Percy Lavae Bacon v. Stephen C. Webster, et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv01267
Filed: October 20, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 60 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER denying 61 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying 47 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Denying 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 52 Motion to Extend Copy work Limit. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 44 Plaintiff Bacon's Motion for Status Check and 45 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Plaintiff Bacons Motion for an Order to Apply the Equitable Tolling Doctrine and Or Equitable Estoppel Doctrine 27 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint 31 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct 32 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 20 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/28/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying 16 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; Denying 17 Motion for Stipulation to Extend Time; and Denying 18 Motion to Instruct the Clerk to Furnish Plaintiff with Six File-Stamped Copies of Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Percy Lavae Bacon v. Stephen C. Webster, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?