Morgan Stanley High Yield Securities Inc v. Jecklin
Case Number: 2:2005cv01364
Filed: November 15, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 667 Additional JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees Re: 666 Order, Plaintiffs are awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $10,681,887.94, jointly and severally, against Defendants Hans Jecklin, SLG, and JPC. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 4/1/2021 (DRS).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER for Attorney's Fees - Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $10,681,887.94, jointly and severally, against Defendants Hans Jecklin, SLG, and JPC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Main Document 666 replaced on 4/1/2021) (BEL).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 649 The Court enters this ORDER granting in part and denying in part 621 the Motion to Amend/Correct the 614 Judgment. The Court will issue an Amended Judgment; The Court also Grants 622 Motion for Attorney Fees and Plaintiff's are directe d to file a proposed order within 30 days as stated in the Order. The Court Grants in part and Denies in Part the 637 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs Plaintiffs' exemplification and copies cost are re-taxed to $507 and total costs are t axed in the amount of $57,325.16. The Motion is DENIED as to Defendants remaining objections. The Court Grants 640 Motion to Compel and Denies without prejudice, the Motion for Attornes' Fees. It is further ordered, a Status Conference is set for 7/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom by video conference before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 529 Motion to Substitute Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 587 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 604 Motion for Leave of Court to File Notice of Supplemental Authority is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for Plaintiffs against Defendants Hans Jecklin, SLG, and JPC in the full amount of the SDNY judgment, plus post-judgment int erest, costs, and attorneys fees. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants Christiane Jecklin, John Tipton, and George Haeberling. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER re: 599 Motion to Remove Attorney Matthew J. Christian from the Court's docket and the CM/ECF Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 231 , 236 , 239 , and 321 Motions for Summary Judgment as follows: - All fraudulent transfer claims will proceed against the Jecklin Defendants, except for the transfers of $117,757.70 from SCR E on behalf of SCGC to Tipton on March 8, 2002; and of $71,292.73 from SCRE on behalf of SCGC to Tipton on July 16, 2002, which shall be dismissed against the Jecklin Defendants. - All fraudulent transfer claims are dismissed against John Ti pton, except for the transfers of $117,757.70 from SCRE on behalf of SCGC to Tipton on March 8, 2002; and of $71,292.73 from SCRE on behalf of SCGC to Tipton on July 16, 2002, which shall proceed against Defendant John Tipton. - As agre ed by the parties and stated on the record at the hearing on March 30, 2017, all fraudulent transfer claims against Defendant George Haeberling are dismissed. - Theories of alter ego liability shall proceed against all Defendants. - Theories of agency liability shall proceed against Defendants SLG and JPC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER Granting 463 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Exhibit/Witness Lists due by 2/15/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER Granting 460 Stipulation for Extension of Time re: Discovery Deadlines (Second Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER Granting 456 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2018. Exhibit lists and witness lists due by 1/19/2018. Motions in Limine due by 1/26/2018. Responses to Motions in Limine due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER that a hearing shall be conducted on 1/12/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6B before Judge Lloyd D. George on the admissibility of the expert report and testimony of Simon Platt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 232 , 233 , and 234 motions are DENIED without prejudice to their reinstatement by the court upon ruling on the admissibility of the expert report and testimony of Simon Platt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the scheduling of oral arguments on 231 , 236 , 237 , and 239 Motions shall be addressed at the January 2015 hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 231 , 236 , 239 , 321 , and 363 are DENIED without prejudice to their reinstatement by the court following the oral arguments set to be scheduled on those motions. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 377 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically or by Alternative Means. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 371 Defendant's Motion/Request to Appear at the Settlement Conference Telephonically or by Alternate Means and Granting 372 Defendants' Motion/Request to Appear at Settlement Conference Telep honically or be Excused from the Conference. Defendant Haeberling can participate via Skype at the settlement conference on 12/10/2013. Mr. Fooksman may appear telephonically but Mr. Parody must attend with full settlement authority up to the remaining policy limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER that the magistrate judge conduct a settlement conference in this case within the discretion of his calendar. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions ( 231 , 236 , 239 , 321 , and 363 ) in this case are DENIED without prejudice to thei r reinstatement by the court following a report by the magistrate judge that the settlement conference was unsuccessful. FURTHER ORDERED that upon the filing of a report by the magistrate judge that the settlement conference was unsuccessful, THE CLERK OF COURT shall reinstate the motions denied under this order as of the date of the filing of the magistrate judge's report. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER Granting 366 Motion to Vacate the settlement conference set for June 17, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Denying without prejudice, subject to sua sponte reinstatement as appropriate following consideration of the cross-motions at issue in this case, 321 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER Granting, to the Extent set forth in the Order, 255 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 1/10/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER Granting 259 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Scheduling Order is AMENDED to provide Plaintiffs with 90 days from the date of the filing of this order in which to file their motions for summary judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 231 , 232 , 233 , 234 , 236 , 237 , 239 , and 300 Motions pending before the district judge are DENIED without prejudice and subject to their sua sponte reinstatement by the court after plaintiff's motion is ripe for consideration. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 252 Joint Motion for Submission of Documents for In Camera Review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Jecklin Defendants shall submit for in camera review by the Court, the set of 25 documents that the parties have referenced in the Joint Motion as Exhibit 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Jecklin Defendants shall each submit a 4 page brief with exhibits outlining for the Court their position with respect to these 25 documents. The parties will submit the 4 page bri efs simultaneously on or about 3:00 pm PDT on the 2nd day following the date of this Order. The parties will NOT file responses to the 4 page briefs.Upon the simultaneous filing, the parties positions and the 25 page documents will stand as submitted and ready for in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 5/12/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Stanley High Yield Securities Inc v. Jecklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?