Bacon v. Skolinik et al
Petitioner: Percy Lavae Bacon
Respondent: Howard Skolinik and The Attorney General Of The State Of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2007cv00821
Filed: June 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that, within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this order, respondents' counsel shall file a notice in the record that a referral has been made to correctional authorities for consideration of possible forfeiture of sentence credits under N.R.S. 209.451(1)(d)(1) and/or the finding of institutional disciplinary major violation MJ48 under the state correctional administrative regulations. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall be designated as a Restricted Filer on the docket s heet for this action and that the Clerk shall accept no further filings in this matter from petitioner other than a notice of appeal from the Court's March 31, 2014, order 145 and/or this sanctions order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that all of petitioner's motions 121 , 124 , 129 , 133 , 140 , and 141 to reopen this matter, including the vexatious repetitive motions, are DENIED. All of petitioner's motions 120 , 126 , 128 , and 132 seeking appointme nt of counsel, including the vexatious repetitive motions, are DENIED. Petitioner's motion 143 for leave to file a judicial notice is DENIED. Petitioner's first motion 125 to raise his copy credit limit is GRANTED in part. Petitioner� 39;s second motion 130 to raise his copy credit limit is DENIED as repetitive and vexatious. Within 30 days of entry of this order, petitioner shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why, due to the circumstances outlined at pages 5-6 of this order, sanctions should not be ordered.FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent that a certificate of appealability is required in this context, a certificate of appealability is DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order is not taken in good faith. Petitioner's frivolous effort to reopen this matter follows upon a denial by the Ninth Circuit of an application to file a second or successive petition in No. 11-80155 that was based upon the same case authority. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NDOC Chief of Inmate Services - MMM)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Denying 109 Motion. A certificate of appealability also is DENIED as to any appeal as to this frivolous filing. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying 107 Motion Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/4/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Denying 103 Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Denying 83 Motion for Certificate of Appealability re 82 Notice of Appeal, and Striking 86 Petitioner's supplement. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 05/22/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is Denied on the merits and this action shall be Dismissed with prejudice. Petitioner's 75 Motion for Immediate Relief is Denied. The Clerk shall enter Final Judgment in favor of Respondents and against Petitioner. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 01/26/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 14 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Granting 22 Motion for Hearing; Denying as MOOT 21 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Clerk to clearly note the disposition of the Motion in entry and forward supplement al transmittal to Court of Appeals. Granting 23 Motion for Leave to File; and the clerk to file amended petition. Denying 24 Motion to limit. Case reopened. Clerk to serve respondents by certified mail to AG, Criminal Division. Clerk to return a copy of amended petition to petitioner. Respondents have 45 days to answer. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/9/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)Cert Mail #70051820000655067956
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Skolinik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Howard Skolinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General Of The State Of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Percy Lavae Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?