Securities and Exchange Commission v. Earthly Mineral Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Earthly Mineral Solutions, Inc., Natural Minerals Processing Company, Roy D Higgs, Frank L Schwartz and Rick Lawton
Case Number: 2:2007cv01057
Filed: August 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Vacating calendar call set for 4/6/2011 and trial set for 4/11/2011. Status Conference set for 4/28/2011 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that plaintiff Securities Exchange Commissions motion for summary judgment against defendant Roy D. Higgs 112 is GRANTED in part. SECs prayer for a permanent injunction prohibiting future violations of referenced sections is GRANTED. SECs p rayer for disgorgement in the amount of $20 million, together with prejudgment interest, is GRANTED against defendant Roy D. Higgs. Due to the inability of the court to calculate an award of civil penalties, the SECs prayer for civil penalties is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CONSENT JUDGMENT of Permanent injunction and other relief in favor of Plaintiff, Securities and Exchange Commission against Defendant Rick Lawton. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED. This Courts Scheduling Order 66 is modified and amended to extend the Last Day for Filing Dispositive Motions to February 4, 2011. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying 103 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order dated 9/24/10 Granting Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Rick Lawton's suggestion of bankruptcy 105 does not constitute a stay of the present case, and that defendant's request for stay be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting in part 94 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the plaintiffs prayer for a permanent injunctionprohibiting future violations of the above referenced sections be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs prayer for disgorgement in the amount of $20 million, together with prejudgment interest be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED against defendants Earthly Mineral Solutions Inc. and Natural Minerals Processing Co mpany, jointly and severally.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that due to the inability of the court to calculate an award of civil penalties, that the plaintiffs prayer for civil penalties be, and the same hereby is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/24/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt, on 7/30/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Carol DePino. 75 Motion for Copy of the Local Rules is Granted to the following extent: The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of only Parts II and V of the Local Rules of Practice of the United States District Court, District of Nevada. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Copy of Parts II and V of the Local Rules to Defendant - ASB)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 70 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default as to Earthly Mineral Solutions, Inc., Natural Minerals Processing Company. Denying as moot 62 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Earthly Mineral Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Morgan B Ward Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthly Mineral Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Minerals Processing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy D Higgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank L Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?