Blake A. Field VS Google, Inc., Featured Case

Plaintiff Blake A. Field sued defendant Google, Inc. for copyright infringement. Plaintiff posted his copyrighted works on his website and completed an online form to request that Google index his website. Plaintiff now asserts that allowing users to view Google's cache of his copyrighted works infringes on his copyrights.

Plaintiff: Blake A. Field
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2004cv00413
Filed: April 6, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 17:101 et
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2006 Filing 71 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Google against Field. Counterclaims dismissed. Signed by Clerk Lance S Wilson on 2/22/06. (AXM, )
February 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER for Clerk to enter judgment in favor of Google INC for fees and dismiss counterclaims. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/06. (AXM, )
February 14, 2006 Filing 68 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Google, Inc.. [Proposed] Order Directing the Clerk to Enter Judgment in Favor of Google Inc. Re: Attorney's Fees & Dismissing Without Prejudice Google Inc.'s Counterclaims (Kramer, David)
February 13, 2006 Filing 69 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference Regarding Stipulation of the Parties held on 2/13/2006 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: B. J. Price; Pla Counsel: Blake Field, Pro Se; Def Counsel: David Kramer; Court Reporter/FTR #: Lilia Abarca De Carter; Time of Hearing: 10:35 a.m.. The Court informs the parties it will not approve the stipulation for $100,000.00 in attorney's fees. The Court hears the arguments of the parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED attorney's fees are awarded in the amount of $25,000.00. The Court will deny the judgment and counter claims. Counsel is directed to submit an order to the Court. Submission of the proposed order is due by 2/27/2006.(no image attached) (BJP, )
January 30, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 2/13/2006 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (BJP, )
January 30, 2006 Filing 67 NOTICE of Hearing:A hearing is set on the "Stipulation and Proposed Order Directing the Clerk to Enter Judgment in Favor of Google, Inc. Re: Attorney's Fees & Dismissing Without Prejudice Google Inc.'s Counter Claim" (#66) on 2/13/2006 @ 10:00 AM in LV, NV, Courtroom 7D, before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(BJP, )
January 26, 2006 Filing 66 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Directing the Clerk to Enter Judgment in Favor of Google Inc. Re: Attorney's Fees & Dismissing Without Prejudice Google Inc.'s Counterclaims by Defendant Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David)
January 19, 2006 Filing 65 JUDGMENT for Defendant's motion for summary judgment 51 . Signed by Lance S Wilson on 1/19/06. (AXM, )
January 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING : 63 Proposed Order Submission filed by Google, Inc.,, 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google, Inc., Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/12/06. (AXM, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 63 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Google, Inc.. [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law & [Proposed] Order (Kramer, David)
January 5, 2006 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: 61 Motion Hearing, held on 12/19/05 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter: L. Carter. (EDS)
December 20, 2005 Set 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 43 Motion for Summary Judgment: Submission of Proposed Order due by 1/9/2006. (BJP, )
December 19, 2005 Filing 61 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2005 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: B. J. Price; Pla Counsel: Blake A. Field, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Michael Levin, Kelly Evans & David Kramer; Court Reporter/FTR #: Lilia Abarca De Carter; Time of Hearing: 9:14 a.m.. RE: 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google, Inc.,, 43 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Blake A. Field, The Court hears the arguments of Counsel. The Court will grant the motion for summary judgment and also grant a partial summary judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Counsel shall submit to the Court proposed finding and conclusions within three weeks. (no image attached) (BJP, )
November 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael B. Levin for Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/28/05. (AAB)
November 28, 2005 Filing 59 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice submitted by attorney Michael B. Levin, by Defendant Google, Inc. (Fee Paid) (AAB)
November 15, 2005 Filing 57 DECLARATION of William O'callaghan re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendant Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(AXM, )
November 15, 2005 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Bill Brougher re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendant Google, Inc.. (AXM, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Alexander MacGillivray re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendant Google, Inc.. (AXM, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant Google, Inc. re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(AXM, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Dr. John R. Levine re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendant Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(AAB)
November 8, 2005 Filing 53 NOTICE of Hearing on 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment:Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2005 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Robert C. Jones. Oral argument on the motion for summary judgment (#43) will also be heard at that time.(no image attached)(BJP, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 52 DECLARATION re 51 of Wiliam O'Callaghan to MOTION for Summary Judgment; by Defendant Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)(AXM, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Google, Inc.. Responses due by 11/25/2005. (AXM, )
November 1, 2005 Filing 50 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION to mtn for S/J (snt back 10/21/05 see doc #47) obo P (m)
October 31, 2005 Filing 49 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION in supt of mtn for S/J (#43) obo D (m)
October 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ORD mtn for lv to file mtn for S/J rcvd 9/27/05 in excess of 30 pgs is GRANTED for 45 pgs ONLY; mtn is in excess of 45 pgs snt back to D; (see doc). cpys dist.
October 21, 2005 Filing 46 NOTICE OF HEARING O/A on mtn for S/J (#43) sked for 12/19/05 @9a, bfr RCJ. cpys dist.
October 17, 2005 Filing 48 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to mtn for S/J (snt back to D see order #47) rcvd on 9/27/05 obo P (m)
October 10, 2005 Filing 45 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to mtn for S/J (#43) obo D (m)
September 30, 2005 Filing 44 KLINGELE ORDER ORD oppo due 15dys; reply due 11dys; (see doc). cpys dist.
September 27, 2005 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT oversized mtn for S/J obo D. Sent back due to size in excess of 45 pgs see order #
September 23, 2005 Filing 42 MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF for lv to file a S/J brief in excess of 30 pgs obo D (m) (DISPO: GRANTED #47;
August 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that action is reasgn to GWF for all further proceedings as mag judge. (cps dist)
August 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that hrg on Plf's req to take judicial ntc (#32) is vacated. (cps dist)
August 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON STIPULATION Req that the Court vacate oral argument sched for 8/8/05. (cps dist)
August 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON STIPULATION Disp mtns due 9/27/05; jnt pto 11/15/05. (cps dist)
August 4, 2005 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING Rescheduled mtn to take judicial notice of cert. of copyrights #32 for 8/29/05 @ 10:00am. cps dist.
August 1, 2005 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Stip and order modifying sched order. (LRL)
August 1, 2005 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Stip and order re mtn to take judicial ntc. (LRL)
July 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (Amd) that hrg on mtn to take judicial ntc (#32) is sched for 8/8/05 @ 10 am. (cps dist)
July 5, 2005 Filing 35 NOTICE (OTHER) by Dft of non-oppo to mtn (#32). (s)
June 30, 2005 Filing 34 NOTICE OF HEARING O/A on mtn/req to take judicial ntc of cert of copy registration (#32) sked for 10/25/05 @9am bfr RCJ.cpys dist.
June 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ORD: Mtn ext #28 is Denied as moot. cps dist.
June 15, 2005 Filing 32 MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF to take judicial ntc of cpyright registration obo P (m) (FLD SEP) (DIPSO:ntc #34; ntc #35
June 15, 2005 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS updated mailing list obo P (m) (see doc)
June 14, 2005 Filing 30 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION in supt of mtn to ext disc (#28) obo D (m)
June 1, 2005 Filing 29 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to mtn to ext disc (#28) obo P (m)
May 19, 2005 Filing 28 MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF to ext disc obo D (m) (DISPO: oppo #29; reply #30; ORD #33 Denied as moot.
May 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD PTO is GRANTED, (see doc). cpys dist.
May 16, 2005 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip PTO. Sub to LRL.
April 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD ext of time for disc to complete depos to 5/20//05 is GRANTED, (see doc). cpys dist.
April 11, 2005 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip for ext of time for disc to complete depos. Sub to LRL.
January 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ORD DISC due 7/15/05; MTNS due 8/16/05; JTPTO due 9/16/05, (see doc). cpys dist.
December 30, 2004 Filing 24 NOTICE (OTHER) judicial ntc of copyright registration obo P (m)
December 29, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT disc plan/sched ord - LRL
December 14, 2004 Filing 23 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT to cntr claims obo P (m)
December 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ORD stip disc plan/sked ord to be filed nlt 12/29/04. cpys dist.
December 2, 2004 Filing 21 MISCELLANEOUS HEARING dtd 11/15/04 Crt Recorder Lilia Abarca De Carter re mtn to strike (#13) mtn shl be GRANTED, ( see doc). cpys dist.
November 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ORD mtn to strike (#13) is DENIED, ( see doc). cpys dist.
November 18, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT order denying mtn to strike. Sub to RCJ.
October 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD con't O/A on mtn to strike (#13) to 11/15/04 is GRANTED. (see doc) cpys dist.
October 15, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip/order to con't O/A on mtn to strike. Sub to RCJ
September 30, 2004 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING O/A on mtn to strike cntrclaims & portions of Ds answer (#13) set for 10/25/04 @9am bfr RCJ crtrm 7D. cpys dist.
September 21, 2004 Filing 17 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION in supt of mtn to strike (#13) obo P (m)
September 7, 2004 Filing 16 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION to mt to strike (#13) obo D (m)
August 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD ext of time to file oppo to mtn to strike cntrclaims and portions of answer(#13) to 9/06/04 is GRANTED. cpys dist.
August 17, 2004 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES obo P (m) (cpy RCJ/LRL)
August 12, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip for ext of time to file oppo to mtn to strike. Sub to RCJ
July 27, 2004 Filing 13 MOTION TO STRIKE Hrng req to strike Ds cntrclm and portions of Ds answ. obo P. (m) (DISPO:oppo #16; reply #17; GRANTED #20/#21;
July 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON STIPULATION ORD deadline for P to ans/resp to Ds cntrclaim is ext to 7/27/04. cpys dist.
July 7, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip to ext time to file answer to cnterclaim, Sub to LRL
June 29, 2004 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL obo Kelly A. Evans, local cnsl for D. (David H. Kramer) cpys dist.
June 29, 2004 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL obo Kelly A. Evans, local cnsl for D. (William O'Callaghan) cpys dist.
June 25, 2004 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL of David H. Kramer (petnr) as out/state cnsl for D. cpys dist.
June 25, 2004 Filing 8 VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE of William M. O'Callaghan (petnr) as out/state cnsl for D. cpys dist.
June 14, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT vp/design for re William O'Callaghan & David Kramer out/state cnsl obo D. Sub to RCJ
June 14, 2004 Filing 7 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT w/JD obo D (m)
June 14, 2004 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES obo D (m) (cpy RCJ/LRL)
May 25, 2004 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT w/JD obo P
May 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON STIPULATION ORDER deadline for Ds to rspnd to Ps cmplt ext to 6/7/04. cpys dist.
May 20, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip for ext of time to file answr obo D to AK
May 17, 2004 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT stip for ext of time to file answr obo D to AK, returned, all signatures have to be original & signature block shall not be set forth on separate page
May 4, 2004 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to D by serv Michael Kwon on 4/28/04
April 26, 2004 SUMMONS ISSUED to P (1)
April 6, 2004 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT #279 Report on the filing of an actn re a copyright
April 6, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for copyright infringement w/JD obo P

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake A. Field VS Google, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: William O'Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake A. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?