Federal Trade Commission v. Ewing et al
Plaintiff: |
Federal Trade Commission |
Defendant: |
Crystal A. Ewing, David F. Ewing, Consumer Direct Enterprises LLC, Top Choice, Inc., Classic Productions LLC and Response Processing LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2007cv00479 |
Filed: |
April 11, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
County: |
Clark |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
George W Foley |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip M. Pro |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
45
CONSENT JUDGMENT, Final Judgment, Order for Compensatory Contempt Relief, and Modified Order For Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief as to Crystal Ewing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
39
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Admit Consumer Complaints. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing
30
ORDER that the Court will treat 27 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Reply to Defendants Objection to the Admission of Consumer Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 807 as a motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Crystal Ewing shall file any response she deems necessary on or before October 1, 2014.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission shall file any reply it deems necessary on or before October 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing. Motion Hearing reset for 10/20/2014 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Philip M. Pro re 11 MOTION Finding of Contempt and Coercive Sanctions Against Crystal Ewing< /i> filed by Federal Trade Commission. Deadline for the FTCs supplemental submission in support of compensatory relief July 30, 2014. Deadline for the Defendants response to the FTCs submissions August 20, 2014. Deadline for the FTCs reply September 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney Alejandro Rosenberg and Korin Ewing Felix for Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?