Chase Bank USA, N.A. v. NAES, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Chase Bank USA, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Michael Fitzpatrick and NAES, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2007cv00975 |
Filed: |
July 23, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
County: |
Clark |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
George W Foley |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward C. Reed |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 23, 2010 |
Filing
155
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Chase Bank USA, N.A. against NAES, Inc., Stellar Services Group, Michael Fitzpatrick, and Theresa Lynn Matson in the amount of $3,499,835.21. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 8/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing
145
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 7/15/2010. The Motion for Summary Judgment 139 ), filed by Plaintiff on 5/19/10, is GRANTED with respect to Defendant Michael Fitzpatrick. Plaintiff shall have 14 days within w hich to file a motion for default judgment with respect to those defendants against whom default has been entered by the Clerk, and to indicate to the Court whether Plaintiff intends to further prosecute this action with respect to Mr. Robinson. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing
142
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 5/28/2010. On 5/4/10, the Magistrate Judge filed an Order 138 granting Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Request for Sanctions 121 and recommendi ng Defendant Stellar Service Groups Answer 128 to the First Amended Complaint 64 be stricken and that default be entered. No objections have been timely filed and no timely appeal taken from the Magistrate Judges Order 138 . Magistrate Judges Re port and Recommendation 138 is APPROVED and ADOPTED. Defendant Stellar Service Groups Answer 128 to the First Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. Clerk shall enter a default against Defendant Stellar Service Group. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing
114
ORDER Denying 80 Motion to Dismiss. Granting in part and Denying in part 103 Motion for Hearing. Denying 81 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 1/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?