 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Serramonte Court, Henderson, Nevada ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
December 18, 2007 |
Filing 796
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 12/18/2007 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:20 AM - 9:25 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Receiver James Donnell is present with counsel Byron Moldo and Anthony Friedman. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that service has been attempted pursuant to NRS 14.090 and that Investigator Timothy Dillard is present to answer questions about the attempts to serve Mr. Robert at his residence. Mr. Dillard answers questions from the Court. IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Dillard is to call the office of Mr. Robert's senior apartment complex to inform them that he has papers to serve on Mr. Robert and serve the owners of the facility in lieu of Mr. Robert. The Court makes findings for the record that Mr. Robert is aware of this proceeding and that he is evading service of process. If he does not accept service of the Order to Show Cause and appear at the next hearing, the Court will hold him in contempt of Court and issue a warrant for his arrest. The Court directs Mr. Moldo to prepare an affidavit of costs associated with this proceeding. The Court further indicates that it will order all pleadings filed by Mr. Robert in this case and related cases stricken as Mr. Robert continues to file on behalf of entities he is not allowed to represent. Show Cause Hearing on Paris W. Robert is set for 1/18/2008 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
December 17, 2007 |
Filing 795
AFFIDAVIT of Timothy A. Dillard filed by Receiver James H Donell. (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 794
DECLARATION of Trish Melendez filed by Receiver James H Donell. Declaration Of Trish Melendez, Assistant To Byron Z. Moldo, Re Service Of: 1) 782 Third Amended Order To Show Cause Re: Contempt Directed To Paris W. Robert; And 2) 751 Ex Parte Application Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order To Show Cause Re: Contempt Directed To Paris W. Robert; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declarations Of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo And Vera Panjanon On Paris W. Robert Pursuant To NRS Section 14.090 (with attached certificate of service) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part I#2 Exhibit A - Part II#3 Exhibit B and C)(Moldo, Byron)
|
December 13, 2007 |
Filing 792
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #785 Order. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Thirteenth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
December 10, 2007 |
Filing 791
REPLY to Response to #775 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation with Certificate of Service ; filed by Defendant Fred Han Mahkstedt dba Galaxy Construction. Reply to Opposition to Fred Hans Mahlstedt dba Galaxy Construction's Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation with Certificate of Service (Wilde, Gregory)
|
December 3, 2007 |
Filing 790
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Motion to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Serramonte Court, Henderson, Nevada by Receiver James H Donell re #788 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Serramonte Court, Henderson, Nevada. (Went, Joseph)
|
November 30, 2007 |
Filing 789
MOTION for Order that the Receiver hold funds in the Receivership Estate in Constructive Trust for the Defrauded Investors Motion Of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, For Order That The Receiver Holds The Funds In The Receivership Estate In Constructive Trust For The Defrauded Investors; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached Certificate of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 12/18/2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Receiver Motion for Order that Receiver Hold Funds In Constructive Trust#2 Exhibit A - Part II#3 Exhibit B to Receiver Motion for Order to Hold Funds in Constructive Trust#4 Proposed Order (with attached Certificate of Service))(Moldo, Byron)
|
November 28, 2007 |
Filing 788
MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Serramonte Court, Henderson, Nevada by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3#2 Exhibit 4 & 5#3 Exhibit 6 - 9#4 Exhibit 10 - 11#5 Notice of Receiver's Motion#6 Proposed Order)(Went, Joseph)
|
November 27, 2007 |
Filing 787
RESPONSE to #775 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation with Certificate of Service ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Replies due by 12/11/2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - H)(Went, Joseph)
|
November 26, 2007 |
Filing 786
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: 774 Motion Hearing held on November 1, 2007 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Court Reporter: Felicia Rene Zabin. Transcript prepared by Felicia Rene Zabin. (no image attached) (DXS)
|
November 20, 2007 |
Filing 785
ORDER granting #776 MOTION for Hearing THIRTEENTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/20/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 20, 2007 |
Filing 783
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2007 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:18 AM - 9:20 AM; Courtroom: 6D; granting #776 Motion for Hearing. James Donnell, Receiver, is present with counsel, Byron Moldo. The Court inquires whether any responses have been filed or whether anyone in the Courtroom wishes to speak. No responses have been filed and no one asks to speak. The Court grants the motion and signs the proposed order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
November 16, 2007 |
Filing 784
RESPONSE to #776 MOTION for Hearing THIRTEENTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES and STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Homeowner Association Services, Inc. with Prejudice filed by Interested Party Paris W. Robert. (Attachments: #1 Pages 41-42)(ASB)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 781
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #766 MOTION for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds. (ASB)
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 779
ORDER granting #766 MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/8/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 7, 2007 |
Filing 777
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #766 MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
November 5, 2007 |
Filing 778
MOTION to Amend/Correct Response to #766 Motion for Order of Sale by Georgia M. Kotecki. (ASB)
|
November 5, 2007 |
Filing 776
MOTION for Hearing THIRTEENTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, JAMES T. SCHAEFER, AND RODD A. HAMMAN, IN SUPPORT THEREOF [Hearing Date: 11/20/2007 @ 9:00 a.m.] (with attached Certificate of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C to Receivers 13th Interim Application for Approval of Fees and Expenses etc.#2 Exhibit D through F to Receivers 13th Interim Application for Fees and Expenses etc.#3 Supplement Notice of Hearing on Receivers 13th Interim Application for Approval of Receivers Fees and Expenses (with attached Certificate of Service)#4 Proposed Order Order Approving 13th Interim Application for Approval of Receivers Fees and Expenses (with attached Certificate of Service))(Moldo, Byron)
|
November 5, 2007 |
Filing 775
MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction and Orders Staying Third Party Litigation with Certificate of Service. Responses due by 11/23/2007. (Wilde, Gregory)
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 774
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2007 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:06 AM - 9:10 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Byron Moldo appears as counsel for Receiver James Donnell, who is present. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that Georgia Kotecki filed an opposition to this motion in 2:04-cv-1071-KJD. The Court indicates that it will strike that opposition. The Court inquires whether anyone in the gallery would like to speak regarding the motion. No one speaks. The Court GRANTS #766 Motion for Order of Sale. Mr. Moldo will file a proposed order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
October 26, 2007 |
Filing 773
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for instructions regarding disbursement of sale proceeds, by Glenn Thompson. (AXM)
|
October 12, 2007 |
Filing 770
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #766 MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds]. NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) To Approve The Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, NV; and 2) For Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
October 9, 2007 |
Filing 769
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Kent J. Dawson, U.S. District Judge, on 10/9/2007. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #766 MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] Responses due by 10/19/2007. Replies due by 10/30/2007.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
October 9, 2007 |
Filing 768
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set on for 11/1/2007 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson on #766 Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] (no image attached)(PAV)
|
October 5, 2007 |
Filing 767
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) To Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known As 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds by Receiver James H Donell re #766 MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds]. (Howard, Randolph)
|
October 4, 2007 |
Filing 766
MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver: 1) to Approve the Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 8045 W. Hacienda Avenue, Las Vegas, Nevada; and 2) for Instructions Regarding Disbursement of Sale Proceeds] by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2#2 Exhibit 3-Pt 1#3 Exhibit 3-Pt b#4 Exhibit 3-Pt c#5 Exhibit 3-Pt d#6 Exhibit 3-Pt e#7 Exhibit 3-Pt f#8 Exhibit 3-Pt g#9 Exhibit 4-6#10 Exhibit 7-10#11 Notice of Motion)(Howard, Randolph)
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 765
ORDER Amended Order Re: Show Cause Hearing is set for 11/1/2007 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/1/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 764
NOTICE by Defendant Samir Ghazal re #762 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Williams Scann, Susan)
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 763
ORDER granting 760 Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Amended Order to Show Cause re: Contempt Directed to Paris W. Robert. Order to Show Cause hearing is set for 10/30/07 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this order and the applicatino shall be personally served on Paris W. Robert no later than 10/16/07. Any and all opposition to this Order to Show Cause re: Contempt shall be filed with the Court and served on the Receiver and all parties no later than 10/23/07. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that replies to any and all oppositino to this Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt shall be filed with the Court and served on the opposing parties no later than 10/26/07. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/1/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
September 28, 2007 |
Filing 762
ORDER Granting #757 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Susan W Scann withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson. (copy sent to Mr. Ghazal, 8145 W. Gilmore Ave. LV NV 89129) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
September 27, 2007 |
Filing 761
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #757 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Susan Williams Scann. ; filed by Defendant Samir Ghazal. (Williams Scann, Susan)
|
September 24, 2007 |
Filing 759
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #754 Proposed Order Submission,. Notice of Entry of Amended Order Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
September 20, 2007 |
Filing 758
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #757 Motion to Withdraw by Defendant Samir Ghazal. (Williams Scann, Susan) Modified to add docket relationship on 9/21/2007. (MAJ)
|
September 19, 2007 |
Filing 757
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Susan Williams Scann. by Defendant Samir Ghazal. (Williams Scann, Susan)
|
September 17, 2007 |
Filing 756
AMENDED-ORDER Granting #735 Order on Motion approving Sale of Unit Week 20 at Marriott Newport Coast Villas. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
September 14, 2007 |
Filing 755
DECLARATION of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, in Support of Amended Order Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California (with attached proof of service) re #754 Proposed Order Submission, ; by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
September 14, 2007 |
Filing 754
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #735 Order on Motion, ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (AMENDED) Order Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
September 6, 2007 |
Filing 753
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: CONTEMPT directed to Paris W. Robert. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/2/2007 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Receiver to personally serve Paris W. Robert no later than 9/18/07. Mr. Robert's response to the Show Cause order is due by 9/28/2007. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/6/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
September 4, 2007 |
Filing 750
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #745 Order on Motion. Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
September 4, 2007 |
Filing 749
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #736 Order,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Twelfth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 27, 2007 |
Filing 748
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #735 Order on Motion,. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, CA (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 27, 2007 |
Filing 747
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #746 Order on Motion. Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Eurodesign Cabinets Inc. (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 22, 2007 |
Filing 745
ORDER Granting #733 Motion to approve settlement and release with American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/20/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
August 20, 2007 |
Filing 746
ORDER Granting #732 Motion to approve settlement agreement and release with Eurodesign Cabinets, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/20/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
August 20, 2007 |
Filing 743
NOTICE of Change of Address by Lisa A Rasmussen. (Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
August 16, 2007 |
Filing 744
RESPONSE and Objection to Reply of Permanent Receiver, filed by Interested Party Paris W. Robert. (AXM)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 742
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #733 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe (with attached certificate of service) ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (with attached certificate of service)( (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 741
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #732 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Eurodesign Cabinets Inc. (with attached certificate of service) ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (with attached Certificate of Service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 740
NON-OPPOSITION to #732 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Eurodesign Cabinets Inc. (with attached certificate of service) ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Eurodesign Cabinets, Inc. (with attached Certificate of Service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 14, 2007 |
Filing 739
REPLY to Response to #733 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe (with attached certificate of service) ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Reply of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver to Objection and Response of Paris W. Robert to Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc. and Robert Rippe; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James H. Donell (with attached Certificate of Service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 31, 2007 |
Filing 738
RESPONSE to #733 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe (with attached certificate of service) ; filed by Interested Party Paris W. Robert. Replies due by 8/14/2007. (AXM)
|
July 26, 2007 |
Reopen Document #732 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Eurodesign Cabinets Inc. (with attached certificate of service) (MAJ)
|
July 26, 2007 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #735 Order on Motion; ERROR: Wrong action taken by court; CORRECTION: Docket text and relationship modified. (no image attached)(MAJ)
|
July 25, 2007 |
Filing 737
EXHIBIT(s) to 734 Order on Motion for Order of Sale, Order on Motion for Hearing, Motion Hearing. (AXM)
|
July 25, 2007 |
Filing 736
ORDER Granting #728 MOTION on Twelfth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, James T. Schaefer, and Rodd A Hamman, In filed by James H Donell. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 07/25/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
|
July 25, 2007 |
Filing 735
ORDER Granting #723 Motion for Order of Sale Motion To Approve Sale Of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) At Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California; Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 07/25/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK) Modified docket relationship on 7/26/2007. (Jaime, Melissa).
|
July 25, 2007 |
Filing 734
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2007 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:06 AM - 9:15 AM. Byron Moldo appears on behalf of Receiver James Donnell, who is present. The Court makes findings and grants #728 Receiver's Twelfth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's fees and Expenses. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that the Receiver has received two bids the Marriott Newport Coast Villas Timeshare, week 20. The original buyers, the Dell'Angelos, were overbid by R. L.Tonkin. The Dell'Angelos sent Receiver an additional bid. The Court opens the sealed bid from the Dell'Angelos. The Court grants #723 Motion for Order of Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach CA. The Court accepts the $17,000.00 bid from the Dell'Angelos. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that Receiver's counsel may be filing a Motion for Order to Show Cause with regard to Paris Robert's filings in related Global Express actions. The Court notes that Connie Farris has filed a pro se Motion to Recuse in a related action. Mr. Moldo indicates that a response will be filed in accordance with the local rules. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
July 20, 2007 |
Filing 733
MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with American Exchange, Inc., Perpetual Investment, Inc., and Robert Rippe (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell.Responses due by 8/7/2007. (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 18, 2007 |
Filing 732
MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Eurodesign Cabinets Inc. (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell.Responses due by 8/5/2007. (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 6, 2007 |
Filing 731
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #723 MOTION for Order of Sale Motion To Approve Sale Of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) At Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of James H. Donell (with attached certificate of service). Notice of Hearing on Receiver's Motion to Approve Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, CA - July 25, 2007 @ 9:00 a.m. (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 3, 2007 |
Filing 730
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #727 Order,. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Eighth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 3, 2007 |
Filing 729
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #726 Order,. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached certificate of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
July 2, 2007 |
Filing 728
MOTION for Hearing on Twelfth Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, James T. Schaefer, and Rodd A Hamman, In Support Thereof (with attached Certificate of Service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Interim Report#2 Exhibit B - Receiver's Invoice/Statement#3 Exhibit C - MDFS Invoice/Statement#4 Exhibit D - Kolesar Invoice/Statement#5 Exhibit E - Schaefer Invoice/Statement#6 Exhibit F - Calton Invoice/Statement#7 Proposed Order to 12th Interim Application#8 Supplement Notice of Hearing on 12th Interim Application)(Moldo, Byron)
|
June 29, 2007 |
Filing 725
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #720 Order,. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Eleventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (with attached proof of service) (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 28, 2007 |
Filing 727
ORDER Granting #546 MOTION for Hearing EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by James H Donell. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/28/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
June 28, 2007 |
Filing 726
ORDER Granting #433 MOTION for Hearing of Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Poionts and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereo filed by James H Donell,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/28/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
June 27, 2007 |
Filing 724
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Kent J. Dawson, U.S. District Judge, on 6/27/2007. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #723 MOTION for Order of Sale Motion To Approve Sale Of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) At Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of James H. Donell (with attached certificate of service) Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2007 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Any and all responses to this motion shall be filed on or before July 18, 2007. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
June 19, 2007 |
Filing 723
MOTION for Order of Sale Motion To Approve Sale Of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) At Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of James H. Donell (with attached certificate of service) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, CA (with attached certificate of service)#2 Supplement Notice of Receiver's Motion to Approve Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 20) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, CA (with attached certificate of service))(Moldo, Byron)
|
June 14, 2007 |
Filing 722
ORDER Granting #717 Motion for Order of Sale property commonly known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, MT. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/12/07. (AXM)
|
May 10, 2007 |
Filing 721
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Notice of Change of Status of Counsel (Van Havermaat, David)
|
April 19, 2007 |
Filing 720
ORDER granting #714 MOTION for Hearing ON ELEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L.HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF WITH filed by James H Donell,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/17/07. (AXM)
|
April 17, 2007 |
Filing 719
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2007 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: David Van Havermaat(via telephone); Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:35 AM - 9:45 AM. Also appearing: Byron Moldo, counsel for Receiver James Donnell. Mr. Donnell is present. Investor Paris Robert makes statements regarding the accounting. Mr. Moldo responds. Receiver's #714 MOTION ON ELEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L.HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF WITH filed by James H Donell, is granted. The proposed order is signed in open court. (no image attached) (PAV)
|
April 13, 2007 |
Filing 718
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #717 MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion for Court Approval of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana]. (Went, Joseph)
|
April 10, 2007 |
Filing 717
MOTION for Order of Sale [Motion for Court Approval of Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1991 Highway 72, Carbon County, Bridger, Montana] by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3#2 Exhibit 4#3 Exhibit 5#4 Exhibit 6#5 Proposed Order #6 Notice of Motion)(Went, Joseph)
|
March 30, 2007 |
Filing 716
(3rd AMENDED) ORDER on Motion #637 for Sale of Property 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, NV. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson. (AXM)
|
March 29, 2007 |
Filing 715
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1; filed by Receiver James H Donell. [Third Amended Order Approving Sale] (Went, Joseph)
|
March 22, 2007 |
Filing 714
MOTION for Hearing on 11th interim application for approval of receivers fees/expenses; memorandum of points and authorities; declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L.Howard, and James T. Schaefer in support thereof with attached exhibit A by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B & C#2 Exhibit D & E with attached Certificate of Service#3 Notice of hearing on rreceiver 11TH interim application for fees & expenses#4 Proposed Order Order approving 11TH interim application for approval of receiver fees & expenses)(Moldo, Byron).
|
March 7, 2007 |
Filing 713
ORDER GRANTING #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1 filed by James H Donell,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/5/07. (AXM)
|
March 7, 2007 |
Filing 712
ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING #710 Stipulation for time to respond to Post Judgment Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/5/07. (AXM)
|
March 2, 2007 |
Filing 711
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Second Amended Order Approving Sale of Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada) (Went, Joseph)
|
March 2, 2007 |
Filing 710
STIPULATION Third Stipulation Extending Time for Connie Farris' Responses to Permanent Receiver's First Set of Post-Judgment Interrogatories by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 21, 2007 |
Filing 709
ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING #707 Stipulation, Second Stipulation Extending Time for Connie Farris' Responses to Permanent Receiver's First Set of Post-Judgment Interrogatories to Connie Farris in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment Presently Due on or Before February 9, 2007, Pursuant to Court Order Filed January 23, 2007. Responses due 2/28/07. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/16/07. (AXM) Modified on 2/22/2007 to clarify entry (GEW).
|
February 15, 2007 |
Filing 707
STIPULATION Second Stipulation Extending Time for Connie Farris' Responses to Permanent Receiver's First Set of Post-Judgment Interrogatories to Connie Farris in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment Presently Due on or Before February 9, 2007, Pursuant to Court Order Filed January 23, 2007 and Order by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 13, 2007 |
Filing 708
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #707 Stipulation Extending Time for Connie Farris' Responses to Permanent Receiver's First Set of Post-Judgment Interrogatories to Connie Farris in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment Presently Due on or Before February 9, 2007, Pursuant to Court Order Filed January 23, 2007. Responses due by 2/16/2007. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/13/07. (AAB)
|
February 9, 2007 |
Filing 706
STIPULATION Extending Time For Connie Farris' Responses to Permanent Receiver's First Set of Post-Judgment Interrogatories to Connie S. Farrisin Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment Presently Due on or Before February 9, 2007, Pursuant to the Court Order Filed January 23, 2007 by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 7, 2007 |
Filing 705
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #695 Stipulation,, #696 Order on Stipulation. Notice of entry of Order on stipulation re Connie Farris responses to permanent receiver 1st set of post-judgment interrogatories to Connie Farris in aid of enforcement of money judgment with attached Certificate of Service (Moldo, Byron).
|
February 5, 2007 |
Filing 704
ORDER GRANTING #700 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Brian K Berman withdrawn from the case. The last known address of clients: 4330 S. Eastern Ave. #261, Las Vegas, NV 89119. Signed by Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 1/31/07. (AXM)
|
January 31, 2007 |
Filing 701
ORDER GRANTING #697 Motion to approving settlement agreement. Receiver is authorized to enter the Mutual Release Settlement Agreement and is authroized to execute the Agreement, including by not limited to paying the sum of $46,297.60 to Sundance from the receivership estate. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/25/07. (AXM)
|
January 30, 2007 |
Filing 700
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Canyon Lenders and Paris W. Robert by Brian K. Berman. by Interested Party Paris W. Robert. (Berman, Brian)
|
January 26, 2007 |
Filing 703
FIRST AMENDED ORDER granting #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada. (See Order for Details of Sale of Property) Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/26/07. (AAB)
|
January 25, 2007 |
Filing 702
ORDER of USCA granting Motion for an Extension of Time to File the Opening Brief as to #632 Notice of Appeal filed by Dawn M. Reese. Opening brief is due by 1/31/2007. Answering brief is due by 3/2/2007. Optional Reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (AAB)
|
January 25, 2007 |
Filing 699
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (First Amended Order Approving Sale of Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada) (Went, Joseph)
|
January 25, 2007 |
Filing 698
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #697 Joint MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement re: Sundance Pools and Spas, Inc.. (Howard, Randolph)
|
January 24, 2007 |
Filing 697
Joint MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement re: Sundance Pools and Spas, Inc. by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 2/11/2007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3#2 Exhibit Exhibits 4-5#3 Proposed Order Proposed Order#4 Notice of Motion)(Howard, Randolph)
|
January 23, 2007 |
Filing 696
ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING #695 Stipulation, regarding Connie Farris' response to first set of Post-Judgment Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/19/07. (AXM)
|
January 18, 2007 |
Filing 695
STIPULATION re Connie Farris responses to permanent receivers 1ST set of post-judgment interrogs to Connie Farris in aid of enforcement of money judgment with attached Certificate of Service by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moldo, Byron).
|
January 16, 2007 |
Filing 694
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #689 Order,. Notice of Entry of Order approving 10th interim application for approval of receivers fees and expenses (Certificate of Service attached) (Moldo, Byron).
|
January 9, 2007 |
Filing 693
NOTICE of posting of bond for release of court ordered deposit, by Receiver James H Donell; re #692 Bond, #691 Bond. (AXM)
|
January 9, 2007 |
Filing 692
SECURED BOND in the amount of $ $180,000 obo Galaxy Construction, Inc. posted Receipt # 55259. (AXM) Modified on 1/10/2007 to correct entry (GEW).
|
January 9, 2007 |
Filing 691
SECURED BOND in the amount of $ $340,800 obo Samir Ghazal posted Receipt # 55258. (AXM) Modified on 1/10/2007 to correct entry (GEW).
|
January 5, 2007 |
Filing 690
NOTICE by Interested Party United Land Investors Corporation of Firm Name Change (Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
January 3, 2007 |
Filing 689
ORDER re #686 MOTION for Hearing Tenth Interim application for appoval of Receivers fees and expenses: memorandum of points and authorities; declarations of James H Donell, Byron Z Moldo, Randolph L Howard and James T Schaefer in support thereof filed by James H Donell,. Motion is GRANTED (see doc for details) Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/3/07. (GEW)
|
January 3, 2007 |
Filing 688
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2007 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 9:56 AM - 10:05 AM. RE: #686 MOTION for Hearing TENTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H DONELL, BYRON Z MOLDO, RANDOLPH L HOWARD AND JAMES T SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by James H Donell. The receiver is present, represented by Byron Moldo. Ken Hogan appears on behalf of American Exchange and Robert Rippe. No written objections have been filed. The Court makes finidngs and GRANTS the Motion (#686.) Esther Malkin and Everett Mason make statements. The Court directs them to meet with Mr. Moldo and Mr. Donnell in the hallway. (no image attached) (PAV)
|
December 7, 2006 |
Filing 687
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #539 Proposed Order Submission. Notice of entry of order re receivers motion to replace cash on deposit and receivers recommendations re distribution of sale proceeds of property commonly known as 1660 South Valadez Street, Las Vegas, NV (#537) (Moldo, Byron) Modified on 12/11/2006 (GEW).
|
December 5, 2006 |
Filing 686
MOTION Tenth Interim application for approval of Receivers fees and expenses: Memorandum of points and authorites; Declarations of James H Donell, Byron Z Moldo, Randolph L Howard and James T Schaefer in support thereof by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B - Receiver's Interim Report and Invoices of Receiver#2 Exhibit C, D & E - Invoices of MDFS, Kolesar & Schaefer, respectively#3 Supplement Notice of hearing on receivers 10th interim application for approval of Receivers fees & expenses#4 Proposed Order approving 10th interim application for approval of receivers fees & expenses)(Moldo, Byron) Modified on 12/11/2006 to correct entry (GEW).
|
December 1, 2006 |
Filing 685
ORDER granting #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit filed by James H Donell. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/1/06. (MJZ)
|
November 29, 2006 |
Filing 684
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on Appeal Transmitted to USCA re #632 Notice of Appeal # 06-16659. (AXM)
|
November 29, 2006 |
Filing 683
REPLY to #679 Objection to Document, #682 Response - Other,, #681 Proposed Order Submission, ; filed by Interested Party United Land Investors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H)(Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
November 29, 2006 |
Appeal Deadlines Terminated re #632 Notice of Appeal filed by Dawn M. Reese, (AXM)
|
November 28, 2006 |
Filing 682
RESPONSE to #679 Objection to Document, #681 Proposed Order Submission, ; RECEIVER'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST THAT PROPOSED ORDER CIRCULATE PRIOR TO ENTRY OF ORDER RE: RECEIVER'S RECOMMENDATIONS TO DISBURSE CASH ON HAND filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
November 21, 2006 |
Filing 681
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit, #654 Motion Hearing,,,,,, ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. ORDER REGARDING RECEIVER'S MOTION TO REPLACE CASH ON DEPOSIT AND RECEIVER'S RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS OF PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 1660 SOUTH VALADEZ STREET, LAS VEGAS, NEVADA (#537) (Moldo, Byron)
|
November 17, 2006 |
Filing 680
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Kent J. Dawson, U.S. District Judge on 11/17/2006. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #679 Objection to Document Receiver is to file a response to #679 by 11/30/2006.(no image attached) (PAV)
|
November 15, 2006 |
Filing 679
OBJECTION to #539 Proposed Order Submission; Request That Proposed Order Circulate filed by Interested Party United Land Investors Corporation. (Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
November 14, 2006 |
Filing 678
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #677 Stipulation regarding bond form. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/13/06. (AXM)
|
November 9, 2006 |
Filing 677
STIPULATION Regarding Bond Form by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
November 8, 2006 |
Filing 676
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #666 Order on Motion,,. NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE WITH WILLIAM KEBE, JR., CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE, RAYMOND A. KICKER AND LOUANN KICKER (Davidson, Peter)
|
November 7, 2006 |
Filing 675
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #618 Order addressed to Connie S. Farris: "Undeliverable as addressed"; No new address. (LMC)
|
November 6, 2006 |
Filing 674
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #666 Order addressed to Connie Farris: Box closed, unable to forward; No new address to remail. (LMC)
|
November 1, 2006 |
Filing 673
ORDER granting #649 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-008. #669 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/1/06. (MAJ)
|
November 1, 2006 |
Filing 672
ORDER granting #648 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-007. #667 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/1/06. (MAJ)
|
October 31, 2006 |
Filing 671
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #657 Order addressed to Connie S Farris. No new address. (MAJ)
|
October 31, 2006 |
Filing 670
NON-OPPOSITION to #649 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-008; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 31, 2006 |
Filing 669
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #649 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-008; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 31, 2006 |
Filing 668
NON-OPPOSITION to #648 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-007; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 31, 2006 |
Filing 667
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #648 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-007; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 26, 2006 |
Filing 666
ORDER granting #651 Motion to Appoint James H. Donell Permanent Receiver, To Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with William Kebe, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee, Raymond A. Kicker, and Louann Kicker. FURTHER ORDERED that the Settlement Agreement and Release attached as Exhibit "G" to the Motion is approved. FURTHER ORDERED that the Receiver is authorized and instructed to execute all documents and/or instruments, and to do all of the acts necessary to effect the Agreement. FURTHER ORDERED that the Receiver is authorized to pay the outstanding balance owed to Stockman Bank of Montana. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/26/06. (MMM)
|
October 26, 2006 |
Filing 665
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #659 Order, #660 Order addressed to Connie Farris. No other address available. Not remailed. (MMM)
|
October 25, 2006 |
Filing 664
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #663 Non-Opposition,,, #651 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with William Kebe, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee, Raymond A. Kicker, and Louann Kicker; Memorandum of Points and Aut; filed by Receiver James H Donell. ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE WITH WILLIAM KEBE, JR., CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE, RAYMOND A. KICKER AND LOUANN KICKER (Moldo, Byron)
|
October 25, 2006 |
Filing 663
NON-OPPOSITION to #651 MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with William Kebe, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee, Raymond A. Kicker, and Louann Kicker; Memorandum of Points and Aut; filed by Receiver James H Donell. NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE WITH WILLIAM KEBE, JR., CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE, RAYMOND A. KICKER AND LOUANN KICKER (Moldo, Byron)
|
October 23, 2006 |
Filing 662
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #607 Judgment, #605 Judgment, #609 Order, #606 Judgment, #608 Judgment addressed to Connie S. Farris. No other address available. Not remailed. (MMM)
|
October 17, 2006 |
Filing 661
NOTICE by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission of Change of Status of Counsel (Sanchez, Jose)
|
October 11, 2006 |
Filing 660
ORDER re #655 Proposed Order Submission, Approving Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, NV. Hearing on 10/6/06 at 9:00am. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/10/06. (AXM)
|
October 11, 2006 |
Filing 659
ORDER re #656 Proposed Order Submission, Approving Sale of Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, NV. Hearing on 10/6/06 at 9:00am. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/10/06. (AXM)
|
October 9, 2006 |
Filing 656
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 9, 2006 |
Filing 655
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #623 MOTION for Order of Sale "Motion to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, He; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 6, 2006 |
Filing 658
EXHIBIT(s) to #654 Motion Hearing held on 10/6/06 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (MAJ)
|
October 6, 2006 |
Filing 657
ORDER approving 9th interim application for approval of receiver's fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/6/06. (MAJ)
|
October 6, 2006 |
Filing 654
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2006 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: none appearing; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Hinck; Time of Hearing: 9:05 am - 9:25 am. RE: #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit filed by James H Donell,, #623 MOTION for Order of Sale "Motion to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, He filed by James H Donell,, #640 MOTION for Hearing NINTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, RODD HAMMAN, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THERE filed by James H Donell,, #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1 filed by James H Donell; all the motions noted above are granted. See the minutes of the court for specifics. Mr. Moldo advises the Court that Connie Farris has yet to sign and return Global Express's 2002 tax return to the Receiver. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Ms. Farris sign and return the original tax return within 7 days of this date. If she fails to do so, the Court will issue an Order to Show Cause. Notice of compliance is due October 16, 2006. (PAV, )
|
October 5, 2006 |
Filing 653
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #649 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-008. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 5, 2006 |
Filing 652
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #648 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-007. (Went, Joseph)
|
October 4, 2006 |
Filing 651
MOTION Approve Settlement Agreement and Release Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with William Kebe, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee, Raymond A. Kicker, and Louann Kicker; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James H. Donell (Certificate of Service attached) by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 10/22/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit G - Motion of Receiver to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release#2 Exhibit H to Motion of Receiver to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release)(Moldo, Byron)
|
October 4, 2006 |
Filing 650
RESPONSE to #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit; filed by Defendant Samir Ghazal. Replies due by 10/18/2006. (Williams Scann, Susan)
|
October 4, 2006 |
Filing 649
MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-008 by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Part 1#2 Exhibit 2, Part 2#3 Exhibit 3-5#4 Exhibit 6 & 7#5 Notice of Motion)(Went, Joseph)
|
October 4, 2006 |
Filing 648
MOTION for Order of Sale of Vacant Land, Assessor's Parcel Number 140-29-212-007 by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-6#2 Exhibit 7, Part 1#3 Exhibit 7, Part 2#4 Exhibit 8-12#5 Exhibit 13#6 Notice of Motion)(Went, Joseph)
|
September 22, 2006 |
Filing 647
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #636 Order on Stipulation, addressed to Connie Farris. (no current address)(AXM)
|
September 19, 2006 |
Filing 646
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2006 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Catherine Whiting; Def Counsel: Richard Schonfeld; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 10:17 - 11:00 a.m.. RE: #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit filed by James H Donell,, #623 MOTION for Order of Sale "Motion to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, He filed by James H Donell,, #619 MOTION relief re 2002 tax return MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER filed by James H Donell. Arguments are heard on the motions. Receiver's Motion for Instructions Regarding Preparation of 2002 Tax Return (#619) is granted. Ms. Farris is to sign the return as corporate officer within 7 days of this date. If she fails to sign the document, then the receiver is authorized to execute the document with the language that it is pursuant to court order. The School Distict and Vanguard investors are to submit sealed bids on the 120 Coporate Park property to the receiver by close of business on October 2, 2006. The bids will be unsealed on October 6, 2006 in open court. First American Title and Insurance is to submit proposed forms for the bonds relating to #537 to the affected parties within in 7 days of this date. Any and all objections to First American Title's proposed forms are due 10/3/06. Further Proceedings on motions 537 and 623 are continued to 10/6/2006 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (PAV)
|
September 18, 2006 |
Filing 645
TRANSMITTAL RETURN of Notice of Appeal from USCA re #632 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 06-16659. Certificate of Record due by 10/30/2006. (AXM)
|
September 18, 2006 |
Filing 644
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #632 Notice of Appeal filed by Dawn M. Reese, C/A #06-16659 (AXM)
|
September 14, 2006 |
Filing 643
REPLY to Response to #619 MOTION relief re 2002 tax return MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER; filed by Receiver James H Donell. DECLARATION OF JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN REPLY TO RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT CONNIE FARRIS #630 TO MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN (Moldo, Byron)
|
September 13, 2006 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #641 Proposed Order Submission, #642 Notice (Other): Documents should have been filed as attachments to motion #640. Attorney notified by email. Attached to motion by Court. (no image attached)(GEW)
|
September 13, 2006 |
Filing 642
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to motion #640. Attorney notified by email. Attached to motion by Court. Modified on 9/14/2006 (GEW).
|
September 13, 2006 |
Filing 641
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to motion #640. Attorney notified by email. Attached to motion by Court. Modified on 9/14/2006 (GEW).
|
September 13, 2006 |
Filing 640
MOTION for Hearing NINTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, RODD HAMMAN, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receivers Interim Report 033106 - 9th Interim Report#2 Exhibit B - Donell Invoices - 9th Interim Application#3 Exhibit C - Moldo Invoices - 9th Interim Application#4 Exhibit D - Howard Invoices - 9th Interim Application#5 Exhibit E - Hamman Invoices - 9th Interim Application#6 Exhibit F - Schaefer Invoices - 9th Interim Application)(Moldo, Byron) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2006 (GEW, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2006 (GEW, ).
|
September 12, 2006 |
Filing 639
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1. (Went, Joseph)
|
September 11, 2006 |
Filing 638
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #637 MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1. (Went, Joseph)
|
September 11, 2006 |
Filing 637
MOTION for Order of Sale (Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 1648 Liege Drive, Henderson, Nevada by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3#2 Exhibit 4-7#3 Exhibit 8-9#4 Exhibit 10-11#5 Exhibit 12)(Went, Joseph)
|
September 6, 2006 |
Filing 635
TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #632 Notice of Appeal. (AXM)
|
September 5, 2006 |
Filing 634
NOTICE of Hearing on #619 MOTION relief re 2002 tax return MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER: Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2006 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached)(PAV)
|
September 5, 2006 |
Filing 633
NOTICE of Hearing on #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit: Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2006 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached)(PAV)
|
September 5, 2006 |
Filing 632
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #605 Judgment by Defendant Dawn M. Reese. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 331329. (Semenza, Lawrence)
|
September 1, 2006 |
Filing 636
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #631 Stipulation to extend time for Receiver to reply to response of Defendant Connie Farris re motion for instructions re preparation of 2002 Tax Return. Replies due by 9/15/2006. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/1/06. (MAJ)
|
August 31, 2006 |
Filing 631
STIPULATION re #630 Response to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, #619 MOTION relief re 2002 tax return MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER; STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RECEIVER TO REPLY TO RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT CONNIE FARRIS TO MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN; ORDER by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
August 30, 2006 |
Filing 629
STATEMENT of James H. Donell, Court-Appointed Receiver Acknowledgment of Receipt of Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief Against Defendant Global Express Securities, Inc. by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Sanchez, Jose)
|
August 30, 2006 |
Filing 628
STATEMENT of James H. Donell, Court-Appointed Receiver Acknowledgment of Receipt of Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief Against Defendant Global Express Capital Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Sanchez, Jose)
|
August 30, 2006 |
Filing 627
STATEMENT of James H. Donell, Court Appointed Receiver Acknowledgment of Receipt of Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief Against Defendant Global Express Capital Mortgage Corp. by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Sanchez, Jose)
|
August 29, 2006 |
Filing 630
RESPONSE to #619 MOTION relief re 2002 tax return MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Replies due by 9/12/2006. (Attachments: #1)(MAJ)
|
August 29, 2006 |
Filing 626
NOTICE by Defendant Connie S. Farris Certificate of Service (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
August 29, 2006 |
Filing 625
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #624 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #623 MOTION for Order of Sale "Motion to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, He. (Went, Joseph)
|
August 24, 2006 |
Filing 624
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #623 MOTION for Order of Sale "Motion to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, He. (Went, Joseph)
|
August 24, 2006 |
Filing 623
MOTION for Order of Sale "Motion to Approve: (1) Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; and (2) Distribution of Net Sale Proceeds of the Real Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada" by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2#2 Exhibit 3a#3 Exhibit 3b#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5a#6 Exhibit 5b#7 Exhibit 5c#8 Exhibit 5d#9 Exhibit 5e-8#10 Exhibit 9a#11 Exhibit 9b#12 Exhibit 10-16)(Went, Joseph)
|
August 17, 2006 |
Filing 622
TRANSMITTAL RETURN of Notice of Appeal from USCA re #615 Amended Notice to Notice of #529 Appeal. USCA Case Number 06-15940(previously given). (AXM)
|
August 15, 2006 |
Filing 621
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #617 Notice (Other). (Went, Joseph)
|
August 15, 2006 |
Filing 620
TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals AMENDED #529 Notice of Appeal AND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL #615 . (AXM)
|
August 14, 2006 |
Filing 619
MOTION relief re 2002 tax return MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING PREPARATION OF 2002 TAX RETURN; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 9/1/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schaefer Estimate#2 Exhibit B - Stipulation re Preparation of 2002 Tax Return#3 Exhibit C - Moldo Sept 6 2005 Letter#4 Exhibit D - Moldo Sept 30 2005 email communication to Schonfeld#5 Exhibit E - Schaefer Oct 4 2005 Letter - pgs 1-12 of 33 pgs#6 Exhibit E - Schaefer Oct 4 2005 Letter - pgs 13-16 of 33 pgs#7 Exhibit E - Schaefer Oct 4 2005 Letter - pgs 17-20 of 33 pgs#8 Exhibit E - Schaefer Oct 4 2005 Letter - pgs 21-33 of 33 pgs#9 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 1-40 of 416 pgs#10 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 41-86 of 416 pgs#11 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 87-130 of 416 pgs#12 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 131-174 of 416 pgs#13 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 175-220 of 416 pgs#14 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 221-267 of 416 pgs#15 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 268-292 of 416 pgs#16 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 293-316 of 416 pgs#17 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 317-354 of 416 pgs#18 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 355-390 of 416 pgs#19 Exhibit F - Proposed 2002 Tax Return - pgs 391-416 of 416 pgs)(Moldo, Byron)
|
August 14, 2006 |
Filing 617
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #609 Order. of Entry of Order On Motion To Approve Sale Of 649 St. Croix, Henderson, Nevada (Went, Joseph)
|
August 11, 2006 |
Filing 616
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Connie S. Farris re #615 Amended Notice of Appeal. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
August 11, 2006 |
Filing 615
NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED) by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard) Amending #529 notice of appeal; appeal #06-15940,
|
August 9, 2006 |
Filing 618
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Leave to Amend in case 2:04-cv-01071-KJD-LRL. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/9/06. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/9/06. (MJZ)
|
August 9, 2006 |
Filing 614
ERROR: Document filed in wrong case. (MJZ)
|
August 8, 2006 |
Filing 613
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Howard, Randolph)
|
August 8, 2006 |
Filing 612
NOTICE by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission of Issuance of Judgments of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief against Entity Defendants Global Express Capital Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC, Global Express Capital Mortgage Corp., and Global Express Securities (Sanchez, Jose)
|
August 8, 2006 |
Filing 611
NOTICE by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission of Issuance of Final Judgment against Defendants Connie S. Farris and Dawn M. Reese (Sanchez, Jose)
|
August 8, 2006 |
Filing 610
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: #603 Motion Hearing held on July 28, 2006 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Court Reporter: Aaron Blazevich. (no image attached) (AAB)
|
August 4, 2006 |
Filing 609
ORDER re #604 Proposed Order approving sale of real property commonly known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, NV. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/4/06. (MAJ)
|
August 3, 2006 |
Filing 608
JUDGMENT of permanent Injunction and other relief in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant Global Express Capital Mortgage Corp.. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/3/06. (MAJ)
|
August 3, 2006 |
Filing 607
JUDGMENT of permanent injunction and other relief in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant Global Express Capital Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/3/06. (MAJ)
|
August 3, 2006 |
Filing 606
JUDGMENT of permanent injunction and other relief in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant Global Express Securities. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/3/06. (MAJ)
|
August 3, 2006 |
Filing 605
JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants Connie S. Farris and Dawn M. Reese. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/3/06. (MAJ)
|
August 3, 2006 |
Filing 604
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
July 28, 2006 |
Filing 603
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2006 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Catherine Whiting (via telephone); Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 11:00 - 11:50 a.m.. RE: #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint filed by James H Donell,, #573 GRANTED; Receiver may amend the complaint in 2:04-cv-1040-KJD-LRL to add beneficiaries but DENIED as to the request to add a claim for slander of title. Proposed Order and proposed amended complaint is due 8/4/06. The foreclosure sale is to be postponed to allow the beneficiaries to file answers and/or challenges to the amended complaint. RE: MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada filed by James H Donell, is GRANTED, subject to the retention of Sundance Pool's Mechanic's Lien Claim. The Court will allow counsel to brief issues regarding Sundance Pool's mechanic's lien on the St. Croix property. Mr. Howard is to submit a proposed order for the sale of the St. Croix property by August 4, 2006. The Court comments on Defendant Farris' response to this motion and cautions counsel that any futher pleadings filed in bad faith will result in sanctions. (PAV, )
|
July 27, 2006 |
Filing 602
NOTICE by Interested Party Paris W. Robert NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING OF PARIS W. ROBERT (Berman, Brian)
|
July 27, 2006 |
Filing 601
REPLY to Response to #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Howard, Randolph)
|
July 25, 2006 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #597 Exhibit: Document should have been filed as an attachment to #596 . Attorney notified by email. Document attached by Court. (no image attached)(GEW)
|
July 25, 2006 |
Filing 600
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #596 . Attached by Court. Attorney notified by email. Modified on 7/26/2006 (GEW).
|
July 25, 2006 |
Filing 599
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #596 . Attached by Court. Attorney notified by email. Modified on 7/26/2006 (GEW).
|
July 25, 2006 |
Filing 598
REPLY to Response to #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
July 25, 2006 |
Filing 597
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #596 . Attached by Court. Attorney notified by email. Modified on 7/26/2006 (GEW).
|
July 25, 2006 |
Filing 596
RESPONSE to #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint; filed by Defendant American Exchange, Inc.. (Olsen, Eric) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2006 (GEW, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2006 (GEW, ).
|
July 25, 2006 |
Filing 595
RESPONSE to #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint; filed by Interested Party Paris W. Robert. and Canyon Lenders LLC Replies due by 8/8/2006. (Attachments: #1 #2)(Berman, Brian)
|
July 25, 2006 |
Filing 594
REPLY to Response to #551 MOTION for Leave to File; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Reply to Samir Ghazal's Opposition to Receiver's Crossmotion for Summary Judgment Permanently Enjoining Ghazal From Completing Litigation) (Went, Joseph)
|
July 24, 2006 |
Filing 593
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint, #588 Notice (Other), #592 Notice (Other). (Cantwell, Michelle)
|
July 21, 2006 |
Filing 592
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint. For Hearing Set July 28, 2006 (Cantwell, Michelle)
|
July 21, 2006 |
Filing 591
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada. (Notice of Hearing on Motion to Approve Sale of 649 St. Croix, Henderson, Nevada) (Howard, Randolph)
|
July 21, 2006 |
Filing 590
RESPONSE to #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada; (Monson, Douglas)
|
July 20, 2006 |
Filing 589
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Kent J. Dawson, U.S. District Judge on 7/20/2006. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint filed by James H Donell,, #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada filed by James H Donell. Responses to #587 due by 7/25/2006. Replies (if any) to #587 due by 7/27/2006. Motion Hearing on #573 and #587 is set for 7/28/2006 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Counsel wishing to participate by telephone must contact Peggie Vannozzi at 702-464-5429 no later than 4 p.m. on or before July 27, 2006. (no image attached) (PAV)
|
July 20, 2006 |
Filing 588
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #587 Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint. (Cantwell, Michelle)
|
July 20, 2006 |
Filing 587
Emergency MOTION Instructions And Leave To Amend Its Complaint by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 8/7/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 and 4)(Cantwell, Michelle)
|
July 12, 2006 |
Filing 586
REPLY to Response to #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) 1-5)(Went, Joseph)
|
July 10, 2006 |
Filing 585
REPLY to Response to #551 MOTION for Leave to File; filed by Defendant Samir Ghazal. (Williams Scann, Susan)
|
July 7, 2006 |
Filing 584
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #582 Stipulation for time to file reply to crossmotion. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/6/06. (AXM)
|
July 6, 2006 |
Filing 583
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: #268 Motion Hearing held on July 19, 2005 before Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. Court Reporter: N/A. (AAB)
|
July 5, 2006 |
Filing 582
STIPULATION re #568 Response to Motion for Leave to File Document; by Defendant Samir Ghazal. (Williams Scann, Susan)
|
July 5, 2006 |
Filing 581
ORDER ON MANDATE as to #534 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Court of Appeals on 6/30/06. (AXM)
|
June 30, 2006 |
Filing 580
ORDER re #569 Proposed Order Submission filed by James H Donell for determination of claims and distribute funds. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/28/06. (AXM)
|
June 30, 2006 |
Filing 579
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #563 Stipulation for time to file reply to opposition of recommendations; and opposition to motion to complete discovery. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/27/06. (AXM)
|
June 28, 2006 |
Filing 578
RESPONSE to #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Opposition to Receiver's Motion Regarding Sale of Property Located at 649 St. Croix (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
June 26, 2006 |
Filing 577
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #574 Notice (Other), #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 26, 2006 |
Filing 576
NOTICE of Change of Address by Byron Z. Moldo. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 23, 2006 |
Filing 575
EXHIBIT(s) 11 Through 13 to #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 23, 2006 |
Filing 574
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #573 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 23, 2006 |
Filing 573
MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, Nevada by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-6#2 Exhibit 7#3 Exhibit 8#4 Exhibit 9#5 Exhibit 10#6 Proposed Order)(Went, Joseph)
|
June 20, 2006 |
Filing 572
Joinder to Opposition/Response to Receiver's Recommendations re #554 Response to Motion for Disbursement of Funds, by Interested Parties Robert mohr, Roland & Eleanor weinstein. (Rasmussen, Lisa) Modified on 6/21/2006 to correct entry(GEW).
|
June 20, 2006 |
Filing 571
NOTICE of Appearance. on behalf of Mohr and Weinstein (Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
June 20, 2006 |
Filing 570
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #567 Reply to Response to Motion, #568 Response to Motion for Leave to File Document. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 19, 2006 |
Filing 569
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #373 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds, #545 Notice (Other); filed by Receiver James H Donell. Order Granting Receiver's Determination on Claims and to Distribute Funds (Moldo, Byron)
|
June 19, 2006 |
Filing 568
RESPONSE to #551 MOTION for Leave to File; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit s 2-4)(Went, Joseph)
|
June 19, 2006 |
Filing 567
REPLY to Response to #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 19, 2006 |
Filing 566
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #564 Order on Motion for Return of Property. (Howard, Randolph)
|
June 16, 2006 |
Filing 565
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2006 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Catherine Whiting; Def Counsel: none appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 11:42 a.m. - 12:00 noon. James Donnell, receiver, and his counsel, Byron Moldo, are present. The Court makes findings RE: #546 MOTION for Hearing EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by James H Donell, and GRANTS the motion. The proposed order will be signed and filed. Mr. Mobin and Esther Malkin (phonetic spelling) make statements for the record. Mr. Moldo proposes a change in proposed order #389. The Court will allow the change. Mr. Moldo will submit a new proposed order. (no image attached) (PAV)
|
June 15, 2006 |
Filing 564
ORDER granting #533 Motion for Return of Partial Property sale proceeds. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/14/06. (AXM)
|
June 14, 2006 |
Filing 563
STIPULATION re #550 Response to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, #551 MOTION for Leave to File; by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 14, 2006 |
Filing 562
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #558 Reply to Response to Motion. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 13, 2006 |
Filing 561
NOTICE by Interested Party United Land Investors Corporation of Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: docket #554#2 Exhibit B: Docket #559#3 Exhibit C: Docket #560)(Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
June 13, 2006 |
Filing 560
JOINDER to Response/Opposition #554 to Receiver's Motion for Disbursement of Funds by Interested Party Paris W. Robert. (Rasmussen, Lisa) Modified on 6/14/2006 to create relationship (GEW).
|
June 13, 2006 |
Filing 559
NOTICE of Appearance. for Paris W. Robert, Trustee, (Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
June 13, 2006 |
Filing 558
REPLY to Response to #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
June 7, 2006 |
Filing 557
REPLY to Response to #546 MOTION for Hearing EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; filed by Receiver James H Donell. REPLY OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT CONNIE FARRIS TO RECEIVER'S EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVER'S FEES AND EXPENSES #556 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10/27/05 Reply of Receiver (w/o exhibits)#2 Exhibit B - Schaefer Declaration dated 9/29/05#3 Exhibit C - 11/1/05 Objection of Farris to Receiver 6th Interim App#4 Exhibit D - Receiver Declaration dtd 12/30/05 (w/o exhibits))(Moldo, Byron)
|
June 5, 2006 |
Filing 556
RESPONSE to Receiver's Eighth Interim Report and Receiver's Request for Approval of Fees filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
May 31, 2006 |
Filing 555
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on Appeal Transmitted to USCA re #534 Notice of Appeal, AND #529 Notice of Appeal. (AXM)
|
May 30, 2006 |
Filing 554
RESPONSE to #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit; filed by Interested Party United Land Investors Corporation. Replies due by 6/13/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B#2 Exhibit C#3 Exhibit D, E and F)(Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
May 30, 2006 |
Filing 553
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #533 MOTION for Return of Property re #507 Order of Sale. Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Partially Recover Sales Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; Declaration of James H. Done, #552 Non-Opposition,, ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO PARTIALLY RECOVER SALE PROCEEDS OF REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 1499 MacDONALD RANCH DRIVE, HENDERSON, NEVADA (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 30, 2006 |
Filing 552
NON-OPPOSITION to #533 MOTION for Return of Property re #507 Order of Sale. Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Partially Recover Sales Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; Declaration of James H. Done; filed by Receiver James H Donell. NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF JAMES H. DONELL, PERMANENT RECEIVER, TO PARTIALLY RECOVER SALE PROCEEDS OF REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 1499 MacDONALD RANCH DRIVE, HENDERSON, NEVADA (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 30, 2006 |
Filing 551
MOTION for Leave to File by Defendant Samir Ghazal. (AXM)
|
May 30, 2006 |
Filing 550
RESPONSE to #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit; filed by Defendant Global Express Capital Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC. Replies due by 6/13/2006. (AXM)
|
May 26, 2006 |
Filing 549
NOTICE by Interested Party United Land Investors Corporation re #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit, #539 Proposed Order Submission. Objection to Receiver's Recommendation/Proposed Order (Rasmussen, Lisa)
|
May 24, 2006 |
Filing 548
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #546 MOTION for Hearing EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #547 Proposed Order Submission,. NOTICE OF HEARING ON RECEIVERS EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 24, 2006 |
Filing 547
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #546 MOTION for Hearing EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; filed by Receiver James H Donell. ORDER APPROVING EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 24, 2006 |
Filing 546
MOTION for Hearing EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JAMES H. DONELL, BYRON Z. MOLDO, RANDOLPH L. HOWARD, AND JAMES T. SCHAEFER IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver interim report dated 12/31/05#2 Exhibit B - Donell Statement#3 Exhibit C - Moldo Statement#4 Exhibit D - Howard Statement#5 Exhibit E - Schaefer Statement)(Moldo, Byron)
|
May 24, 2006 |
Filing 545
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #388 Motion Hearing,,,,,, #374 Notice (Other). NOTICE OF AMENDMENT NO. 1 TO COURT APPROVED INVESTOR CLAIMS #373 (Moldo, Byron)
|
May 24, 2006 |
Filing 544
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Defendant Connie S. Farris re C/A 06-15940 #529 Notice of Appeal, #113 Miscellaneous Hearing, #18 Miscellaneous Hearing, #268 Miscellaneous Hearing. (AXM)
|
May 24, 2006 |
Filing 543
TRANSMITTAL RETURN of Notice of Appeal from USCA re #529 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 06-15940. (AXM)
|
May 24, 2006 |
Filing 542
TRANSMITTAL RETURN of Notice of Appeal from USCA re #534 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 06-15942. (AXM)
|
May 22, 2006 |
Filing 541
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Defendant Connie S. Farris re #529 Notice of Appeal, #268 Miscellaneous Hearing, #113 Miscellaneous Hearing, #18 Miscellaneous Hearing. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
May 16, 2006 |
Filing 540
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #538 Notice (Other), #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit. (Went, Joseph)
|
May 10, 2006 |
Filing 539
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
May 10, 2006 |
Filing 538
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #537 MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit. (Went, Joseph)
|
May 10, 2006 |
Filing 537
MOTION Replace Cash On Deposit and Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution Of Cash Held On Deposit by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 5/28/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D#2 Exhibit E and E1 to E5#3 Exhibit E6 and E7)(Went, Joseph)
|
May 8, 2006 |
Filing 536
TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #534 Notice of Appeal, #529 Notice of Appeal. (MAJ)
|
May 8, 2006 |
Filing 535
SUPPLEMENT Certificate of Service of the Civil Appeal Docketing Statement by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
May 8, 2006 |
Filing 533
MOTION for Return of Property re #507 Order of Sale. Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Partially Recover Sales Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; Declaration of James H. Donell by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 5/26/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 22, 2006 Court Order#2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Current Noteholders#3 Exhibit C - Receiver's April 12, 2006 Letter#4 Exhibit D - Chart)(Moldo, Byron)
|
May 5, 2006 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #532 Notice (Other): Wrong event selected - Attorney notified by email to refile document under Motion. (no image attached)(GEW)
|
May 5, 2006 |
Filing 532
ERROR: Wrong event selected. Attorney notified to refiled document under Motion. Modified on 5/8/2006 (GEW).
|
May 5, 2006 |
Filing 531
STATEMENT Civil Appeals Docketing Statement by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Appeals Docketing Statement#2 Exhibit 2nd Continuation Appeals Docketing Statement)(Schonfeld, Richard)
|
April 27, 2006 |
Filing 534
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #509 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Dawn M. Reese. Filing fee $ 455. (MAJ)
|
April 26, 2006 |
Filing 530
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
April 26, 2006 |
Filing 529
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 192363. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
April 21, 2006 |
Filing 528
REPLY to Response to #505 MOTION to Compel for Approval of Administrative Claim; filed by Defendant American Exchange, Inc.. American Exchange, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Motion for Approval of Administrative Claim (Schwarz, Joel)
|
April 17, 2006 |
Filing 527
ERRATA to #519 Declaration; Notice of Errata filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 526
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #525 Settlement Agreement; filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief Against Defendant Global Express Securities (Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 525
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent to Entry of Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief by Defendant Global Express Securities, Inc. by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 524
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #523 Settlement Agreement, ; filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief Against Defendant Global Express Capital Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC (Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 523
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent to Entry of Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief by Defendant Global Express Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 522
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #521 Settlement Agreement; filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief Against Defendant Global Express Capital Mortgage Corp. (Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 521
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent to Entry of Judgment of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief by Defendant Global Express Capital Mortgage Corp. by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 520
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #519 Declaration; filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. [Proposed] Final Judgment Against Defendants Connie S. Farris and Dawn M. Reese (Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 14, 2006 |
Filing 519
DECLARATION of Jose F. Sanchez [Proposed Final Judgment Concurrently Filed] by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 12, 2006 |
Filing 518
RESPONSE to #505 MOTION to Compel for Approval of Administrative Claim; filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Opposition to American Exchange, Inc.'s Motion for Approval of Administrative Claim Replies due by 4/26/2006. (Sanchez, Jose)
|
April 10, 2006 |
Filing 517
REPLY to Response to #505 MOTION to Compel for Approval of Administrative Claim; filed by Defendant American Exchange, Inc.. (Olsen, Eric)
|
April 10, 2006 |
Filing 516
REPLY to Response to #505 MOTION to Compel for Approval of Administrative Claim; filed by Defendant American Exchange, Inc.. Reply to Opposition of Connie Farris to Motion for Approval of Administrative Claim (Schwarz, Joel)
|
April 5, 2006 |
Filing 515
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #451 Order of Sale, #447 Proposed Order Submission,. Notice of Entry of Order Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 21) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California (Moldo, Byron)
|
April 5, 2006 |
Filing 514
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #507 Order of Sale, #506 Proposed Order Submission,. Notice of Entry of Order Granting Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada (Moldo, Byron)
|
March 29, 2006 |
Filing 513
RESPONSE to #505 MOTION to Compel for Approval of Administrative Claim; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Opposition of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Motion of American Exchange Inc. for Approval of Administrative Claim; Declaration of James H. Donell Replies due by 4/12/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 120905 Notice of Hearing on Claims Motion (pgs. 1-38)#2 Exhibit A - 120905 Notice of Hearing on Claims Motion (pgs. 39-79)#3 Exhibit B - 010306 Minutes of the Court#4 Exhibit C - Complaint)(Moldo, Byron)
|
March 29, 2006 |
Filing 512
RESPONSE to #505 MOTION to Compel for Approval of Administrative Claim; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Opposition to Motion to American Exchange's Motion for Approval of Administrative Claim Replies due by 4/12/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7)(Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 29, 2006 |
Filing 511
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Kent J. Dawson, U.S. District Judge on 3/29/2006. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #509 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs are to submit a proposed judgment by 4/14/2006.(no image attached) (PAV, )
|
March 28, 2006 |
Filing 510
ORDER denying as moot #474 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 03-38-06. (MBS, )
|
March 28, 2006 |
Filing 509
ORDER terminating/GRANTING #215 Motion for Summary Judgment; Judgment shall be entered in the Commission's Favor consistent herewith. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/28/06. (AXM, )
|
March 23, 2006 |
Filing 508
ORDER OF SALE of the property 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, NV; re #404 Proposed Order Submission filed by James H Donell,, #402 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell filed by James H Donell,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/22/06. (AXM, )
|
March 22, 2006 |
Filing 507
ORDER OF SALE (1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV) re #506 Proposed Order Submission, filed by James H Donell,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/21/06. (AXM, )
|
March 21, 2006 |
Filing 506
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #409 Declaration, ; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Order Granting Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada (Moldo, Byron)
|
March 13, 2006 |
Filing 505
MOTION to Compel for Approval of Administrative Claim. Responses due by 3/31/2006. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits C, D and E#2 Exhibit Exhibits F through M)(Olsen, Eric)
|
March 10, 2006 |
Filing 504
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2006 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Catherine Whiting; Def Counsel: Richard Schonfeld; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 11:30 a.m.. RE: #433 MOTION for Hearing of Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereo filed by James H Donell,, #402 is granted. MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell filed by James H Donell, is taken under advisement. The Court hears argument on #409 Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Estate Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Dr., Henderson, NV and approves the recommendations. Mr. Moldo will submit a proposed order. (no image attached) (PAV, )
|
March 7, 2006 |
Filing 502
REPLY to #433 MOTION for Hearing of Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Poionts and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereo, #488 Response - Other; Reply of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Response of Defendant Connie Farris to Receiver's Seventh Interim Fee Application filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
March 7, 2006 |
Filing 501
NON-OPPOSITION to #433 MOTION for Hearing of Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Poionts and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereo, #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;; filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Nonopposition to Receiver's (1) Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; and (2) Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive (Sanchez, Jose)
|
March 7, 2006 |
Filing 500
REPLY to Response to #402 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Howard, Randolph)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 503
LETTER from Paula Kash dated 3/2/2006 re: return of documents. (RFJ)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 499
REPLY to #452 Response to Motion for Disbursement of Funds, #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;, #409 Declaration, ; Reply of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, to Response of Defendant Connie Farris to Receiver's Investigation Regarding Inappropriate Payments and Recommendations filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 498
EXHIBIT(s) 10 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 497
EXHIBIT(s) 9 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 496
EXHIBIT(s) 8 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 495
EXHIBIT(s) 7 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 494
EXHIBIT(s) 6 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 493
EXHIBIT(s) 5 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 492
EXHIBIT(s) 4 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 491
EXHIBIT(s) 3 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 490
EXHIBIT(s) 2 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 489
EXHIBIT(s) 1 to #488 Response - Other; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 6, 2006 |
Filing 488
RESPONSE Defendant Connie Farris' Response to Receiver's Seventh Interim Report filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 487
ORDER OF SALE re #427 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada filed by James H Donell,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/2/06. (AXM, )
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 486
EXHIBIT(s) 11 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 485
EXHIBIT(s) 10 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 484
EXHIBIT(s) 9 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 483
EXHIBIT(s) 8 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 482
EXHIBIT(s) 7 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 481
EXHIBIT(s) 6 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 480
EXHIBIT(s) 5 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 479
EXHIBIT(s) 4 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 478
EXHIBIT(s) 3 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 477
EXHIBIT(s) 2 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 476
EXHIBIT(s) 1 to #475 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 475
RESPONSE to #427 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Defendant Connie Farris' Response to Motion of James H. Donell to Sell 120 Coporate Park (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 2, 2006 |
Filing 474
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Receiver's Motion for Court Approval of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park and Notice of Hearing on Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
March 1, 2006 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #466 Exhibit, #459 Exhibit, #457 Exhibit, #456 Exhibit, #467 Exhibit, #463 Exhibit, #453 Exhibit, #472 Exhibit, #458 Exhibit, #464 Exhibit, #469 Exhibit, #460 Exhibit, #455 Exhibit, #461 Exhibit, #470 Exhibit, #465 Exhibit, #454 Exhibit, #473 Exhibit, #462 Exhibit, #468 Exhibit, #471 Exhibit: Exhibits were filed as separate documents - refiled correctly as attachments to response by Court. (no image attached)(GEW)
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 473
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 472
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 471
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 470
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 469
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 468
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 467
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 466
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 465
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 464
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/8/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 463
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 462
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 461
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 460
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 459
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 458
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 457
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 456
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 455
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 454
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 453
ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to #452 . Refiled/corrected by Court. Modified on 3/7/2006 (GEW).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 452
RESPONSE to filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Defendant Connie Farris' Response to Motion of James H. Donell, To Distribute Proceeds of Sale of 1499 McDonald Ranch Drive Replies due by 3/15/2006. (Schonfeld, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2006 (GEW, ).
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 451
ORDER OF SALE re #447 Proposed Order Submission, filed by James H Donell, for timeshare unit (week21) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, CA. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/28/06. (AXM, )
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 450
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #449 Non-Opposition. (Went, Joseph)
|
March 1, 2006 |
Filing 449
NON-OPPOSITION to #427 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
February 23, 2006 |
Filing 448
NON-OPPOSITION to #401 MOTION for Order of Sale Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 21) Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Approve Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 21) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 23, 2006 |
Filing 447
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #400 Notice (Other), #401 MOTION for Order of Sale Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 21) Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Order Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 21) at Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 22, 2006 |
Filing 445
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #380 Notice of Hearing, #391 Proposed Order Submission, #379 Proposed Order Submission. Notice of Entry of Second Amended Order Approving Sale of Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 21, 2006 |
Filing 444
EXHIBIT(s) E to #439 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 21, 2006 |
Filing 443
EXHIBIT(s) D to #439 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 21, 2006 |
Filing 442
EXHIBIT(s) C to #439 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 21, 2006 |
Filing 441
EXHIBIT(s) B to #439 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 21, 2006 |
Filing 440
EXHIBIT(s) A to #402 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell, #439 Response to Motion for Order of Sale, ; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 21, 2006 |
Filing 439
RESPONSE to #402 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Defendant Connie Farris' Response to Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, for Order Approving Sale of Property at 115 HollyBrook Court (Schonfeld, Richard)
|
February 16, 2006 |
Filing 446
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 412 Notice of Hearing, addressed to Lawrence J. Semenza, II, 3027 E. Sunset Road, Suite 106, Las Vegas, NV. No further address available. (MMM, )
|
February 16, 2006 |
Filing 438
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re 412 Notice of Hearing,, #409 Declaration,. Notice of Hearing on Receiver's Recommendations Re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 13, 2006 |
Filing 437
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #427 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada, #428 Exhibit, #430 Exhibit, #429 Exhibit,. (Went, Joseph)
|
February 13, 2006 |
Filing 436
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #402 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
February 10, 2006 |
Filing 435
ORDER denying #261 Motion to withdraw admissions. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/9/06. (AXM, )
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 434
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #432 Notice (Other), #433 MOTION for Hearing of Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Poionts and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereo; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 433
MOTION for Hearing of Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses; Memorandum of Poionts and Authorities; Declarations of James H. Donell, Byron Z. Moldo, Randolph L. Howard, and James T. Schaefer in Support Thereof re #432 Notice (Other) by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Interim Report as of September 30 2005#2 Exhibit B - Progress Report Letter dated Sept 9 2005#3 Exhibit C - Invoices of James Donell#4 Exhibit D - Byron Moldo Invoices#5 Exhibit E - Randolph Howard Invoices#6 Exhibit F - James Schaefer Invoices)(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 432
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell of Hearing on Receiver's Seventh Interim Application for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 431
ORDER AFFIRMING Magistrate Judges #290 Order filed by Bonnie Lee,, Connie S. Farris,, Dawn M. Reese,, Don Brandenburg,, Everett D. Nason,, Frank Vignola,, Glenda Brandenburg,, James Gay,, Paris W. Robert,, Rex Farris,, Richard G. Stevenson,, Robert E. Rippe,, Rosa Diaz,, Samir Ghazal,, Artistic Estates, Inc.,, BDCC Trust,, Black Tie Investments Corporation,, Global Express Capital Mortgage Corp.,, Global Express Capital Real Estate Investment Fund I, LLC,, Global Express International Consulting Services, Inc.,, Global Express Securities, Inc.,, Grandview Construction, Inc.,, Perpetual Investment, Inc.,, Rawlings, Olson, Cannon, Gormley & Desruisseaux,, Securities & Exchange Commission,, Securities & Exchange Commission,; ORDER DENYING OBJECTIONS and Countermotion #201 Motion for Protective Order filed by Connie S. Farris,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/9/06. (AXM, )
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 430
EXHIBIT(S) to #427 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; (Exhibits 3 through 5) filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Went, Joseph)
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 429
EXHIBIT(S) to #427 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; (Exhibit 2) filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-B#2 Exhibit 2-C#3 Exhibit 2-D)(Went, Joseph)
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 428
EXHIBIT(S) to #427 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada; (Exhibit 1) filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
February 9, 2006 |
Filing 427
MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known as 120 Corporate Park Drive, Henderson, Nevada by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Notice of Motion)(Went, Joseph)
|
February 7, 2006 |
Filing 426
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #422 Exhibit,,,,, #420 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #419 Exhibit,,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #424 Exhibit,,,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #425 Exhibit,,,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #421 Exhibit,,,,, #416 Exhibit,,, #423 Exhibit,,,, ; Exhibit 33 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-25 of 56] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33 - USL Summary Report [Pages 26-56 of 56])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 7, 2006 |
Filing 425
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #422 Exhibit,,,,, #420 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #419 Exhibit,,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #424 Exhibit,,,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #421 Exhibit,,,,, #416 Exhibit,,, #423 Exhibit,,,, ; Exhibit 32 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-11 of 67] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32 - ACH 12/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 12-23 of 67]#2 Exhibit 32 - ACH 12/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 24-35 of 67]#3 Exhibit 32 - ACH 12/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 36-47 of 67]#4 Exhibit 32 - ACH 12/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 48-59 of 67]#5 Exhibit 32 - ACH 12/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 60-67 of 67])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 7, 2006 |
Filing 424
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #422 Exhibit,,,,, #420 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #419 Exhibit,,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #421 Exhibit,,,,, #416 Exhibit,,, #423 Exhibit,,,, ; Exhibit 31 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-11 of 67] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31 - ACH 10/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 12-23 of 67]#2 Exhibit 31 - ACH 10/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 24-35 of 67]#3 Exhibit 31 - ACH 10/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 36-47 of 67]#4 Exhibit 31 - ACH 10/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 48-59 of 67]#5 Exhibit 31 - ACH 10/1/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 60-67 of 67])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 7, 2006 |
Filing 423
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #422 Exhibit,,,,, #420 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #419 Exhibit,,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #421 Exhibit,,,,, #416 Exhibit,, ; Exhibit 30 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-13 of 76] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30 - ACH 9/2/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 14-27 of 76]#2 Exhibit 30 - ACH 9/2/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 28-41 of 76]#3 Exhibit 30 - ACH 9/2/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 42-55 of 76]#4 Exhibit 30 - ACH 9/2/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 56-69 of 76]#5 Exhibit 30 - ACH 9/2/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 70-76 of 76])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 7, 2006 |
Filing 422
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #420 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #419 Exhibit,,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #421 Exhibit,,,,, #416 Exhibit,, ; Exhibit 29 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-12 of 75] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29 - ACH 7/25/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 13-25 of 75]#2 Exhibit 29 - ACH 7/25/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 26-38 of 75]#3 Exhibit 29 - ACH 7/25/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 39-51 of 75]#4 Exhibit 29 - ACH 7/25/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 52-64 of 75]#5 Exhibit 29 - ACH 7/25/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 65-75 of 75])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 7, 2006 |
Filing 421
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #420 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #419 Exhibit,,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #416 Exhibit,, ; Exhibit 28 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-15 of 75] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28 - ACH 7/03/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 16-28 of 75]#2 Exhibit 28 - ACH 7/03/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 29-41 of 75]#3 Exhibit 28 - ACH 7/03/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 42-54 of 75]#4 Exhibit 28 - ACH 7/03/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 55-67 of 75]#5 Exhibit 28 - ACH 7/03/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks {Pages 68-75 of 75])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 420
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #419 Exhibit,,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #416 Exhibit,, ; Exhibit Index and Attached Exhibits 28 through 33 to Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 419
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #418 Exhibit,,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #416 Exhibit,, ; Exhibit 27 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-20] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27 - ACH 5/30/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 21-35 of 79]#2 Exhibit 27 - ACH 5/30/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 36-50 of 79]#3 Exhibit 27 - ACH 5/30/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 51-65 of 79]#4 Exhibit 27 - ACH 5/30/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 66-79 of 79])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 418
EXHIBIT(S) to #417 Exhibit,,, #413 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #416 Exhibit,, ; Exhibit 26 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-26 of 78] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - ACH 5/6/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 27-52 of 78]#2 Exhibit 26 - ACH 5/6/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 53-78 of 78])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 417
EXHIBIT(S) to #413 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #416 Exhibit,, ; Exhibit 25 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-27 of 81] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25 - ACH 3/28/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 28-54 of 81]#2 Exhibit 25 - ACH 3/28/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 55-81 of 81])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 416
EXHIBIT(S) to #413 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #414 Exhibit,,, #415 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,, ; Exhibit 24 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-24 of 74] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24 - ACH 1/24/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 25-48 of 74]#2 Exhibit 24 - ACH 1/24/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 49-74 of 74])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 415
EXHIBIT(S) to #413 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #414 Exhibit,,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,, ; Exhibit 23 to Receiver's Recommendations re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-25 of 75] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23 - ACH 1/3/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 26-50 of 75]#2 Exhibit 23 - ACH 1/3/03 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 51-75 of 75])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 414
EXHIBIT(S) to #413 Exhibit,, #409 Declaration,, #411 Exhibit,,,,,,, ; Exhibit 22 to Receiver's Recommendations Re Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer [Pages 1-26 of 79] filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22 - ACH 12/5/02 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [pages 27-52 of 79]#2 Exhibit 22 - ACH 12/5/02 Payment / ACH transfer information received from USL and copies of checks [Pages 53-79 of 79])(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 413
EXHIBIT(S) to #411 Exhibit,,,,,,,, #409 Declaration, ; Exhibit Index and Attached Exhibits 22 through 27 to Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, NV; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 6, 2006 |
Filing 412
NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distributio of sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Dr., Henderson, Nevada (409, related filings 410 & 411) is set for 3/10/2006 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached)(PAV, )
|
February 3, 2006 |
Filing 411
EXHIBIT(S) to #409 Declaration, ; Exhibit Index and Attached Exhibit A and Exhibits 1 through 21 to Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Hendeson, Nevada; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer filed by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Schedule#2 Exhibit 1 - VCS Check History Report/Acct. No. 1329-OP#3 Exhibit 2 - VCS Check History Report/Acct. No. 1403-OP#4 Exhibit 3 - Payment Vouchers for GECM disbursements#5 Exhibit 4 - VCS ledger re $315,000 entry of 2-Oct-01 / Acct. No. 1403-OP#6 Exhibit 5 - VCS Payment voucher / Project #1329-OP#7 Exhibit 6 - Black Tie Development Co. / VCS payment vouchers#8 Exhibit 7 - Individual VCS ledgers / Project 1329-OP#9 Exhibit 8 - VCS files for Acct. No. 1329-OP re deposited items#10 Exhibit 9 - Deposits to Acct. No. 1403-OP#11 Exhibit 10 - USL Borrower Statement of Acct. No. GM001131 (All Activity)#12 Exhibit 11 - Funds analysis#13 Exhibit 12 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 12/5/02 - Due Date 11/25/02#14 Exhibit 13 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 1/3/03 - Due Date 12/25/02#15 Exhibit 14 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 1/24/03 - Due Date 1/25/03#16 Exhibit 15 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 3/28/03 - Due Date 3/25/03#17 Exhibit 16 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 5/6/03 - Due Date 4/25/03#18 Exhibit 17 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 5/30/03 - Due Date 5/25/03#19 Exhibit 18 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 7/03/03 - Due Date 6/25/03#20 Exhibit 19 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 9/02/03 - Due Date 8/25/03#21 Exhibit 20 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 10/01/03 - Due Date 9/25/03#22 Exhibit 21 - Analysis / Recorded by USL 11/25/03 - Due Date 10/25/03)(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 3, 2006 |
Filing 410
NOTICE by Receiver James H Donell re #409 Declaration,. of Receiver's Investigation Regarding Inappropriate Payments and Recommendations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Schedule)(Moldo, Byron)
|
February 3, 2006 |
Filing 409
DECLARATION of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer re #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;; filed by Receiver James H Donell. re Receiver's Recommendations Regarding Distribution of Sale Proceeds of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 MacDonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; Declarations of James H. Donell and James T. Schaefer (Moldo, Byron)
|
February 2, 2006 |
Filing 408
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #402 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
January 27, 2006 |
Filing 407
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #402 MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell. (Went, Joseph)
|
January 26, 2006 |
Filing 406
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #404 Proposed Order Submission, #403 Notice (Other): Notice of motion and proposed order should be filed as attachments to motion not separate documents - refiled by Court (no image attached)(GEW)
|
January 26, 2006 |
Filing 405
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #400 Notice (Other): Notice of motion should have been filed as attachment to actual motion - refiled by Court (no image attached)(GEW)
|
January 26, 2006 |
Filing 404
CORRECTION: ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to motion #402 - refiled by Court Modified on 1/27/2006 (GEW).
|
January 26, 2006 |
Filing 403
CORRECTION: ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to motion #402 - refiled by Court Modified on 1/27/2006 (GEW).
|
January 26, 2006 |
Filing 402
MOTION for Order of Sale of Property Commonly Known As 115 Hollybrook Court, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of James H. Donell by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3#2 Exhibit Exhibits 4 and 5#3 Exhibit Exhibits 6, 7 and 8)(Went, Joseph) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (GEW, ).
|
January 26, 2006 |
Filing 401
MOTION for Order of Sale Approving Sale of Timeshare Unit (Week 21) Marriott Newport Coast Villas, Newport Beach, California by Receiver James H Donell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note dated 06-25-03#2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust#3 Exhibit C - Sale Escrow Instructions)(Moldo, Byron) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2006 (GEW, ).
|
January 26, 2006 |
Filing 400
CORRECTION: ERROR: Document should have been filed as attachment to motion #401 - refiled by Court Modified on 1/27/2006 (GEW).
|
January 18, 2006 |
Filing 399
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 396 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, addressed to Lawrence Semenza. (AXM, )
|
January 13, 2006 |
Filing 398
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 390 Notice of Docket Correction addressed to Lawrence Sennenza. (AXM, )
|
January 12, 2006 |
Filing 397
ORDER APPROVING SALE of 1499 MACDONALD RANCH DRIVE, Henderson NV; re #391 Proposed Order Submission filed by James H Donell,. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/9/06. (AXM, )
|
January 9, 2006 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: The Court currently has dispositive motion(s) before it. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 6/1/2006, or 30 days after the Court decides the dispositive motions, whichever is first. (PAV, )
|
January 6, 2006 |
Filing 391
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;, #379 Proposed Order Submission; filed by Receiver James H Donell. Second Amended (Moldo, Byron)
|
January 6, 2006 |
Filing 390
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #388 Minutes of Proceedings on Motion Hearing,,,,, dated 1/3/06: Heather Newman was the court reporter, not Felicia Zabin (no image attached)(PAV, )
|
January 5, 2006 |
Filing 389
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Receiver James H Donell. Granting Receiver's Determination on Claims & to Distribute Funds (Moldo, Byron)
|
January 3, 2006 |
Filing 392
STATUS REPORT RE #373 Motion of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, for Order Approving Receiver's Determination on Claims and to Distribute Funds by Receiver James H Donell. (MMM, )
|
January 3, 2006 |
Filing 388
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2006 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Catherine Whiting; Def Counsel: Richard Schonfeld; Court Reporter/FTR #: Heather Newman; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m. - 10:00 a.m.. Also present at hearing: Byron Moldo for Receiver James Donnell; James Donnell, Permanent Receiver; Kristina Pickering for investor Bonnie Lee; Lisa Rasmussen for United Land Investors Corp. Joel Schwarz for American Exchange and Robert Rippe; Marianne Gatti for investor Fred Han Mahlstadt. RE: #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; filed by James H Donell,, #373 is granted; Defendant Farris' objection as to the Mesonic lien is sustained; all other objections are overruled. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that exhibit C in Defendant Farris' objection (#376) is to be SEALED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Paris Robert's objection (#377) is STRICKEN in its entirety. MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by James H Donell, is granted subject to the matters noted in Court. Mr. Moldo is to file proposed orders by 1/18/2006. (PAV, ) Modified on 1/3/2006 (PAV, ).
|
December 30, 2005 |
Filing 395
DECLARATION of Stacey Vitto re Marketing of 1499 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada by Receiver James H Donell. (MMM, )
|
December 30, 2005 |
Filing 394
DECLARATION of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, in Reply to Opposition of Defendant Connie Farris to #373 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (MMM, )
|
December 30, 2005 |
Filing 393
DECLARATION of James H. Donell, Permanent Receiver, in reply to Response of Connie Farris re #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;; filed by Receiver James H Donell. (MMM, )
|
December 28, 2005 |
Filing 385
STATEMENT of Objection to the rejection of claim dtd 4/19/05 by Defendant Said Mobin. (RFJ)
|
December 28, 2005 |
Filing 384
RESPONSE to #373 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds; by Defendant Fred Hans Mahlstadt. Replies due by 1/11/2006. (RFJ).
|
December 27, 2005 |
Filing 380
2nd AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Sale of Property 1499 MacDonald Ranch, Miscellaneous Hearing set for 1/3/2006 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (AXM, )
|
December 27, 2005 |
Filing 378
RESPONSE to #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;; Replies due by 1/10/2006. (AXM, )
|
December 23, 2005 |
Filing 387
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #380 Notice of Hearing. (MJZ )
|
December 23, 2005 |
Filing 386
NOTICE of Docket Correction to Response to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: Error: Wrong event selected; Corrrection: Re-docketed as Certificate of Service by Court. (MJZ )
|
December 23, 2005 |
Filing 382
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver James H Donell re #380 2nd Amended Notice of Hearing. (RFJ)
|
December 23, 2005 |
ERROR: Wrong event selected.
|
December 22, 2005 |
Filing 381
SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Randolph Howard, re #380 Notice of Hearing; by Receiver James H Donell. (AXM, )
|
December 22, 2005 |
Filing 379
AMENDED Submission of PROPOSED ORDER for sale of 1499 MacDonald Ranch, filed by Receiver James H Donell. (AXM, )
|
December 21, 2005 |
Filing 377
NOTICE of Opposition of Sale of 1499 Mac Donald Ranch, by Trustee Paris Robert. (AXM, )
|
December 20, 2005 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing Re: #365 Motion for Court Approval of Sale of Property set for 1/3/2006 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (AAB)
|
December 20, 2005 |
Motions No Longer Referred: #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; (GEW)
|
December 16, 2005 |
Filing 376
RESPONSE to #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1499 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;; filed by Defendant Connie S. Farris. Replies due by 12/30/2005. (MMM, )
|
December 15, 2005 |
Filing 375
NOTICE of Entry of Order by Receiver James H Donell. (MJZ )
|
December 12, 2005 |
Filing 371
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER approving Receiver's determination on claims filed by Receiver James H Donell. (AXM, )
|
December 9, 2005 |
Filing 374
NOTICE of Hearing by Receiver James H Donell re #373 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. (Attachments: #1)(MJZ )
|
December 9, 2005 |
Filing 373
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 12/27/2005. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8)(MJZ )
|
December 8, 2005 |
Filing 370
ORDER granting #314 Motion to Employe Calton Hamman & Wolff PC as Special Counsel. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/8/05. (AAB)
|
December 7, 2005 |
Filing 372
NOTICE of Firm Change, Address Change, Telephone Change, Fax Change as to James Gay, United Land Investors Corporation. (MJZ )
|
December 6, 2005 |
Filing 369
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; by Receiver James H Donell. (AAB)
|
December 5, 2005 |
Filing 368
NOTICE of Entry of #360 Order by Receiver James H Donell. (AAB)
|
December 2, 2005 |
Filing 367
AMENDED NOTICE of HEARING on 1/3/06 @ 9:30am Before KJD in Courtroom 6D re #366 Notice (Other) on #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada;by Receiver James H Donell. (AAB)
|
December 1, 2005 |
Filing 366
NOTICE of Hearing on #365 MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; by Receiver James H Donell. (AAB)
|
December 1, 2005 |
Filing 365
MOTION to Approve Sale of Real Property Commonly Known as 1400 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson, Nevada; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James H. Donnell. by Receiver James H Donell. Responses due by 12/19/2005. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(AAB)
|
November 22, 2005 |
Filing 360
ORDER re #356 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/21/05. (AAB)
|
November 22, 2005 |
Filing 359
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Kent J. Dawson, U.S. District Judge on 11/22/2005. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #252 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (motion to withdraw as counsel), filed by Attorney Susan Williams Scann is granted. Notice is to be sent to Samir Ghazal at the following address: 8145 W. Gilmore Ave., Las Vegas, NV 89129. Mr. Ghazal's phone # is 702-656-4245. (no image attached) (PAV, )
|
November 17, 2005 |
Filing 353
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Kent J. Dawson, U.S. District Judge on 11/17/2005. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. the minutes of proceedings (#351) are amended to reflect the correct date of the hearing. Said hearing took place on 11/10/05. (no image attached) (PAV, )
|
November 17, 2005 |
Filing 351
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2005 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Catherine Whiting; Def Counsel: Richard Schonfeld; Court Reporter/FTR #: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 11:04-11:08 a.m.. RE: #337 Motion to Approve Receiver's 6th Interim Application for Fees and Costs is granted; #329 Motion for approval of sale of timeshare units (weeks 40-41) at Mariott Newport CA is granted. (no image attached) (PAV, )
|
November 14, 2005 |
Filing 356
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #329 Motion to Approve Sale of Timeshare Units. (AAB)
|
November 14, 2005 |
Filing 355
ORDER re Miscellaneous Document (6th Interim Applicaton for Approval of Receiver's Fees and Expenses). Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/10/05. (AAB)
|
November 14, 2005 |
Filing 352
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #329 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; by Donell. (AXM, )
|
November 9, 2005 |
Filing 361
NOTICE of Entry of Order re #347 Order Approving Receiver's third Interim Report. (AAB)
|
November 9, 2005 |
Filing 357
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: held on 8/13/04 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: F. Zabin. (EDS)
|
November 8, 2005 |
Filing 362
REPLY to Response to #332 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; filed by Receiver James H Donell AND Declarations of James H. Donell and james T. Schaefer. (Attachments: #1)(AAB)
|
November 8, 2005 |
Filing 354
REPLY to Response to #337 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; filed by Defendant James Donell. (AXM, )
|
November 2, 2005 |
Filing 350
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Objections by Investor United to mtn #332 (s)
|
November 2, 2005 |
Filing 349
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of appearance of counsel. (s)
|
November 2, 2005 |
Filing 347
ORDER ORD: approval of 3rd interim report. cps dist.
|
November 1, 2005 |
Filing 348
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS By D Farris, to 6th interim report #337. (s)
|
October 31, 2005 |
Filing 345
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver Donell.
|
October 31, 2005 |
Filing 344
DECLARATION by Receiver Donell of James Schaefer to reply (#340) to mtn to approve 3rd interim status rpt (#328). (s)
|
October 31, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Order. (KJD)
|
October 28, 2005 |
Filing 346
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Ron Tonkin to Receiver's mtn for approval of rec fees (#337). (s)
|
October 28, 2005 |
Filing 343
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING dtd 10/28/05 (C/R Felicia Zabin) The receiver's mtn for approval (#328) is GRANTED. (cps dist)
|
October 27, 2005 |
Filing 341
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF (Ex Parte) by Dft Connie Farris to file mtn to recuse KJD under seal. (nss)DISPO:
|
October 27, 2005 |
Filing 340
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply to objections of Farris 3rd interim report. (s)
|
October 26, 2005 |
Filing 339
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn for credit investor payments. (s) by Farris.
|
October 24, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT proposed order by R donell for 6th interim app for fees and expenses.
|
October 21, 2005 |
Filing 338
NOTICE OF HEARING Hearing on mtn to approve sale #329 is set for 11-10-05 @ 11:00am. cps dist.
|
October 20, 2005 |
Filing 337
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Motion, 6th interim app, for approval of Rec fees and expenses. (s) (oversized) DISPO: objs (#346) objs #348
|
October 20, 2005 |
Filing 336
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of hearing of 6th interim app for approval of fees and expenses. s
|
October 18, 2005 |
Filing 335
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Farris' objection to 3rd interim report. #328 (nss)
|
October 18, 2005 |
Filing 334
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Obo R Donell.
|
October 17, 2005 |
Filing 333
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of filing mtn for credit #332. (s)
|
October 17, 2005 |
Filing 332
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for credit of investor interest payments w/ points and decls. (0ral arg) (oversized) (s) DISPO: oppo #339, obj #350,
|
October 7, 2005 |
Filing 331
NOTICE (OTHER) Of R's mtn for sale of timeshare units 40-41 at Marriott in Newbeach CA (0ral arg req) (s)
|
October 7, 2005 |
Filing 330
NOTICE (OTHER) of hearing on motion for apprvl of 3td interim rprt. (s)
|
October 7, 2005 |
Filing 329
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for approval of sale of timeshare units (weeks 40-41) at Mariott Newport CA w/memo and decl of Donell. (s) DISPO:
|
October 7, 2005 |
Filing 328
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to approve 3rd interim report w/ dclar of Schaefer and Siegel. (oversized) (s) DISPO: objections #335, GRANTED ORDER #343, ORD #347 GRNTD
|
September 30, 2005 |
Filing 327
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: stip to re: note deed of trust and forecosure. Injctn to be lifted, (see doc) cps dist.
|
September 29, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Stip to refard deed of trust
|
September 28, 2005 |
Filing 326
NON-OPPOSITION Notice of non-oppo to #314. (s)
|
September 19, 2005 |
Filing 325
NOTICE (OTHER) Amndd order for sale of 649 st. croix, 1691 tangiers, 1695 tangiers. (s)
|
September 16, 2005 |
Filing 324
NOTICE (OTHER) Of change of firm name, obo R. "MOLDO DAVIDSON FRAIOLI SEROR AND SESTANOVICH." (s)
|
September 15, 2005 |
Filing 323
ORDER ORD: sale of 649 St. Croix, 1691 Tangiers Dr., 1695 Tangiers Dr., Henderson, NV. cps dist.
|
September 14, 2005 |
Filing 322
NON-OPPOSITION to mtn to employ special counsel. (s)
|
September 13, 2005 |
Filing 321
NOTICE (OTHER) to mtn for sale of sale of 649 St Croix, 1691 and 1695 Tangiers Drive. W/ ORD attached. (s)
|
September 13, 2005 |
Filing 320
NON-OPPOSITION to mtn for sale of sale of 649 St Croix, 1691 and 1695 Tangiers Drive. (s)
|
September 13, 2005 |
Filing 319
NOTICE (OTHER) of entry of order for sale of 1660 south valadez st las vegas nv. (s)
|
September 13, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Proposed amndd order for sale of properties, 649 St. Crouix, 691 Tangiers, 1695 Tangiers
|
September 8, 2005 |
Filing 316
NOTICE (OTHER) re: 1660 South Valadez Street, Las Vegas, NV. (s)
|
September 8, 2005 |
Filing 315
NOTICE (OTHER) re: 2255 Coral ridge Henderson, NV. (s)
|
September 8, 2005 |
Filing 314
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to employ Hamman & Wolff PC as counsel. (s) DISPO: non-oppo #322, non-oppo #326
|
September 7, 2005 |
Filing 313
ORDER ORD: amdnd order sale 2255 Coral Ridge, Henderson, NV. cps dist.
|
September 7, 2005 |
Filing 312
ORDER ORD 2nd amdndd order approving sale of 1660 South Valadez Street, Las Vegas, NV. cps dist.
|
September 6, 2005 |
Filing 317
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc for sale of 2255 Coral Ridge, Henderson, NV Obo R. (s)
|
September 6, 2005 |
Filing 311
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of order 648 Joey Lane, Henderson, NV. (s)
|
September 6, 2005 |
Filing 310
ORDER ORD: Sale of 648 Joey Lane, Henderson, NV. cps dist.
|
September 2, 2005 |
Filing 318
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 3rd amndd cert. Obo R. (s)
|
August 31, 2005 |
Filing 309
NOTICE (OTHER) To sale 648 Joey Lane Henderson NV, Obo R. (s)
|
August 30, 2005 |
Filing 308
ORDER ORD: approving sale of 2255 Coral Ridge Henderson NV. (SEE DOC) cps dist.
|
August 30, 2005 |
Filing 305
ORDER ORD: amndd sale of Canyons RV Resort, Hurricane, UT. cps dist.
|
August 29, 2005 |
Filing 307
NOTICE (OTHER) Amended Ord of sale 1660 South Valadez. Obo R Donell.
|
August 29, 2005 |
Filing 306
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (2nd) certificate of mailing for 649 St. Croix. 1691 Tangiers, 1695 Tangiers.
|
August 29, 2005 |
Filing 304
DECLARATION Of James Donell. Re: amndnd order sale of Canyons RV Resort, Hurricane, UT. (s)
|
August 29, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Amndd order approving sale of Canyons RV Resort Hurricane, UT.
|
August 26, 2005 |
Filing 303
ORDER ORD: Sale of property 648 Joey Lane, Henderson NV. cps dist.
|
August 26, 2005 |
Filing 302
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to D Farris' Objctns to Judge's Order #295. (s)
|
August 24, 2005 |
Filing 301
ORDER ORD: Mtn for sale #276 is GRNTD. (see doc for more). cps dist.
|
August 23, 2005 |
Filing 300
NON-OPPOSITION To mtn for sale of 648 Joey Lane Henderson, NV #276. Proposed order attached (s)
|
August 22, 2005 |
Filing 299
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to Ord #290 re: D Dawn Reese. (s)
|
August 22, 2005 |
Filing 298
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn to withdraw #261. obo P. (s)
|
August 22, 2005 |
Filing 297
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply to mtn for sale of 1660 S. Valadez St. Las Vegas Nevada. obo PR. (s)
|
August 19, 2005 |
Filing 296
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Re: 1660 South Valdez St. (s) (cps KJD-LRL)
|
August 19, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Proposed amndd order for sale of 1660 south valdez.
|
August 17, 2005 |
Filing 295
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS To order #290 obo Connie Farris.
|
August 17, 2005 |
Filing 294
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of order approving application for fees and expenses. (5th interim) (s)
|
August 17, 2005 |
Filing 293
NON-OPPOSITION Ntc of non oppo for sale of 2255 Coral ridge, Hend, NV. (s)
|
August 12, 2005 |
Filing 292
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn for sale of property 1660 South Valadez St. (s) obo D Global.
|
August 8, 2005 |
Filing 291
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amended Cert of Service. Obo R. (s)
|
August 8, 2005 |
Filing 290
ORDER ORD: P's mtn #192 is GRNTD in part. FUR ORD: Mtn to stay #201 is DENIED. cps dist. DISPO: Obj #295, oppo #299, oppo to D Farris' Objctns # 295.
|
August 5, 2005 |
Filing 289
ORDER ORD: approving fifth interim app for fees and expenses. cps dist.
|
August 5, 2005 |
Filing 288
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING (Felicia Zabin crt rprtr) ORD: mtn #241 is GRNTD.
|
August 4, 2005 |
Filing 287
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for court approval of sale of properties 649 St, Criox St. Henderson, NV;1691 Tangiers Drive, Henderson NV; 1695 Tangiers Drive, Henderson, NV. (s) (oral arg) (filed seperate) DISPO: ORD #323 GRNTD
|
August 4, 2005 |
Filing 286
NOTICE (OTHER) Of R's mtn for court approval of sale of 649 St. Croix Street, Henderson, NV and 1691 Tangiers Drive, Henderson, NV and 1695 Tangiers Drive Henderson, NV.
|
August 4, 2005 |
Filing 285
NOTICE (OTHER) Of sale of common property Canyons RV Resort, Hurricane, UT. (s)
|
August 3, 2005 |
Filing 283
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Obo R. 1660 south valadez street las vegas, nv
|
August 2, 2005 |
Filing 284
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE obo R. 648 joey lane henderson, nv. (s)
|
August 1, 2005 |
Filing 282
ORDER ORD: mtn approving sale of Canyons RV Resort, Hurricane, UT #218 is GRNTD. FUR ORD: (see doc) cps dist.
|
August 1, 2005 |
Filing 280
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of receivers mtn for court approval of sale 648 Joey Lane Henderson, NV, (s)
|
August 1, 2005 |
Filing 278
DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL Local randoph howard for out of state anthony friedman.
|
August 1, 2005 |
Filing 277
VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE Anthony Friedman for Receiver.
|
July 29, 2005 |
Filing 281
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ntc of receiver's mtn for court approval of sale 1660 South Valadez st. Las Vegas, NV (s) DISPO: oppo #292, reply #297
|
July 29, 2005 |
Filing 279
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for court approval of sale for 648 Joey Lane, Henderson, NV (oral arg rqstd) (filed seperate) DISPO: non oppo #300, ORD #303 GRNTD
|
July 29, 2005 |
Filing 276
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for court approval of sale of property 1660 south valadez street, las vegas NV (s) (file seperate) DISPO: oppo #272 and notice # 281 subbed, ORD #301 GRNTD.
|
July 29, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Mtn for court approval to sell 1660 South Valadez st. Las Vegas, NV. (oral arg rqstd) (s)
|
July 29, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Mtn for court approval to sell 648 Joey Lane, Henderson, NV (oral arg reqstd) (s)
|
July 29, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Mtn for cour approval of sale 1660 south valadez st las vegas NV
|
July 29, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Mtn for court approval of sale 648 joey lane henderson NV,
|
July 28, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT V.P. and Resident counsel for Anthony Friedman.
|
July 28, 2005 |
Filing 275
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS To Farris and Reese evidence during s/j. Obo P. (s) (#215?)
|
July 27, 2005 |
Filing 274
MOTION TO STRIKE to strike P securites objections to evidence presented by D Farris during s/j. (see doc) (s) DISPO:
|
July 27, 2005 |
Filing 273
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amended Cert of mail of recievers mtn for sale of 2255 Coral Ridge, Henderson NV.
|
July 26, 2005 |
Filing 272
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: stip between Securites and D. Reese re: mtn to withdraw default admissions. any oppo filed w/in 14 days. cps dist.
|
July 26, 2005 |
Filing 271
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of mtn for court approval of sale 2255 Coral Ridge, Henderson NV. (s)
|
July 26, 2005 |
Filing 270
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for court approval of sale of 2255 Coral Ridge, Henderson NV. Obo Receiver, w/ attached ORD(filed seperate) (s) DISPO:
|
July 26, 2005 |
Filing 269
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: stip btwn Reese and Securites re: mtn to withdraw default admissions mtns to be filed 14 days from commissions receipt of the order related to the commissions mtn to preclude Ds from offering evidence during s/j. cps dist.
|
July 22, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Stip btwn Reese & Exchange re: mtn to withdraw #261.
|
July 19, 2005 |
Filing 268
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING (FTR3:19-5:06) Oral arguments on mtn #192 and cntrmtn #201. cps dist.
|
July 19, 2005 |
Filing 267
NOTICE (OTHER) Approving sale of 11 Arkansas. (s)
|
July 15, 2005 |
Filing 266
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc of hearing already set up by #262, 8/05/05. (s)
|
July 14, 2005 |
Filing 265
ORDER ORD: Mtn to sale 11 AR #231 GRNTD. FUR ORD: Seel to Whitney Invest per EXHIBIT 6 of Mtn #231. FUR ORD: Receiver to execute all docs to consummate sale. FUR ORD: Receiver pay closing costs. FUR ORD: Receiver to pay 6% broker commision. FUR ORD: At cl
|
July 12, 2005 |
Filing 264
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply to Mtn for s/j #215. obo P. (s)
|
July 12, 2005 |
Filing 263
NON-OPPOSITION Non oppo to mtn for court approval of sale of 11 Arkansas.#231. Obo Receiver. (s)
|
July 7, 2005 |
Filing 262
NOTICE OF HEARING Ntc rescheduling of Receiver's report from 7/21/05 to 8/5/05 @10:30am. cps dist.
|
July 7, 2005 |
Filing 261
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to withdraw admissions. Obo D Reese, (s) (filed seperate) DISPO: oppo # 298, Modified on 11/18/2005 (RFJ, ).
|
July 7, 2005 |
Filing 260
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn s/j #215 Obo D Reese. (s) (filed seperate)
|
July 7, 2005 |
Filing 259
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc entry of ord granting mtn of receiver #248. obo Receiver.
|
July 7, 2005 |
Filing 258
NOTICE (OTHER) Ntc entry of order re: #237 Obo receiver Donell.
|
July 5, 2005 |
Filing 257
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply to mtn for s/j #223 obo Ds. (m)
|
July 5, 2005 |
Filing 256
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply in supt of mtn for s/j #222 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
July 5, 2005 |
Filing 254
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Rspnse/oppo to EMRGNCY mtn #233 to compel obo non-ptys Byrne & Bradford. (m)
|
July 1, 2005 |
Filing 253
ORDER ORD: hearing LRL 7/19/05 @ 3:00pm on mtn to preclude Ds from offering evidence #192 and cntnrmtn #201. cps dist. (see doc)
|
July 1, 2005 |
Filing 251
ORDER CPY of ORD: D mtn to strike #87 DENIED. cps dist. (original in CV-S-04-1071)
|
June 30, 2005 |
Filing 252
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to withdraw as counsel for D. Affidavit attached (m) DISPO:
|
June 27, 2005 |
Filing 248
ORDER ORD: Mtn #169 GRANTED (see doc) cps dist.
|
June 24, 2005 |
Filing 250
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #236 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
June 24, 2005 |
Filing 249
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #238 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
June 24, 2005 |
Filing 247
EXHIBIT (Vol 4) by Dft Connie Farris to Dft's oppo (#243) to Plf's mtn for sum jgm/sum adjudication (#215). (s) (FILED SEPARATELY)
|
June 24, 2005 |
Filing 246
EXHIBIT (Vol 3) by Dft Connie Farris to Dft's oppo (#243) to Plf's mtn for sum jgm/sum adjudication (#215). (s) (FILED SEPARATELY)
|
June 24, 2005 |
Filing 245
EXHIBIT (Vol 2) by Dft Connie Farris to Dft's oppo (#243) to Plf's mtn for sum jgm/sum adjudication (#215). (s) (FILED SEPARATELY)
|
June 24, 2005 |
Filing 244
EXHIBIT (Vol 1) by Dft Connie Farris to Dft's oppo (#243) to Plf's mtn for sum jgm/sum adjudication (#215). (s) (FILED SEPARATELY)
|
June 24, 2005 |
Filing 243
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION by Dft Connie Farris to Plf's mtn for sum jgm/sum adjudication (#215). (s)
|
June 23, 2005 |
Filing 242
NON-OPPOSITION by Receiver Donnell re mtn (#218). (s)
|
June 22, 2005 |
Filing 241
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF (5th) by Receiver for approval of fees/expenses. (s) (FILED SEPARATELY)DISPO: no oppo fl'd
|
June 22, 2005 |
Filing 240
NOTICE (OTHER) Notice of Hearing on receivers fifth interim application for approval of recfs fees. obo PR Donell (m)
|
June 21, 2005 |
Filing 255
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn for s/j #222 obo Ds. (m) (DOCKETED OUT OF ORDER)
|
June 21, 2005 |
Filing 239
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to D's mtn for s/j #223. obo P Donell. (m)
|
June 21, 2005 |
Filing 238
ORDER ORD: Mtn for apprvl of sale of 23 Arkansas #216 is GRANTED. (see doc for spec) cps dist.
|
June 21, 2005 |
Filing 237
ORDER ORD: Mtn to emply auctioneer #208 is GRANTED. (see doc for spec) cps dist.
|
June 21, 2005 |
Filing 236
ORDER ORD: Mtn for approval of sale propery 2252 candlestick ave.#204 is GRANTED. (see doc for spec) cps dist
|
June 16, 2005 |
Filing 235
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: P to oppose Ds' mtn for s/j #223 (fl'd in base file CV-S-03-1514) by 6-21-05; FUR ORD: Ds to oppose P's mtn for prtl s/j #108 (fl'd in CV-S-04-1071) by 6-21-05. cps dis
|
June 16, 2005 |
Filing 234
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amnd'd cert of mailing of mtn #231 obo Receiver Donell.
|
June 16, 2005 |
Filing 233
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to objctns #229 & EMRGNCY mtn to compel obo D Connie Farris. (m) (DISPO: rspnse/oppo #254
|
June 16, 2005 |
Filing 232
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of no oppo fl'd to mtn for Ct appointed sale of property #216 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
June 15, 2005 |
Filing 231
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for Ct approval of sale of property known as 11 Arkansas, Henderson NV obo Receiver Donell. (m) (O/A req) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, non oppo #263. ORD #265 GRNTD.
|
June 13, 2005 |
Filing 230
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Acceptance of svc of re-notc of depo obo D Connie Farris.
|
June 13, 2005 |
Filing 229
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Objcnts to LRL's ord #226 obo non-pty entities. (O/A req) (m) (oppo #233,
|
June 13, 2005 |
Filing 228
SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED (2) srv'd obo Receiver.
|
June 10, 2005 |
Filing 227
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: Ds have until 6-24-05 to rspnd to P's mtn for s/j #215, and P has until 7-12-05 to reply. cps dis
|
June 9, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Stip ext time for Ds to resp to Ps mtn for s/j -- to KJD
|
June 7, 2005 |
Filing 226
ORDER ORD: Mtn for prot ord #195 DENIED; FUR ORD: The stay on depos of Byrne & Bradford is hereby lifted. cps dis (objctns #229, oppo to objctns #233,
|
June 6, 2005 |
Filing 225
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of non-oppo to mtn for sale of property #204 w/prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
June 1, 2005 |
Filing 224
NOTICE (OTHER) by Receiver Donell of non-oppo to Reciever's mtn to employ auctioneer/sell property (#208). (s)
|
May 27, 2005 |
Filing 223
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Dfts Perpetual Investment and Rippe. (s)DISPO: oppo #239, reply #257
|
May 27, 2005 |
Filing 222
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Receiver Donell. (s)DISPO: oppo #255, reply #256
|
May 26, 2005 |
Filing 221
RESPONSE TO MOTION by Receiver Donell to cntr-mtn (#201). (s)
|
May 26, 2005 |
Filing 220
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver Donell re (#218).
|
May 26, 2005 |
Filing 219
NOTICE (OTHER) by Receiver Donell of mtn (#218). (s)
|
May 26, 2005 |
Filing 218
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF (O/A req) by Receiver Donell to approve sale of real property Canyons RV Resort. (s) (fld sep) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, notice (#242)
|
May 24, 2005 |
Filing 217
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Dft Farris to cntr-mtn (#201). (s)
|
May 24, 2005 |
Filing 216
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF by Receiver Donell for court approval of sale or property 23 Arkansas, Henderson NV. (nss) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, notc #232, ORD #238 Granted.
|
May 23, 2005 |
Filing 215
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Mtn for s/j or, ITA, for summary adjudicatn w/memo, decs, and stmnt in supt obo P. (m) (O/A req) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: oppo (#243), exhibits (#244-247)
|
May 18, 2005 |
Filing 211
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: Disc EXTND'D - Disc cut-off 6/6/05; dispo mtns 7/6/05; jnt pto 8/5/05. (cps dist)
|
May 16, 2005 |
Filing 214
DECLARATION Dec of Jose F. Sanchez re: reply #212 and oppo #213 obo P. (m)
|
May 16, 2005 |
Filing 213
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to cntrmtn to stay #201 obo P. (m)
|
May 16, 2005 |
Filing 212
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply in supt of mtn to preclude evidence #192 obo P. (m)
|
May 16, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Stip /applicatn to modify sched ord -- to LRL
|
May 13, 2005 |
Filing 210
NOTICE (OTHER) of ord re stip re preparation of 2002 tax returns obo James H. Donell, Permanent recvr (M)
|
May 6, 2005 |
Filing 209
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: Stip re: prep of 2002 tax returns. (see doc for spec). cps dis
|
May 6, 2005 |
Filing 208
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to employ auctioneer & sell personal property of Receivership Ds at auction obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: ntc (#224) ORD #237 Granted.
|
May 5, 2005 |
Filing 207
RESPONSE TO MOTION Rspnse to EMRGCNY mtn for prot ord #195 obo Ps. (m)
|
May 5, 2005 |
Filing 206
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amnd'd cert of mailing of notd re: mtn to approve sale #204 obo Receiver Donell.
|
May 5, 2005 |
Filing 205
MOTION TO STRIKE by Receiver Donell to strike Dfts' jury demand. (s)DISPO:
|
May 5, 2005 |
Filing 203
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply in supt of EMRGNCY mtn for prot ord #195 obo non ptys Byrne & Bradford. (m)
|
May 5, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Stip re preparatn of 2002 tax returns -- to KJD
|
May 3, 2005 |
Filing 204
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for Ct approval of sale of property known as 2252 Candlestick Avenue w/attch'd notc & prop ord obo Receiver Donell. (m) (O/A req) (DISPO: Notc of non-oppo #225,
|
May 2, 2005 |
Filing 202
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn to preclude #192 obo D Reese. (m)
|
April 27, 2005 |
Filing 201
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Cntrmtn for prot ord & stay of proceeds against D Connie Farris obo D Farris. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: oppo #213, dec #214, reply #217, resp #221, minutes #268, ORD# 290 DENIED
|
April 27, 2005 |
Filing 200
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn to preclude evidence #192 obo D Farris. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE)
|
April 21, 2005 |
Filing 199
ORDER ORD: D Farris shall, by 4-29-05, fl a rspnse to EMRGNCY mtn for prot ord #196 w/reply due 5-4-05; FUR ORD: Depos currently noticed for 5/2 and 5/3 are STAYED pndng fur ord. cps dis
|
April 20, 2005 |
Filing 198
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Cert of mailing of notc #194 obo Receiver Donell.
|
April 20, 2005 |
Filing 196
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to EMRGNCY mtn for prot ord #195 obo D Farris. (m)
|
April 19, 2005 |
Filing 195
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER EMRGNCY mtn for prot ord obo non ptys Byrne & Bradford. (m,f) (DISPO: oppo #196, sealed #197, reply #203, rspnse #207, ord #226 DENIED
|
April 19, 2005 |
Filing 194
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of enry of ord #193 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
April 13, 2005 |
Filing 193
ORDER **AMND'D** ORD: Mtn to Ct approval of sale of Monterra Plaza Phases II & III (#180) GRNTD. cps dis (see doc)
|
April 12, 2005 |
Filing 192
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to preclude Ds Farris and Reese from offering evidence obo P. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: oppo #200, oppo #202, reply #212, dec #214, minutes , #268, ORD # 290 GRNTD in part,
|
April 6, 2005 |
Filing 191
RESPONSE TO MOTION Rspnse to mtn to consolidate #169 obo P. (m)
|
April 6, 2005 |
Filing 190
NON-OPPOSITION Non-oppo to mtn for approval of sale #180 obo P. (m)
|
April 6, 2005 |
Filing 189
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #184 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
April 4, 2005 |
Filing 188
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #183 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 31, 2005 |
Filing 185
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING (Ct Reptr Felicia Zabin) re: hrng on Receiver's 4th app for approval #174 - ORD: Receiver's 4th app #174 is GRNTD (see #184). cps dis
|
March 31, 2005 |
Filing 184
ORDER ORD: Receiver's 4th app for approval of fees/expenses #174 GRNTD. cps dis (see doc)
|
March 31, 2005 |
Filing 183
ORDER ORD: Receiver's mtn for approval of sale of property known as 7987 Timber Peak #160 GRNTD. cps dis
|
March 30, 2005 |
Filing 187
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #181 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 30, 2005 |
Filing 186
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Cert of mailing of mtn #180 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 29, 2005 |
Filing 182
ORDER ORD: Mtn to Ct approval of sale of Monterra Plaza Phases II & III (#180) GRNTD. cps dis (see doc)
|
March 29, 2005 |
Filing 181
ORDER ORD: Mtn to Ct approval of sale of 326 Nebraska Ave (#142) GRNTD. cps dis (see doc
|
March 28, 2005 |
Filing 180
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for Ct approval of sale of property known as Monterra Plaza Phases II and III obo Receiver Donell. (m) (EMRGNCY ACTN REQ) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: ord #182 GRNTD, non-oppo #190
|
March 25, 2005 |
Filing 179
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Dec of James H. Donnell as reply in supt of mtn to consolidate #169 w/prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 23, 2005 |
Filing 178
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #171 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 23, 2005 |
Filing 177
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #143 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 21, 2005 |
Filing 176
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT (Fax) by New Harvest Realty & Mortgage to KJD.
|
March 18, 2005 |
Filing 173
ORDER ON STIPULATION Disc cut-off 5/16/05; dispo mtns 6/15/05; jnt pto 7/15/05. (cps dist)
|
March 17, 2005 |
Filing 175
NOTICE (OTHER) by Receiver Donell of hrg on Receiver's 4th app (#174). (s)
|
March 17, 2005 |
Filing 174
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF (4th) by Receiver Donnell for approval of fees/expenses. (s) (FILED SEPARATELY)DISPO: ord #184 GRNTD
|
March 16, 2005 |
Filing 172
RESPONSE TO MOTION Rspnse to mtn to consolidate #169 obo D Farris. (m)
|
March 16, 2005 |
Filing 171
ORDER ORD: Receiver's mtn to employ special cnsl #146 GRNTD. (see doc). cps dis
|
March 15, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip to extnd disc. to KJD
|
March 9, 2005 |
Filing 170
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of no oppo to mtn #146 to emply special cnsl obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 9, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT prop ord re: mtn #146 to employ special cnsl. to KJD
|
March 1, 2005 |
Filing 169
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to consolidate entities of Receivership estate, pool assets & liabilities, & fix the method to pay claims obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: rspnse #172, reply #179, rspnse #191 ORD #248 GRANTED
|
February 25, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Order. (KJD)
|
February 22, 2005 |
Filing 168
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Supplmnt to mtn for Ct approved sale #142 obo Receiver Donnell. (m)
|
February 22, 2005 |
Filing 167
NON-OPPOSITION Notc of non-oppo to mtn for Ct approved sale #160 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
February 11, 2005 |
Filing 166
MAIL RETURNED Cpy of ord #159 snt to atty David Jennings returned marked 'Not at this address, RTS". NOT RESENT
|
February 4, 2005 |
Filing 165
MAIL RETURNED Cpy of ord #157 snt to atty David Jennings returned marked 'Not at this address, RTS". NOT RESENT
|
February 3, 2005 |
Filing 164
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #157 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
February 3, 2005 |
Filing 163
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #152 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
February 1, 2005 |
Filing 162
MAIL RETURNED Cpy of ord #154 snt to atty David Jennings returned marked 'Not at this address, RTS". NOT RESENT
|
January 31, 2005 |
Filing 161
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #155 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
January 28, 2005 |
Filing 160
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for Ct approval of sale of property known as 7987 Timber Peak Lane w/prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donnell. (m) (O/A req) (DISPO: non-oppo #167, ord #183 GRNTD
|
January 25, 2005 |
Filing 159
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING (Ct Reptr Felicia Zabin) - ORD: Receiver's 3rd interim rept is APPROVED and the mtn for same #147 GRNTD. cps dis
|
January 24, 2005 |
Filing 157
ORDER ORD: Receiver's 2nd interim rept is APPROVED. see doc. cps dis
|
January 21, 2005 |
Filing 158
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #154 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
January 20, 2005 |
Filing 155
ORDER ORD: Mtn to approve sale of property #149 GRNTD. Receiver authorized to sell propoerty known as 2269 Candlestick Avenue. (see doc). cps dis via fax & mail
|
January 20, 2005 |
Filing 154
ORDER ORD: Mtn to approve sale of property #144 GRNTD. Receiver authorized to sell property known as 7996 Timber Peak Ln. (see doc). cps dis via fax & mail
|
January 19, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Proposed order. (KJD)
|
January 18, 2005 |
Filing 156
LETTER Lttr to Ct from Roy Ventura re: case. (cpy to KJD)
|
January 18, 2005 |
Filing 153
TRANSCRIPT re Receiver's Mtn to Approve 2nd Interim Report held 1/7/05 (c/r F. Zabin)
|
January 14, 2005 |
Filing 152
ORDER that Receiver's mtn to approve 3rd interim rpt (#147) is approved. (cps dist)
|
January 12, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Proposed order. (KJD)
|
January 11, 2005 |
Filing 151
ORDER ON STIPULATION that disc ddl is 3/31/05, dispo mtn ddl is 5/2/05, and pto ddl is 6/1/05. (cps dist)
|
January 7, 2005 |
Filing 150
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING Ct Reporter: Felicia Zabin: RE: Hrng on mtn (#145) (see doc) ORD Receiver & Ms. Farris are to meet/confer re info necessary to file Fund's 2002 tax rtrn. Ms. Farris is to sign tax rtrn. Mr. Chesnoff indicates they will propose budget
|
January 7, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip/app to modify sched ord - KJD
|
January 5, 2005 |
Filing 149
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Motion for Ct approval of sale of property at 2269 Candlestick Avenue obo Receiver Donell. (m) (O/A req) (DISPO: ord #155 GRNTD
|
January 4, 2005 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Fax sheet to all cnsl w/scheduling info on hrng on 1-7-05.
|
December 30, 2004 |
Filing 148
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OBJECTION to secont interm report obo D/Connie Farris (cpy to KJD)(m)
|
December 23, 2004 |
Filing 147
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF 3rd interim app for approval of Receiver's fees & expnses w/notc of hrng & prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donell. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO:
|
December 14, 2004 |
Filing 146
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Notc of mtn & mtn to employ Smith Knowles as special cnsl obo Receiver Donnell w/prop ord attch'd. (m) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, ord #171 GRNTD
|
December 14, 2004 |
Filing 145
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to approve Receiver's 2nd interim rept & petn for instructions re: taxes w/ dec, notc of hrng & prop ord obo Receiver Donnell. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: APPROVED #150, see #157
|
December 7, 2004 |
Filing 144
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for Ct approval of sale of property known as 7996 Timber Peak Lane w/prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donnell. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: ord #154 GRNTD
|
December 2, 2004 |
Filing 143
ORDER ORD: The Receiver is authorized to enter into and carry out the terms of sttlmnt w/A.R. Spilsbury Family Enterprises to sttl the litigatn currently pndng in the 5th Judicial District of Utah. cps dis (see doc)
|
November 18, 2004 |
Filing 142
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for Ct approval of sale of property known as 326 Nebraska Avenue obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, supplmnt #168, ord #181 GRNTD
|
November 15, 2004 |
Filing 141
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Notc of appearance of Kristina Pickering as cnsl for Clmnt Bonnie Lee. (m)
|
November 15, 2004 |
Filing 140
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #135 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
November 1, 2004 |
Filing 139
NOTICE (OTHER) of withdrawal of mtns to sell (#127 & #133) obo Paris Robert. (m)
|
November 1, 2004 |
Filing 138
NOTICE (OTHER) of withdrawal of mtns to sell (#127 & #133) obo Paris Robert. (m)
|
November 1, 2004 |
Filing 137
NOTICE (OTHER) re #135 obo Rcvr/James H. Donnell
|
October 28, 2004 |
Filing 136
ORDER ORD: Receiver Donnell's app to sell personal property #121 GRNTD; FUR ORD: Receiver Donnell is authorized to accept the offer of Hands On Management, Inc. in the sum of $28,021 to purchase the personal property located in 8540 S. Eastern Avenue and
|
October 28, 2004 |
Filing 135
ORDER ORD: Receiver's mtn to compel turnover of property, rents, etc. #123 is GRNTD; FUR ORD: Theodore Miller is ordered to forthwith turnover the real property of 115 Hollybrook Court, the gross rents received from said property, and an accounting (withi
|
October 27, 2004 |
Filing 134
NOTICE (OTHER) of appearance of cnsl for Connie Farris obo D/Farris (m)
|
October 8, 2004 |
Filing 133
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF to sell entire percentage obo D Paris Robert (Global Express Capital Real Estate). (m) (DISPO: WITHDRAWN #138 & #139
|
September 28, 2004 |
Filing 132
LETTER 2nd lttr in rspnse to mtn to compel #123 obo D Connie Farris. (see doc)
|
September 22, 2004 |
Filing 131
LETTER Lttr in rspnse to mtn to compel #123 obo D Connie Farris. (see doc)
|
September 22, 2004 |
Filing 130
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: Disc exp 1-31-05, dispo mtns due 3-2-05, jnt PTO due 4-1-05. cps dis
|
September 17, 2004 |
Filing 129
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Cert of mailing of mtn to enter into sttlmnt agreemnt #128 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
September 16, 2004 |
Filing 128
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to enter into sttlmnt agreemnt w/A.R. Spilsbury Family Enterprises obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, see ord #143
|
September 16, 2004 |
Filing 127
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to sell entire percentage interest claimed by D obo Paris Roberts. (nss) (DISPO: WITHDRAWN #138 & #139
|
September 14, 2004 |
Filing 126
ORDER ORD: Ptnr Rex Farris's mtn to ord Receiver to produce docs #20 DENIED as MOOT; FUR ORD: Req of ROCGD to be added to mailing matrix #79 is GRNTD. cps dis
|
September 10, 2004 |
Filing 125
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF App to modify disc sched ord obo P. (m) (DISPO: see ord #130
|
September 10, 2004 |
Filing 124
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Cert of mailing of doc #123 obo Receiver Donell.
|
September 7, 2004 |
Filing 123
MOTION TO COMPEL Mtn to compel turnover of real property, rents for said property, accounting as to said property, & req for instructions re: contract for sale obo Receiver Donell. (nss) (DISPO: Lttr/Rspnse #131, Lttr/Rspnse #132, no oppo fl'd, ord #135 G
|
September 7, 2004 |
Filing 122
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of ex prte app #121 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
September 7, 2004 |
Filing 121
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ex prte app for authorizatn to sell personal property obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, ord #136 GRNTD
|
September 7, 2004 |
Filing 120
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #115 obo Receiver Donell.
|
September 7, 2004 |
Filing 119
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #114 obo Receiver Donell.
|
August 27, 2004 |
Filing 118
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notc of change of address obo D Farris.
|
August 18, 2004 |
Filing 117
DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL Randolph L. Howard designated lcl cnsl for pro hac atty Gilbert #116 obo D Receiver Donell. cps dis
|
August 17, 2004 |
Filing 116
VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE as to James M. Gilbert as pro hac cnsl for Receiver Donell. cps dis
|
August 16, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT VP/Desig obo Receiver. to KJD
|
August 13, 2004 |
Filing 115
ORDER ORD: Receiver's mtn for ord approving sale #111 is GRNTD. cps dis (see doc)
|
August 13, 2004 |
Filing 114
ORDER ORD: Receiver's 2nd interim apps for fees #109 is GRNTD. cps dis (see doc)
|
August 13, 2004 |
Filing 113
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING (Ct Reptr Felicia Zabin) re: hrng on Receiver's 2nd interim app for fees #109 & mtn for ord approving sale #111 - ORD: The Receiver is to post it's supporting apps for fees & it's mtns on www.fedreceiver.com so that ptys can review t
|
August 13, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Lttr from investor re: Receiver and Investor Committee
|
August 10, 2004 |
Filing 112
ORDER ORD: A hearing will be held on 8-13-04 @ 10am on ex prte app for ord of approval #111 & 2nd interim app for fees #109 before KJD. cps dis
|
August 9, 2004 |
Filing 111
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ex prte app for ord aproving sale of real property & modifying procedures for sale of real property w/prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: ord #115 GRNTD
|
August 5, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT 2nd lttr from Connie Farris to Receiver Donell re: website.
|
July 29, 2004 |
Filing 110
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of hrng on Receiver's 2nd interim app for approval of fees obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
July 29, 2004 |
Filing 109
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF 2nd interim app for approval of Receiver's fees & expnses w/prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donell. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: ord #114 GRNTD
|
July 22, 2004 |
Filing 108
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #104 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
July 22, 2004 |
Filing 107
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #103 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
July 22, 2004 |
Filing 106
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #102 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
July 19, 2004 |
Filing 105
SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED (1) srv'd obo Receiver
|
July 9, 2004 |
Filing 104
ORDER ORD: Receiver's mtn to approve procedure re: admin of receivership estate assets #73 GRNTD. (see doc). cps dis
|
July 9, 2004 |
Filing 103
ORDER ORD: The prelim injnctn ord is AMND'D to include addtnl entities within the receivership. (see doc). cps dis
|
July 9, 2004 |
Filing 102
ORDER ORD: Receiver's mtn to establish claims procedure & bar date #72 GRNTD. (see doc). cps dis
|
July 9, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT prop ord grntng mtn to approve procedure. to KJD
|
July 8, 2004 |
Filing 101
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING ORDER Receiver's mtn to exp the receivership (#62) granted; Receiver's mtn to est claims procedure (#72) is granted in its proposed form; Receiver's mtn to approve procedure re administratn of receivership estate assets (#70) granted
|
July 8, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Lttr from Connie Farris to Receiver Donell re: website.
|
July 6, 2004 |
Filing 100
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of pending actn re: real property known as 8045 W. Hacienda Ave. obo Receiver Donell. (f,m)
|
July 6, 2004 |
Filing 99
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Receivers Inventory obo permanent receiver James Donell (m)
|
July 6, 2004 |
Filing 98
NOTICE (OTHER) of ordr (#86) obo permanent receiver James Donell (m)
|
July 6, 2004 |
Filing 97
NOTICE (OTHER) of ordr (#87) obo permanent receiver James Donell (m)
|
July 6, 2004 |
Filing 96
NOTICE (OTHER) of ordr (#89) obo permanent receiver James Donell (m)
|
July 6, 2004 |
Filing 95
NOTICE (OTHER) of ordr (#90) obo permanent receiver James Donell (m)
|
July 2, 2004 |
Filing 94
NON-OPPOSITION Notc of non-oppo to mtns #62, 70 & 72 obo Investor Gay. (m,f)
|
July 1, 2004 |
Filing 93
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION Reply in supt of mtn to approve procedure #70 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
June 29, 2004 |
Filing 92
ORDER ORD: This mttr is set for O/A on 7-7-04 @ 10am. The Ct will also hear O/A on Receiver's mtn to approve #70. cps dis
|
June 24, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT prop ord amnd'ng prelim injnctn. to KJD
|
June 17, 2004 |
Filing 90
ORDER ORD: The Receiver is authorized to have NV Secretary of State, Securities Division turn over documents to Receiver (see doc). cps dis
|
June 17, 2004 |
Filing 89
ORDER ORD: Receiver is authorized to immediately terminate the business operatns of Global Express Capital Real Estate, Global Express Capital Mortgage, Global Express Securites, and their subsidiaries; FUR ORD: Receiver is authorized to vacate business p
|
June 17, 2004 |
Filing 88
ORDER ORD: The Receiver is authorized to post pleads, docs, etc on receivership website www.fedreceiver.com. cps dis
|
June 17, 2004 |
Filing 87
ORDER ORD: The Receiver is authorized to employ John A. DeMarr as a private investigator. cps dis
|
June 17, 2004 |
Filing 86
ORDER ORD: Docket numbers #29, 30, 38, 39, 41, 51, 58 & 59 are GRNTD. Docket number #34 DENIED; FUR ORD: A hrng on docket numbers #44, 62, & 72 are set for 7-7-04 @ 10am before KJD. cps dis
|
June 15, 2004 |
Filing 91
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplmntl proof of svc of ex prte app to exapnd receivership obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
June 8, 2004 |
Filing 85
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn to approve procedures #70 obo Paris Roberts. (m)
|
June 8, 2004 |
Filing 84
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Req for special notc to direct mail to cnsl obo Paris Roberts. (m)
|
June 8, 2004 |
Filing 83
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Notc of appearance of cnsl obo Paris Roberts. (m)
|
June 3, 2004 |
Filing 82
MOTION FOR JOINDER Joinder to app for ord expanding receivership #62 obo P SEC. (m)
|
June 3, 2004 |
Filing 81
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to stricken mtns to intervene (#67,68,71,74,75,76) obo P SEC. (m)
|
June 3, 2004 |
Filing 80
NON-OPPOSITION Non oppo to mtn to approve procedures #70, to establish claims procedure & bar date #72, for turnover of docs #51, to employ private investigator #58 & to approve additional svcs #59 obo P SEC. (m)
|
May 28, 2004 |
Filing 79
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Req for special notc & to be added to master mailing matrix obo Clmnt ROCDG. (m) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, ord #126 GRNTD
|
May 28, 2004 |
Filing 78
ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD: Disc exp 10-1-04, dispo mtns due 11-1-04, jnt PTO due 12-1-04. cps dis
|
May 27, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT disc plan & sched ord. to LRL
|
May 26, 2004 |
Filing 77
ORDER ORD: The following mtns to intervene are STRICKEN - #67, 68, 71, 74, 75, 76. All are stricken for violations of LR 5-1 & 10-2(a). (see doc). cps dis
|
May 25, 2004 |
Filing 76
STRICKEN DOCUMENT(S) Mtn for lv to intervene as a Plaintiff in this actn obo Frank Vignola. (nss) (DISPO: ord #77 STRICKEN
|
May 25, 2004 |
Filing 75
STRICKEN DOCUMENT(S) Mtn for lv to intervene as a Plaintiff in this actn obo Rosa Diaz. (nss) (DISPO: ord #77 STRICKEN
|
May 25, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Cpy of note snt to Receiver Donell from Said Mobin
|
May 24, 2004 |
Filing 74
STRICKEN DOCUMENT(S) Mtn for lv to intervene as a Plaintiff in this actn obo Everett D. Nason. (nss) (DISPO: ord #77 STRICKEN
|
May 21, 2004 |
Filing 73
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to approve procedure re: administratn of receivership estate assets obo Receiver Donell. (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, ord #104 GRNTD
|
May 20, 2004 |
Filing 72
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to establish claims procedure & bar date w/prop ord attch'd obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: non-oppo #80, non-oppo #94, granted #101
|
May 19, 2004 |
Filing 71
STRICKEN DOCUMENT(S) MOTION to intervene obo Stanley & Gloria Belnap (nss)(DISPO: ord #77 STRICKEN
|
May 19, 2004 |
Filing 70
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to approve procedure re: administration of receivership estate assets obo Receiver Donell. (m) (O/A Req) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: non oppo #80, oppo #85, reply #93, non oppo #94, granted #101
|
May 19, 2004 |
Filing 69
DECLARATION Faxed cpy of dec of Ronald Vito obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
May 10, 2004 |
Filing 68
STRICKEN DOCUMENT(S) Mtn to intervene obo Don and Glenda Brandenburg. (nss) (DISPO: ord #77 STRICKEN
|
May 10, 2004 |
Filing 67
STRICKEN DOCUMENT(S) Mtn to intervene obo Richard & Doris Stevenson. (nss) (DISPO: ord #77 STRICKEN
|
May 7, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT prop ord amnding prelim injnctn. to KJD
|
May 4, 2004 |
Filing 66
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amnd'd cert of svc of doc #65 obo Receiver Donell.
|
May 4, 2004 |
Filing 64
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amnd'd cert of svc of doc #63 obo Receiver Donell.
|
May 4, 2004 |
Filing 62
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ex prte app for an ord expanding receivership obo Receiver Donell. (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: joinder #82, non oppo #94, granted #101
|
May 3, 2004 |
Filing 65
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of pndng action re: real property known as 1660 Valdez Street, Las Vegas, NV obo Receiver Donell. (m,f)
|
May 3, 2004 |
Filing 63
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of pndng action re: real property known as 1499 Macdonald Ranch Drive, Henderson NV obo Receiver Donell. (m,f)
|
May 3, 2004 |
Filing 61
LETTER Lttr to Byron Moldo from Ct re: lttrs from individual investors.
|
May 3, 2004 |
Filing 60
MEMORANDUM Memo re: lttrs from individual investors to KJD. cps dis
|
April 13, 2004 |
Filing 59
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to approve addtnl svcs of Spinelli Corp obo Receiver Donell. (m) (DISPO: non-oppo #80, ord #86 GRNTD
|
April 8, 2004 |
Filing 58
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF MOTION to employ private investigator obo of permanent receiver James Donell (m)(DISPO: non-oppo #80, ord #86 GRNTD
|
March 26, 2004 |
Filing 57
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to renewed mtn to intervene #52 obo P. (m)
|
March 24, 2004 |
Filing 56
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of entry of ord #55 obo D Farris. (m)
|
March 19, 2004 |
Filing 55
ORDER ORD: Mtn to w/d as cnsl for D Farris #43 is GRNTD. cps dis
|
March 18, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT ord grntng mtn to w/d as cnsl for D Farris. to KJD
|
March 16, 2004 |
Filing 54
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to Receiver's 60 day report #39 obo Intervenors. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE)
|
March 15, 2004 |
Filing 53
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT WITHDRAWAL of notc of appearance of cnsl #35 obo McDonald Carano. (m)
|
March 15, 2004 |
Filing 52
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF RENEWED - to Intervene obo Proposed Intervenors - Doris Stevenson, Charles Howard & Lee Novak (m) (DISPO: oppo #57, no reply fl'd, MOOT (see #101)
|
March 12, 2004 |
Filing 51
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ex prte app for turnover of docs in possession of NV Secretary of State, Securities Division obo Receiver w/prop ord attch'd. (m) (DISPO: non-oppo #80, ord #86 GRNTD
|
March 2, 2004 |
Filing 50
LETTER Lttr from D Connie Farris re: cnsl.
|
March 2, 2004 |
Filing 49
DECLARATION Dec of Catherine D. Whiting in supt of oppos #47 & #48 obo P. (m)
|
March 2, 2004 |
Filing 48
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn to discharge reveiver #34 obo P. (m)
|
March 2, 2004 |
Filing 47
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to EMRGNCY mtn to intervene #10 obo P. (m)
|
March 2, 2004 |
Filing 46
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn to discharge receiver #34 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
March 2, 2004 |
Filing 45
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING (Ct Reptr Felicia Zabin) ORD: Mtn to withdraw mtn to intervene #10 GRNTD; FUR ORD: D Connie Farris has 2 weeks from this date to find new cnsl; FUR ORD:Receiver's mtn to employ #27 GRNTD; FUR ORD: Receiver's applicatn to post info on
|
February 27, 2004 |
Filing 44
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to intervene & for direction from The Ct obo Ptnrs. (m) (DISPO: MOOT (see #101)
|
February 26, 2004 |
Filing 43
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to w/d as cnsl of record for D Connie Farris w/ord shortening time attch'd obo Alverson, Taylor...(m) (DISPO: ord #55 GRNTD
|
February 24, 2004 |
Filing 42
TRANSCRIPT Transcripts of hrng on P's mtn for prelim injnctn & for perm receiver held on 12-17-03 before KJD. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2013: #2388581 Transcript) (JPQ).
|
February 24, 2004 |
Filing 41
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ex prte app for authorizatn to discontinue business operatns, vacate premises & employ auctioneer to sell property and prepare inventory w/attch'd prop ord obo Receiver Donell. (m (DISPO: ord #86 GRNTD
|
February 24, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT prop ord approving 1st interim app for fees & expnses obo Receiver. to KJD
|
February 23, 2004 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT proposed ordr approving receiver's 60 day reprt to PV
|
February 20, 2004 |
Filing 40
NOTICE (OTHER) Notc of hrng on docs #38 & #39 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
February 20, 2004 |
Filing 39
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Receiver's 60 day report obo Receiver Donell. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (oppo #54) ord #86 GRNTD
|
February 20, 2004 |
Filing 38
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF 1st interim app for approval of Receiver's fees & expnses obo Receiver Donell. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, ord #86 GRNTD
|
February 17, 2004 |
Filing 36
RESPONSE TO MOTION Response to mtn for dir (#29) obo permanent receiver James Donell (m)
|
February 13, 2004 |
Filing 37
RESPONSE TO MOTION Response (faxed cpy) to mtn for dir (#29) obo permanent receiver James Donell (m) (docketed out of order)
|
February 13, 2004 |
Filing 35
NOTICE (OTHER) of appearance obo D/Global Express Capital Real Estate Investmnt Fund I LLC (m)(WITHDRAWN per #53)
|
February 13, 2004 |
Filing 34
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF MOTION to discharge permanent receiver and vacate ordr appointing permanent receiver obo D/Global Express Capital Real Estate Investmnt Fund I LLC (m)(DISPO: oppo #46, oppo #48, dec in oppo #49, no reply fl'd, ord #86 DEN
|
February 12, 2004 |
Filing 33
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Answr & jury demand obo D Reese. (m)
|
February 11, 2004 |
Filing 32
NON-OPPOSITION Non-oppo to mtn to hire professionals, etc #27 obo D Reese. (m)
|
February 4, 2004 |
Filing 31
NON-OPPOSITION Non-oppo to mtn to employ Rein Evans & Sestanovich... #27 obo P. (m)
|
February 2, 2004 |
Filing 30
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ex prte app of Receiver for authorizatn to post certain content on receivership website obo Receiver Donell. (f,m,p) (DISPO: ord #45 GRNTD, see ord #86
|
January 29, 2004 |
Filing 29
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn for direction as to Receiver's demand to disgorge funds obo D Farris. (m) (DISPO: rspnse #36, no reply, ord #86 GRNTD
|
January 26, 2004 |
Filing 28
AMENDED DOCUMENT Amndmnt to mtn to employ general cnsl, etc #27 obo Receiver Donell. (m)
|
January 13, 2004 |
Filing 27
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to employ Rein Evans & Sestanovich LLP, as general cnsl, Kolesar & Leather CHTD as special cnsl, accountants, & Spinelli Corp, computer forensics specialist, effective 12-8-03; Authorizatn to add signatory to Receiversh
|
January 6, 2004 |
Filing 26
DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL Randolph L. Howard named lcl cnsl for pro hac atty Davidson #25 obo Receiver. cps dis
|
January 6, 2004 |
Filing 24
DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL Randolph L. Howard named lcl cnsl for pro hac atty Moldo #23 obo Receiver. cps dis
|
January 5, 2004 |
Filing 25
VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE as to Peter A. Davidson as pro hac cnsl for Receiver. cps dis
|
January 5, 2004 |
Filing 23
VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE as to Byron Moldo as pro hac cnsl for Receiver. cps dis
|
December 30, 2003 |
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT 2 VPs/Desigs of res cnsl obo Receiver. to KJD
|
December 24, 2003 |
Filing 22
WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED obo Receiver James H. Donell.
|
December 24, 2003 |
Filing 21
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Answr obo D Connie Farris. (m)
|
December 19, 2003 |
Filing 20
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Petn to ord Receiver to produce unrelated docs obo Ptnr Rex Farris. (m) (DISPO: no oppo fl'd, ord #126 DENIED as MOOT
|
December 17, 2003 |
Filing 19
ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORD: Prelim injnctn #4 GRNTD (see doc); FUR ORD: An immediate freeze shall be placed on all monies & assets in all accounts held by Ds; FUR ORD: James H. Donell is ppointed as permanent receiver; FUR ORD: Receive
|
December 17, 2003 |
Filing 18
MISCELLANEOUS HEARING (ECRO: Alana Kamaka) re: P's mtn for prelim injnctn & for receiver #4 - ORD: Mr. Donnell is to proceed as quickly as possible to identify & determine funds assets. The Ct encourages cnsl to reach an agreemnt on extn of TRO. *After Co
|
December 17, 2003 |
Filing 17
WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED obo Receiver James H. Donell.
|
December 17, 2003 |
Filing 16
WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED obo Receiver James H. Donell.
|
December 17, 2003 |
Filing 15
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Proof of svc of summs & docs (see doc) on Dawn M. Reese w/svc dated 12-10-03 obo P.
|
December 17, 2003 |
Filing 14
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Proof of svc of summs & docs (see doc) on Connie Farris w/svc dated 12-5-03 obo P.
|
December 16, 2003 |
Filing 13
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION REPLY in supprt of its req for prelim injunctn & ordrs obo P (m)(FILED SEPERATELY DUE TO SIZE)
|
December 16, 2003 |
Filing 10
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF EMERGENCY mtn to intervene obo Intervenor Ps. (m) (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: WITHDRAWN per #45, oppo #47,
|
December 12, 2003 |
Filing 11
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Application to be considered as a receiver obo Paris W. Roberts.
|
December 12, 2003 |
Filing 9
RESPONSE TO MOTION Rspns to mtn for prelim injnctn & for appointmnt of receiver #4 obo A.R. Spilsbury Family Enterprises. (m)
|
December 12, 2003 |
Filing 8
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Objncts to prelim injnctn obo 3rd pty beneficiary Gay. (f)
|
December 12, 2003 |
Filing 7
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Oppo to mtn for prelim injnctn & for appointmnt of receiver #4 obo D Farris. (m)
|
December 11, 2003 |
Filing 12
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Schedule of assets of D Farris obo D Farris. (m)
|
December 4, 2003 |
Filing 6
ORDER ORD: Gov't attys are prmttd to appear per mtn #3. cps dis
|
December 4, 2003 |
Filing 5
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ORD: Ptnr's app for TRO & ords to freeze assets #4 GRNTD. (see doc). The TRO shall expire on 12-17-03 @ 10am unless extnd'd; FUR ORD: Ptys to appear before KJD on 12-17-03 @ 9:30am to show cause why a prelim injnctn should not
|
December 4, 2003 |
Filing 4
MOTION FOR TRO Ex prte app for TRO & ords to freeze assets, appointing a temp receiver, prohibiting destructn of docs, granting expedited disc, for accountings, & to show cause re: prelim injnctn obo Ps. (FLD SEP DUE TO SIZE) (DISPO: ord #5 GRNTD, oppo #7
|
December 4, 2003 |
Filing 3
MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Mtn to permit appearance of Gov't attys obo P. (DISPO: ord #6 GRNTD
|
December 4, 2003 |
Filing 2
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Recommendation by P that James H. Donell be appointed receiver.
|
December 4, 2003 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT Cmplt for violations of the Federal Securities Laws obo P.
|