Learjet, Inc. v. Oneok, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2006cv00233
Filed: February 27, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (ECF No. 2946) (ECF Nos. as to Base Case 2:03-cv-1431) and the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 2962) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 2959) i s GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Xcel Energy Inc.; Northern States Power Co.; Dynegy Illinois, Inc.; Dynegy GP, Inc.; El Paso Corp.; and Williams Merchant Services Co. are entitled to summary judgment based on release, but DMT GP, LLC is not. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Certify (ECF Nos. 2967, 2968) and the Motion for Suggestion of Remand (ECF No. 2961) are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidated cases are STAYED, and the parties shall notify the Court upon the issuance of the Court of Appeals' rulings in Appeals Nos. 16-17099 and 17-16227. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER that Defendants Joint Renewed Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment 1880 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The ePrime Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Preemption 1884 is GRANTED. Dynegy Inc. and Dynegy Marketing and Trades Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 1891 is GRANTED. ONEOK Energy Services Companys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 1944 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 1383 and Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certi fication 1394 are DENIED as moot. To the extent this Order results in judgment against fewer than all Defendants and/or judgment on fewer than all claims in any of the above actions, the Court directs final judgment be entered on the above-identified claims for the above-identified Defendants, as no just reason for delay exists. The stay imposed by the Order Re: Stay of Certain Proceedings 1942 is hereby lifted. The parties shall file any supplemental briefs regarding the various remaining pendi ng motions for class certification on or before August 18, 2011. Coral Energy Resources, LP, Dynegy Marketing & Trade, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy LP, Oneok Energy Marketing & Trading Company, LP, Oneok, Inc., Reliant Energy Service s, Inc., Williams Companies, Inc., Williams Energy Marketing & Trading Company, Williams Merchant Services Company, Inc., Xcel Energy Inc., e prime Inc., AEP Energy Services, Inc. and American Electric Power Company, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Reliant Energy, Inc., CMS Energy Corporation and Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. are terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 02/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Learjet, Inc. v. Oneok, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?