1st Technology LLC v. Rational Enterprises Ltda. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC alleged that defendants Rational Enterprises Ltda., Rational Poker School Limited, Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com and FutureBet Systems Ltd. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,564,001 entitled "Method and System for Interactively Transmitting Multimedia Information Over a Network Which Requires Reduced Bandwidth."

Plaintiff: 1st Technology LLC
Defendant: Rational Enterprises Ltda., Rational Poker School Limited, Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net and Bodog.com
Case Number: 2:2006cv01110
Filed: September 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re: 213 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/1/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 31, 2009 Filing 213 STIPULATION RE RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND TERMINATION OF ACTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
March 16, 2009 Filing 212 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Last publication date 2-27-2009. (Rath, Luke)
March 16, 2009 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 211 Affidavit : ERROR: Wrong event selected; CORRECTION: Attorney Luke Rath is advised to refile PDF by using the Civil Event Service of Process and "Service by Publication". (no image attached)(MAJ)
March 12, 2009 Filing 211 AFFIDAVIT re 205 Order on Motion,, ; Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Proof of Service by Publication in La Republica Newspaper by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
March 2, 2009 Filing 210 AFFIDAVIT of Publication re 205 Order on Motion,, ; by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rath, Luke)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 208 Stipulation to extend hearing. Show Cause Hearing Reset for 4/17/2009 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
February 25, 2009 Filing 208 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO LR 6-1 [EMERGENCY] by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
February 13, 2009 Filing 207 RESPONSE to 199 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Foley Lardner, Counsel for Defendants/Judgment Debtors Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net, and For Other Relief, filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Replies due by 2/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas In Support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit 1 of de Gyarfas Decl, # 3 Exhibit 2 of de Gyarfas Decl, # 4 Exhibit 3 of de Gyarfas Decl, # 5 Exhibit 4 of de Gyarfas Decl, # 6 Exhibit 5 of de Gyarfas Decl)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
February 13, 2009 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles H McCrea, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 198 Motion for Alternative Service. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1st Technologys service of Foley & Lardner on January 9, 2009, is sufficient alternative service under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1st Technology serve Defendants by publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the March 5, 2009, hearing will occur as scheduled. Defendants corporate officers are ordered to appear at the hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/9/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 4, 2009 Filing 204 REPLY to Response to 198 Emergency MOTION Alternative Service Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Emergency Motion for Order Permitting Alternative Service on Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Rath, Luke)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING 202 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 2/16/2009 re 199 MOTION for Sanctions Against Foley Lardner, Counsel for Defendants/Judgment Debtors Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net, and For Other Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 1/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
January 27, 2009 Filing 202 STIPULATION re 199 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Foley Lardner, Counsel for Defendants/Judgment Debtors Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net, and For Other Relief ; FOR EXTENSION OF TIME--FIRST REQUEST by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
January 22, 2009 Filing 201 RESPONSE to 198 Emergency MOTION Alternative Service Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Emergency Motion for Order Permitting Alternative Service on Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net, filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Replies due by 2/5/2009. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
January 22, 2009 Filing 199 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Foley Lardner, Counsel for Defendants/Judgment Debtors Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net, and For Other Relief by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Responses due by 2/9/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-7, # 3 Exhibit 8-13)(Rath, Luke)
January 20, 2009 Filing 198 Emergency MOTION Alternative Service Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Emergency Motion for Order Permitting Alternative Service on Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8)(Rath, Luke)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING 196 Motion to Extend Time re 190 Order to Show Cause. 1st Technology shall serve the Order to Show Cause 190 on corporate officers for Defendants by 1/22/09. The Show Cause Hearing is reset for 3/5/2009 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 12/30/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
December 22, 2008 Filing 196 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Order to Show Cause on the Officers of Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net Pursuant to LR 6-2 by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Motion ripe 12/22/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Rath, Luke)
December 18, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 195 Affidavit: ERROR: Wrong event selected by Attorney Luke Kristopher Rath ; CORRECTION: Court modified event as WRIT of Garnishment Returned Executed. (no image attached)(RFJ)
December 16, 2008 Filing 195 WRIT of Garnishment Returned Executed as to Bank of America AFFIDAVIT of Service by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke) Event type modified on 12/18/2008. (RFJ).
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER on Mandate as to 184 USCA Judgment re 100 Notice of Appeal, filed by Bodog.com, Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., and Bodog.net; Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/16/08. (ES)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Affirming and Adopting 170 Report and Recommendation for an Order to Show Cause re 142 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/21/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., now known as Data Entry & Domain Management, S.A., Bodog.net, and Bodog.com. (Show Cause Hearing set for 1/22/2009 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt.) (Proof of service due by 12/21/2008.) Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/21/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 17, 2008 Filing 189 WRIT of Garnishment Returned Executed as to Nevada State Bank. (ASB)
November 17, 2008 Filing 188 WRIT of Garnishment Returned Executed as to Bank of America. (ASB) Modified on 11/18/2008 (ASB).
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 176 Memorandum of Attorneys' Fees. Defendant shall pay Plaintiff $8,950.00 for attorney's fees and costs reasonably incurred by Plaintiff regarding its Motion for Sanctions 14 within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 10/21/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 177 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider the Court's 7/29/08 Order and Court's 7/15/08 Order to Identify Defendants' Representatives 177 . The Court's 170 Report and Recommendation is modified by striking that part of the Court's recommendation that Defendants be required to show cause why they should not be held in criminal contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 10/21/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 15, 2008 Filing 184 JUDGMENT of USCA for the Federal Circuit Affirming Judgment of the US District Court re: 100 Notice of Appeal. (ASB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2008: # 1 Duplicate Judgment received on 10/31/08) (ES).
September 12, 2008 Filing 183 REPLY to 179 Objection to Report and Recommendation ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
September 12, 2008 Filing 182 REPLY to Response to 177 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re 169 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re 169 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
August 29, 2008 Filing 181 RESPONSE to 179 OBJECTION filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Opposition to [Doc. #178] Defendants' Objection and Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's July 15, 2008 and July 29, 2008 Orders to Identify Defendants' Representatives Replies due by 9/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Rath, Luke) Modified to add link on 9/2/2008 (MAJ).
August 29, 2008 Filing 180 RESPONSE to 177 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re 169 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re 169 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Replies due by 9/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Rath, Luke)
August 14, 2008 Filing 179 OBJECTION to 170 Report and Recommendation by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Response to Objections to R&R due by 8/30/2008. (MAJ)
August 14, 2008 Filing 178 ERROR: Wrong event selected. OBJECTION (FRCP 72) ti and Ntn for Reconsideration of Ct's 7/29/08 and 7/15/08 Orders to Identify Defts' Rep filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(de Gyarfas, Victor) Modified on 8/15/2008 (MAJ).
August 14, 2008 Filing 177 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re 169 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Responses due by 9/1/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
August 14, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 175 Objection to Document; ERROR: PDF should have been filed as two separate entries; CORRECTION: Attorney Victor de Gyarfas advised to refile PDF as "Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider" and link to 169 Order On Motion to Withdraw. (no image attached)(MAJ)
August 13, 2008 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC re 170 Report and Recommendation,, Terminate Motions,. (Sutehall, Kevin)
August 12, 2008 Filing 175 ERROR: Wrong event selected. OBJECTION to 169 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 170 Report and Recommendation,, Terminate Motions, ; and Request for Reconsideration of Court's 7/29/08 Order and Court's 7/15/08 Order to Identify Defendants' Representatives filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(de Gyarfas, Victor) Modified on 8/15/2008 (MAJ).
August 12, 2008 Filing 174 ERROR: PDF filed in error. MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Motion ripe 8/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rath, Luke) Modified on 8/15/2008 (MAJ).
August 11, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 171 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment; ERROR: Document filed in error: CORRECTION: Attorney Luke Rath advised to file a "Motion for Writ of Garnishment". (no image attached)(MAJ)
August 11, 2008 Filing 173 WRIT OF EXECUTION Issued on August 11, 2008 in favor of 1st Technology LLC and against Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, and Bodog.com in the amount of $51,433,663.22. (ASB)
August 8, 2008 Filing 172 MOTION for Writ of Execution by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Motion ripe 8/8/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Rath, Luke)
August 8, 2008 Filing 171 ERROR: Document filed in error. MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Motion ripe 8/8/2008. (Rath, Luke) Modified on 8/11/2008 (MAJ).
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for an Order to Show Cause re 142 Order. ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 149 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery filed by 1st Technology LLC. (Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2008) Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 7/29/2008. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Granting 147 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney with conditions. Charles H McCrea, Jr. withdrawn from the case. Counsel to transfer all information and documents withing 15 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 7/15/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
June 27, 2008 Filing 168 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Rule 41 Notice of Dismissal of Rational Defendants (Rath, Luke)
June 20, 2008 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 162 Motion Hearing,,,,, held on June 10, 2008, before Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: NW Transcripts, LLC, 208-466-4148. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2008. (VHM)
June 18, 2008 Filing 166 WRIT OF EXECUTION (ES)
June 17, 2008 Filing 165 Supplemental BRIEF filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. 1st Technology LLC's Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Motion for Sanctions (Rath, Luke)
June 17, 2008 Filing 164 SUPPLEMENT to 147 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW by Charles H. McCrea, Jr.. ; BRIEFING PURSUANT TO JUNE 11, 2008 MINUTE ORDER RE MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Defendant Bodog Entertainment Group S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Certificate of Service)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
June 17, 2008 Filing 163 MOTION for Writ of Execution by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Motion ripe 6/17/2008. (Rath, Luke)
June 10, 2008 Filing 162 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions re Discovery 149 held on 6/10/2008 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Luke Kristopher Rath, Kevin Sutehall; Def Counsel: Victor De Gyarfas; FTR #: 1:30:34-1:54:22; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney 147 is also before the Court. The Court hears the representations of Mr. Rath and Mr. De Gyarfas. For the reasons stated, the Court holds defense counsel's 147 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney in abeyance. Within one week, the parties shall file briefs with the Court as to whether the identity of the client representative who instructed defense counsel regarding discovery is privileged and protected under attorney-client privilege. Additionally, within one week, the parties shall file briefs as to whether within the scope of the Court's prior Order to Compel 142 , the Court has the authority to require defense counsel to produce discovery in their possession not withstanding their client's instructions. As stated on the record, the Court does not enter sanctions against the Bodog entities or counsel at this time. The Court will address the contempt issue in its written order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
June 5, 2008 Filing 161 WRIT Returned Executed as to Wells Fargo Bank. (AXM)
June 2, 2008 Filing 160 REPLY to Response to 149 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery and RESPONSE to 156 Opposition to Foley Lardner's "Request for Sanctions Against Counsel for Plaintiffs [sic]"; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Rath, Luke) Modified to add docket relationships on 6/3/2008 (MAJ).
May 30, 2008 Filing 159 REPLY to Response to 147 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW by Charles H. McCrea, Jr.. ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
May 21, 2008 Filing 158 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of 1st Technology LLC and against Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.com, Bodog.net, Rational Enterprises Ltda., and Rational Poker School Limited in the amount of $13,746.00. Signed by Lance S. Wilson on 5/21/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Awarding Attorneys Fees in Favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants in the amount of $13,746.00 re: 146 Memorandum of Attorneys Fees and 154 Supplement to 146 Memorandum of Attorneys Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 5/21/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 20, 2008 Filing 156 RESPONSE to 149 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery, filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Replies due by 6/3/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas, # 2 Exhibit 1 to de Gyarfas decl, # 3 Exhibit 2 to de Gyarfas decl, # 4 Exhibit 3 of de Gyarfas decl, # 5 Exhibit 4 to de Gyarfas decl, # 6 Exhibit 5 of de Gyarfas decl, # 7 Exhibit 6 to de Gyarfas decl, # 8 Exhibit 7 to de Gyarfas decl, # 9 Exhibit 8 to de Gyarfas decl, # 10 Exhibit 9 to de Gyarfas decl)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
May 20, 2008 Filing 155 NOTICE by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office Order Granting Ex Parte Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 5,564,001 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
May 16, 2008 Filing 154 SUPPLEMENT to 146 Memorandum ; of Attorneys' Fees by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Rath, Luke)
May 16, 2008 Filing 153 RESPONSE to 147 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW by Charles H. McCrea, Jr.., filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Replies due by 5/30/2008. (Rath, Luke)
May 14, 2008 Filing 152 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 1st Technology LLC. Rational Enterprises Ltda. served on 4/16/2008, answer due 5/6/2008. (Rath, Luke)
May 9, 2008 Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr, on 5/9/2008. Plaintiff shall provide the Court with an affidavit that itemizes the description of each individual attorney's billing entries supporting the 146 Memorandum of Attorney's Fees. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
May 5, 2008 Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr, on 5/5/2008. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Hill. RE: 149 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery -- Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, June 10, 2008, at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George W Foley Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBH)
May 2, 2008 Filing 149 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Responses due by 5/20/2008. (Sutehall, Kevin)
May 2, 2008 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Victor de Gyarfas re 147 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW by Charles H. McCrea, Jr.. ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. DECLARATION OF VICTOR DE GYARFAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
May 2, 2008 Filing 147 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS TO WITHDRAW by Charles H. McCrea, Jr.. by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Motion ripe 5/2/2008. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
April 22, 2008 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC re 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net. Memorandum of Attorneys' Fees (Rath, Luke)
April 17, 2008 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: 140 Motion Hearing held on 04/04/2008 before Judge George W. Foley, Jr. Court Recorder: FTR. Transcript prepared by NW Transcripts, LLC. (no image attached) (ABC)
April 9, 2008 Filing 144 WRIT OF EXECUTION Issued on 4/9/08 against Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, and Bodog.com. (ASB)
April 9, 2008 Filing 143 MOTION for Writ of Execution by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Motion ripe 4/9/2008. (Rath, Luke)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 4/8/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 7, 2008 Filing 141 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
April 4, 2008 Filing 140 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2008 before Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Luke Roth, Kevin Sutehall; Def Counsel: Victor deGyarfas; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:29:55-9:47:45; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court has reviewed the motion and briefs. Representations of counsel heard. For the reasons stated, the Court ORDERS the Bodog Defendants to provide substantive responses, subject to a general protective order, to Plaintiff's discovery requests within 15 days. The Court awards Plaintiff reasonable fees and costs incurred re: the motion 126 . Plaintiff shall submit an application for fees and costs, defendant shall have an opportunity to respond to the application. Further, Plaintiff shall submit a proposed order to the Court and Bodog's counsel reflecting the Court's ruling on the 126 Motion to Compel. The Bodog defendants shall have 3 days from the date of submission of the proposed order to lodge their objections, if any. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
April 1, 2008 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
March 21, 2008 Filing 138 Summons Issued as to Rational Enterprises Ltda.. (MAJ)
March 21, 2008 Filing 137 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Rational Enterprises, Ltda., filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
March 20, 2008 Filing 136 OBJECTION to 123 Notice (Other) ; Notice of Name Change filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
March 19, 2008 Filing 135 RESPONSE to 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net, filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Replies due by 4/2/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas, # 2 Exhibit A to de Gyarfas decl, # 3 Exhibit B to de Gyarfas decl, # 4 Exhibit C to de Gyarfas decl, # 5 Exhibit D to de Gyarfas decl, # 6 Exhibit E to de Gyarfas decl)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
March 13, 2008 Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr, on 3/13/2008. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Hill. Denying 130 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing. The hearing currently set for April 4, 2008 stands.RE: 130 First MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (1) FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND (2) EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION -- Defendants have until Wednesday, March 19, 2008 to file their Opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBH)
March 12, 2008 Filing 133 RESPONSE to 130 First MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (1) FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND (2) EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITIONFirst MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (1) FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND (2) EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION, filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Replies due by 3/26/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(Rath, Luke)
March 10, 2008 Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr, on 3/10/2008. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Hill. RE: 130 First MOTION (1) FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND (2) EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION Plaintiff has until March 12, 2008 to respond to this motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBH)
March 7, 2008 Filing 131 DECLARATION of Victor De Gyarfas re 130 First MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (1) for continuance of hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and (2) extension of time for Defendants' opposition, 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified text on 3/7/2008 (MAJ).
March 7, 2008 Filing 130 First MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (1) FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND (2) EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Motion ripe 3/7/2008. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER finding as moot 125 Motion Order directing the Clerk of the Court to certify judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 03/04/2008. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Ravitch, Adam)
February 29, 2008 Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr, on 2/29/2008. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Hill. RE: 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net -- Motion Hearing set for Friday, April 4, 2008, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George W Foley Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBH)
February 27, 2008 Filing 127 RESPONSE to 125 MOTION for the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Court to Issue Certified Judgments on Order Shortening Time, filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Replies due by 3/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
February 25, 2008 Filing 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Com, and Bodog.Net by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-8)(Rath, Luke)
February 25, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION for the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Court to Issue Certified Judgments on Order Shortening Time by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rath, Luke)
February 22, 2008 Filing 124 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Fuse TV (Rath, Luke)
February 20, 2008 Filing 123 NOTICE by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com of Name Change (de Gyarfas, Victor)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting 121 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William W. Flachsbart for 1st Technology LLC and Approving Attorney Luke Kristopher Rath for Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 02/06/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
February 5, 2008 Filing 121 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney William W. Flachsbart, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000000790772) by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Motion ripe 2/5/2008. (Rath, Luke)
February 1, 2008 Filing 120 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to DoubleClick Incorporated. (Rath, Luke)
January 22, 2008 Filing 119 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Poker Royalty. (Rath, Luke)
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Denying 96 Motion to Modify the Amount of Default Judgment Entered. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 01/15/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
January 8, 2008 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: 110 Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2007 before Judge George Foley, Jr. FTR Recording. Transcript prepared by NW Transcripts, LLC. (no image attached) (ABC)
December 17, 2007 Filing 116 NOTICE of Docketing re 100 Notice of Appeal. (ASB)
December 17, 2007 Filing 115 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Bank of America. (Rath, Luke)
December 13, 2007 Filing 114 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Ion Media Networks. (Rath, Luke)
December 7, 2007 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to 96 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify the Amount of the Default Judgment Entered ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas# 2 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas# 3 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 30, 2007 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: 95 Motion Hearing held on 11/9/07 before Judge George W. Foley, Jr.. Court Reporter: FTR. Transcript prepared by NW Transcripts. (no image attached) (EDS)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting 89 Motion to vacate order for judgment debtor; Denying Motion 94 for order to show cause to Hold defendants in contempt. Signed by Judge George W Foley Jr. on 11/28/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
November 28, 2007 Filing 110 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2007 before Judge George Foley Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Kevin Sutehall; Def Counsel: Victor DeGyarfas and Charles McCrea; FTR #: 1:23:25-1:47:07; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court has reviewed the briefs. Representations of counsel heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court grants the Bodog Defendants' 89 Amended MOTION to Vacate Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor, and denies Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's 94 Motion for Order to Show Cause to Hold Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com and Their Designated Representative Calvin Ayre in Contempt. A separate written order will issue. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
November 27, 2007 Filing 109 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 108 Response to Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Rath, Luke)
November 27, 2007 Filing 108 RESPONSE to 96 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify the Amount of the Default Judgment Entered ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke) Corrected image added on 11/28/07. (MAJ)
November 21, 2007 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to 94 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Order to Show Cause to Hold Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com and Their Designated Representative Calvin Ayre in Contempt for Failure t ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
November 20, 2007 Filing 106 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 100 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Form# 2 Transcript Order Form)(JAG)
November 19, 2007 Filing 105 OBJECTION to 94 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Order to Show Cause to Hold Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com and Their Designated Representative Calvin Ayre in Contempt for Failure t ; Evidentiary Objections to Pltf's Exhibits filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 19, 2007 Filing 104 RESPONSE to 94 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Order to Show Cause to Hold Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com and Their Designated Representative Calvin Ayre in Contempt for Failure t ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas# 2 Exhibit 1 to de Gyarfas Decl# 3 Exhibit 2 to de Gyarfas decl# 4 Exhibit 3 to de Gyarfas decl# 5 Exhibit 4 to de Gyarfas decl# 6 Exhibit 5 to de Gyarfas decl# 7 Exhibit 6 of de Gyarfas decl)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 16, 2007 Filing 103 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to C. Wayne Baldridge. (Rath, Luke)
November 15, 2007 Filing 101 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Resident Agent of Picks and Plays Incorporated. (Rath, Luke)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge George W Foley Jr. on 11/13/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
November 9, 2007 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 83 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Set Aside,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Vacate,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,, by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 720674. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
November 9, 2007 Filing 99 OBJECTION (Renewed) Evidentiary Objections to Pltf's Ex. 1, S. Lewis Table Purporting to Show Royalties filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 9, 2007 Filing 98 OBJECTION to 97 DECLARATION of Victor de Gyarfas; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor) Docket entry relationship added on 1/10/08. (MJZ)
November 9, 2007 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Victor de Gyarfas re 96 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify the Amount of the Default Judgment Entered ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to de Gyarfas Decl# 2 Exhibit 2 to de Gyarfas Decl# 3 Exhibit 3 to de Gyarfas Decl# 4 Exhibit 4 to de Gyarfas Decl# 5 Exhibit 5 to de Gyarfas Decl# 6 Exhibit 6 to de Gyarfas Decl# 7 Exhibit 7 to de Gyarfas Decl# 8 Exhibit 8 to de Gyarfas Decl# 9 Exhibit 9 to de Gyarfas Decl# 10 Exhibit 10 to de Gyarfas Decl# 11 Exhibit 11 to de Gyarfas Decl# 12 Exhibit 12 to de Gyarfas Decl# 13 Exhibit 13 to de Gyarfas Decl# 14 Exhibit 14 to de Gyarfas Decl# 15 Exhibit 15 to de Gyarfas Decl# 16 Exhibit 16 to de Gyarfas Decl)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 9, 2007 Filing 96 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify the Amount of the Default Judgment Entered by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Responses due by 11/27/2007. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 9, 2007 Filing 95 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing on Defendant's 72 Motion to Quash Subpoena held on 11/9/2007 before Judge George Foley Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Luke Rath; Def Counsel: Victor de Gyafas, Charles McCrea; FTR #: 9:29:57-9:52:11; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court has seen Defendant's 89 Amended MOTION to Vacate Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor, and Plaintiff's 94 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Order to Show Cause to Hold Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com and Their Designated Representative Calvin Ayre in Contempt for Failure. The Court canvasses the parties regarding scheduling a hearing on the Motions (89)(94). A Motion Hearing is set for Wednesday, November 28, 2007, at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause (94) is due by Monday, November 19, 2007; Plaintiff's Reply is due by Friday, November 23, 2007. The Court hears the representations of counsel regarding Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena (72). The Court will issue a written order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
November 8, 2007 Filing 94 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Motion for Order to Show Cause to Hold Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com and Their Designated Representative Calvin Ayre in Contempt for Failure to Appear for Judgment Debtor Examination by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4# 2 Exhibit 5# 3 Exhibit 6-11)(Rath, Luke)
November 8, 2007 Filing 93 OBJECTION to 90 Response to Motion to Vacate, 89 Amended MOTION to Vacate Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor, 91 Reply to Response to Motion ; Defts' Evidentiary Objections to Pltf's Ex. 1 to its Response filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 8, 2007 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 92 Brief: ERROR: Wrong event selected; CORRECTION: Attorney Victor S. de Gyarfas advised to refile document using "Objection to Document" event under the "Other Documents" category. (no image attached)(RFJ)
November 6, 2007 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to 89 Amended MOTION to Vacate Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victor de Gyarfas)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
November 1, 2007 Filing 90 RESPONSE to 89 Amended MOTION to Vacate Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's Opposition to Judgment-Debtors' Renewed and Amended Motion to Vacate Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Rath, Luke)
October 31, 2007 Filing 89 Amended MOTION to Vacate Order for Examination of Judgment Debtor by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl of V. de Gyarfas# 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to de Gyarfas decl# 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to de Gyarfas decl# 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to de Gyarfas Decl# 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to de Gyarfas decl)(de Gyarfas, Victor)
October 22, 2007 Filing 88 NOTICE by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC Notice of Entry of Orders (Rath, Luke)
October 19, 2007 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to 72 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Henderson, Uleses)
October 18, 2007 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: 83 Motion for Permanent Injunction, Motion to Set Aside, Motion to Vacate, Motion Hearing held on 10/11/07 before Judge Roger L. Hunt. Court Reporter and Transcript prepared by Heather Newman. (no image attached) (ABC)
October 18, 2007 Filing 85 PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that James D. Nguyen is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. All documents filed in connection with a case that has been assigned to the CM/ECF system will be filed electronically. Continued failure to abide by the Special Order 109 will be brought to the Courts attention for appropriate action. (no image attached) (RFJ)
October 11, 2007 Filing 84 NOTICE by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC Notice Resetting Judgment Debtor Examination (Rath, Luke)
October 11, 2007 Filing 83 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2007 before Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt. Crtrm Administrator: Kandy Capozzi; Pla Counsel: Luke Kristopher Rath; Kevin Sutchall; Venkat Balasubramani; Def Counsel: Victor de Gyarfas; Charles McCrea; James Nguyen; Court Reporter/FTR #: Heather Newman; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Courtroom: 6C; Arguments are heard. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 36 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment DENIED. Defendants have not shown good cause as required by FRCP 55(c) and 60(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the stay as to 39 , regarding the Judgment Debtor Examination of Calvin Ayre, and as to 35 Motion for Permanent Injunction, is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 35 Motion for Permanent Injunction is DENIED. The Court finds Plaintiff failed to satisfy the requirements for permanent injunctive relief and in the Court's view, is requesting relief beyond this Court's power to grant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 51 Emergency Motion for Permanent Injunction is also DENIED. Plaintiff failed to adequately address the four-prong test that would satisfy the burden to obtain a permanent injunction. Although the Court does not find there is adequate basis for implementing a permanent injunction from this jurisdiction, these Findings do not preclude the Plaintiff from pursuing injunctive relief in Washington, or in any other appropriate place. Neither should this ruling in any way affect the decision or ability of the Washington Court to enter whatever injunction it feels appropriate. Finally, the Court denies the request, improperly raised in the reply to the motion, to transfer the ownership of the defendants' trademarks. Plaintiffs' request for bond is also DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KMC)
October 10, 2007 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Mario Jorge Chaves Salas in support of 36 MOTION to Set Aside DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 77 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Uleses C. Henderson for Bodog Entertainment Group S.A. and Bodog.net and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/10/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 76 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Victor S. de Gyarfas for Bodog Entertainment Group S.A. and Bodog.net and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/10/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 75 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James D. Nguyen for Bodog Entertainment Group S.A. and Bodog.net and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/10/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 9, 2007 Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable George W Foley Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge, on 10/9/2007. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Hill. RE: 72 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena -- Motion Hearing set for FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 9, 2007, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George W Foley Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBH)
October 9, 2007 Filing 77 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Ulesses C. Henderson, Jr., (Filing fee $ 175) by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (AXM)
October 9, 2007 Filing 76 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Victor De Gyarfas, (Filing fee $ 175) by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (AXM)
October 9, 2007 Filing 75 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney James D. Nguyen, (Filing fee $ 175) by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (AXM)
October 8, 2007 Filing 74 RESPONSE to 72 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Rath, Luke)
October 5, 2007 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Subpoena and Declaration of U. Henderson by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com re 72 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 4, 2007 Filing 72 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Declaration # 6 Exhibit)(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 2, 2007 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to 51 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com on an Order Shortening Time, Pursuant to LR 6-1(a)Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com on an Order Shortening Time, Pursuant to LR 6-1(a) ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3# 2 Exhibit 4-5# 3 Exhibit 6-9# 4 Exhibit 10-15# 5 Exhibit 16-17)(Rath, Luke)
October 2, 2007 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY E-MAIL by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 69 OBJECTION DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 1, SCOTT LEWIS TABLE PURPORTING TO SHOW ROYALTIES filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 68 OBJECTION DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 2, FORBES.COM ARTICLE ENTITLED "CATCH ME IF YOU CAN" filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 67 OBJECTION Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to 36 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3, Find Articles.com Articile Entitled "Update: BODOG uses offshore statud to evade U.S. Lawsuit, according to Bluemoon Entertainment" filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 10/23/2007. (MAJ)
October 1, 2007 Filing 66 OBJECTION DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 4(d), STATE OF WASHINGTON GAMBLING COMMISSION'S PRESS RELEASE filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 65 OBJECTION DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 4(d), COPY OF United States v. BETONSPORTS PLC filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 64 DECLARATION of ANA VICTORIA MORA FLORES by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 63 DECLARATION of JAMES D. NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 62 OBJECTION DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO AFFIDAVITS OF MR. McANDREWS AND MR. WALLIN filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
October 1, 2007 Filing 61 RESPONSE to 36 MOTION to Set Aside DEFAULT JUDGMENT, 44 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS BODOG ENTERTAINMENT GROUP S.A. AND ERRONEOUSLY NAMED SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS BODOG.NET AND BODOG.COM TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POI ; filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF Replies due by 10/15/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
September 28, 2007 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 54 , 55 , 56 and 57 for VENKAT BALASUBRAMANI, ESQ., BALASUBRAMANI LAW by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 10/1/2007. (MAJ)
September 28, 2007 Filing 59 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Fuse TV. (Rath, Luke)
September 28, 2007 Filing 58 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to ION Media Networks. (Rath, Luke)
September 27, 2007 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Victor de Gyarfas in support of 55 opposition to 1st Technology LLC's "Emergency Motion for Permanent Imjunction by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit # 25 Exhibit # 26 Exhibit # 27 Exhibit)(McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 10/1/2007. (MAJ)
September 27, 2007 Filing 56 DECLARATION of James D. Nguyen in support of 55 opposition to Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC's "Emergency Motion for Permanent Injunction" by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 10/1/2007. (MAJ)
September 27, 2007 Filing 55 RESPONSE to 35 MOTION for Permanent Injunction on an Order Shortening Time, Pursuant to LR 6-1(a), Oral Argument Requested, 51 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction on an Order Shortening Time, Pursuant to LR 6-1(a); filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Replies due by 10/11/2007. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
September 27, 2007 Filing 54 OBJECTION to 51 Defendants' evidentiary objections to the declaration of Scott W. Lewis dated September 20, 2007 filed by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 10/1/2007. (MAJ)
September 26, 2007 Filing 53 RESPONSE to 36 MOTION to Set Aside DEFAULT JUDGMENT ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. 1st Supplement Replies due by 10/10/2007. (Rath, Luke)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER scheduling 51 Motion for Injunction. Responses due by 9/27/2007. Replies due by 10/2/2007. Motion on 51 Injunction and 36 Set Aside Default; Hearing set for 10/11/2007 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/24/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
September 20, 2007 Filing 51 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com on an Order Shortening Time, Pursuant to LR 6-1(a) by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Responses due by 10/8/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Declaration Scott Lewis)(Rath, Luke)
September 18, 2007 Filing 50 RESPONSE to 36 MOTION to Set Aside DEFAULT JUDGMENT ; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Oral Argument Requested Replies due by 10/2/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4# 2 Exhibit 4a-d# 3 Exhibit 5-6# 4 Exhibit 7-9# 5 Exhibit 10-11# 6 Exhibit 12-13)(Rath, Luke)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 46 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Venkat Balasubramani for 1st Technology LLC and Approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 09/12/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING 43 Emergency MOTION to Vacate THE ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT filed by Bodog.com, Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/10/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
September 11, 2007 Filing 46 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Venkat Balasubramani, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 668612) by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER STAYING 35 MOTION for Permanent Injunction until the Court considers Defendants' 36 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/10/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 10, 2007 Filing 45 DECLARATION of ANA VICTORIA MORA FLORES in support of 44 Amended Motion to set aside by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 9/18/2007. (MAJ)
September 10, 2007 Filing 44 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct of specially appearing Defendants BODOG ENTERTAINMENT GROUP S.A. and erroneously named specially appearing Defendants BODOG.NET and BODOG.COM to set aside default judgment by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Responses due by 9/28/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
September 7, 2007 Filing 43 Emergency MOTION to Vacate THE ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
September 7, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC Notice Of Examination Of Judgment Debtors And Request To Produce Documents At That Time (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rath, Luke)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER for 39 Ex Parte request for Judgment Debtor Examination. 10/4/07 Hutchinson & Steffen LLC, 10080 West Alta Drive, Ste 200, LV NV 89145. Signed by Judge George W Foley Jr. on 9/4/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
September 4, 2007 Filing 40 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 37 Declaration, by Defendant Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified docket text on 9/5/2007. (Jaime, Melissa)
August 31, 2007 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 37 Declaration; ERROR: PDF Document and Docket text do not match; CORRECTION: Attorney Charles McCrea advised to refile Declaration of Diane Tucker by selecting the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. (no image attached)(MAJ)
August 31, 2007 Filing 38 DECLARATION of GERARDO UMANA in support of 36 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgmentby Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 9/4/2007. (Jaime, Melissa)
August 31, 2007 Filing 37 DECLARATION of DIANE E. TUCKER in support of 36 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 9/4/2007, corrected image added on 9/5/07. (Jaime, Melissa)
August 31, 2007 Filing 36 MOTION to Set Aside DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com. Responses due by 9/18/2007. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
June 22, 2007 Filing 35 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com on an Order Shortening Time, Pursuant to LR 6-1(a), Oral Argument Requested by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Responses due by 7/10/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Rath, Luke)
June 15, 2007 Filing 34 NOTICE by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC of Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC and Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com (Rath, Luke)
June 13, 2007 Filing 33 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC and against Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, and Bodog.com. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 6/13/07. (AAB)
June 11, 2007 Filing 32 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 27 MOTION for Default Judgment; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC Against Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.Net, and Bodog.Com and Entry of Default Judgment. (Rath, Luke)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 6/5/07. (AXM)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying 28 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 6/5/07. (AXM)
May 29, 2007 Filing 29 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Matthew G. McAndrews, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 575869) by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
May 29, 2007 Filing 28 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Robert A. Conley, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 575850) by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
March 21, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Rath, Luke)
February 28, 2007 Filing 26 NOTICE by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC of Entry of Default of Defendants Bodog Entertainment Group, S.A., Bodog.Net and Bodog.Com (Rath, Luke)
February 26, 2007 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bodog.com, Bodog.net, and Bodog Entertainment Group S.A. re 22 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Defendant Bodog.Com, 23 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Defendant Bodog.Net, and 24 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Defendant Bodog Entertainment Group S.A.. (AAB)
February 23, 2007 Filing 24 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Defendant Bodog Entertainment Group S.A. by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Rath, Luke)
February 23, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Defendant Bodog.Net by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Rath, Luke)
February 23, 2007 Filing 22 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Defendant Bodog.Com by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Rath, Luke)
February 21, 2007 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC, Defendant Rational Enterprises Ltda. as to Rational Enterprises Ltda.. (Rath, Luke)
February 21, 2007 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC, Defendant Bodog.net. Bodog.net served on 11/23/2006, answer due 12/13/2006. (Rath, Luke)
February 21, 2007 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC, Defendant Bodog.com. Bodog.com served on 11/23/2006, answer due 12/13/2006. (Rath, Luke)
February 21, 2007 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC, Defendant Bodog Entertainment Group S.A.. Bodog Entertainment Group S.A. served on 11/23/2006, answer due 12/13/2006. (Rath, Luke)
February 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Rational Poker's Motion for More Definite Statement 8 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/20/07. (GEW)
February 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Plaintiff has not presented this Court with any supporting motion/memorandum that justifies issuance of such requests re 10 , 11 , 12 Motions for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. The Court directs Plaintiff to FRCP 4(f). Thus, at this time, the Court DECLINES to issue plaintiff's proposed Requests for International Judicial Assistance. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/20/07. (GEW)
January 19, 2007 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Against Defendant FutureBet Systems Ltd. Only (Rath, Luke)
January 12, 2007 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement; filed by Defendant Rational Poker School Limited. Rational Poker School's Reply in Support of its Motion for More Definite Statement (Gordon, Andrew)
December 29, 2006 Filing 13 RESPONSE to 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement; filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Replies due by 1/12/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(Rath, Luke)
December 22, 2006 Filing 12 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
December 22, 2006 Filing 11 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
December 22, 2006 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
December 21, 2006 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC, Defendant Rational Poker School Limited. Rational Poker School Limited served on 10/25/2006, answer due 11/14/2006. (Rath, Luke)
December 14, 2006 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Rational Poker School Limited. Responses due by 1/1/2007. (Gordon, Andrew)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON STIPULATION re 6 Stipulation for time to file responsive pleading. Signed by Judge George W Foley Jr. on 11/16/06. (AXM)
November 14, 2006 Filing 6 STIPULATION and Order for extension to file answer or other responsive pleading by Defendant Rational Poker School Limited. (GEW)
November 14, 2006 Filing 5 ERROR: Wrong event selected. Attorney notified by QAX email. Redocketed by Court. Modified on 11/15/2006 (GEW).
September 15, 2006 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1-1 by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
September 8, 2006 Filing 3 AO 120 Trademark & Patent Form. (AAB)
September 8, 2006 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Rational Enterprises Ltda., Rational Poker School Limited, Bodog Entertainment Group S.A., Bodog.net, Bodog.com, Futurebet Systems Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2# 2 Summons 3# 3 Summons 4# 4 Summons 5# 5 Summons 6)(GEW)
September 8, 2006 Case assigned to Judge Roger L. Hunt and George W Foley, Jr. (GEW)
September 7, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 335762), filed by 1st Technology LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/17/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Summons Rational Enterprises Ltda# 3 Summons Rational Poker School Limited# 4 Summons Bodog Entertainment Group S.A.# 5 Summons Bodog.net# 6 Summons Bodog.com# 7 Summons Futurebet Systems ltd.)(Rath, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1st Technology LLC v. Rational Enterprises Ltda. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1st Technology LLC
Represented By: Luke Kristopher Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rational Enterprises Ltda.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rational Poker School Limited
Represented By: Andrew P Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodog Entertainment Group S.A.
Represented By: Victor S. de Gyarfas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodog.net
Represented By: Victor S. de Gyarfas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodog.com
Represented By: Victor S. de Gyarfas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?