Heartland Regional Medical Center et al v. Oneok, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heartland Regional Medical Center and Prime Tanning Corporation
Defendant: Oneok, Inc., Oneok Energy Marketing & Trading Company, LP, Kansas Gas Marketing Company, Williams Companies, Inc., Williams Merchant Services Company, Inc., Williams Energy Marketing & Trading Company, American Electric Power Company, Inc., AEP Energy Services, Inc., Duke Energy Corporation, Duke Energy Trading & Marketing, LLC, Dynegy Marketing & Trade, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy Company, CMS Energy Corporation, CMS Marketing Services & Trading Company, CMS Field Services, Center Point Energy, Inc., Reliant Energy, Inc., Reliant Energy Services, Inc., Coral Energy Resources, LP, Xcel Energy Inc. and e prime Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00987
Filed: July 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (ECF No. 2946) (ECF Nos. as to Base Case 2:03-cv-1431) and the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 2962) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 2959) i s GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Xcel Energy Inc.; Northern States Power Co.; Dynegy Illinois, Inc.; Dynegy GP, Inc.; El Paso Corp.; and Williams Merchant Services Co. are entitled to summary judgment based on release, but DMT GP, LLC is not. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Certify (ECF Nos. 2967, 2968) and the Motion for Suggestion of Remand (ECF No. 2961) are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidated cases are STAYED, and the parties shall notify the Court upon the issuance of the Court of Appeals' rulings in Appeals Nos. 16-17099 and 17-16227. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that Defendants Joint Renewed Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment 1880 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The ePrime Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Preemption 1884 is GRANTED. Dynegy Inc. and Dynegy Marketing and Trades Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 1891 is GRANTED. ONEOK Energy Services Companys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 1944 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 1383 and Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certi fication 1394 are DENIED as moot. To the extent this Order results in judgment against fewer than all Defendants and/or judgment on fewer than all claims in any of the above actions, the Court directs final judgment be entered on the above-identified claims for the above-identified Defendants, as no just reason for delay exists. The stay imposed by the Order Re: Stay of Certain Proceedings 1942 is hereby lifted. The parties shall file any supplemental briefs regarding the various remaining pendi ng motions for class certification on or before August 18, 2011. Coral Energy Resources, LP, Duke Energy Trading & Marketing, LLC, Dynegy Marketing & Trade, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy Company, Oneok Energy Marketing & Trading Compa ny, LP, Oneok, Inc., Reliant Energy Services, Inc., Williams Companies, Inc., Williams Energy Marketing & Trading Company, Williams Merchant Services Company, Inc., Xcel Energy Inc., e prime Inc., CMS Field Services and CMS Marketing Services & Trading Company terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Duke Energy Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 02/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartland Regional Medical Center et al v. Oneok, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Regional Medical Center
Represented By: R. Lawrence Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Tanning Corporation
Represented By: R. Lawrence Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneok, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneok Energy Marketing & Trading Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Gas Marketing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Merchant Services Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Energy Marketing & Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEP Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Trading & Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Jerome T. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Marketing & Trade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Marketing Services & Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Field Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center Point Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Energy Resources, LP
Represented By: Lori Renee Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcel Energy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: e prime Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?