Jones v. Neven et al
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Jones
Defendant: Mr. Baca, Loeman Church, Greg Cox, Lorena Flores, Duane Graham, Steven MacArthur, Lashawn Miller, Cole Morrow, Dwight Neven, F. Schlottman and William Venneman
Case Number: 2:2007cv01088
Filed: August 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 318 plaintiff's motion for change of venue be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Denying 304 Plaintiff Christopher A. Jones's Motion to Review Costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER Granting 238 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 244 Motion for Summary Judgment and 284 Motion to Strike. The clerk of court shall enter final judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER that pro se plaintiff Christopher A. Jones motion to exceed the page limit 281 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion for order 278 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER Denying 262 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Denying 248 Motion to Exclude Evidence, Granting in Part and Denying in Part 250 Motion to Extend Time and for New Copies of Docket Entries, and Granting 249 and 260 Motions for Extension of Time, and Denying as Moot 272 Motion for Leave to File a Late Reply. 238 MOTION for Summary Judgment Deadlines: Responses due by 4/16/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Granting 269 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to 262 Motion to Strike. Replies due by 3/26/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Granting 264 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 262 Motion to Strike. Responses due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER Granting 251 Motion for Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall detach the exhibit from 251 Motion and enter it separately as exhibit 29 to 244 Motion for Summary Judgment which was filed on 12/16/11. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Granting 252 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/19/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Granting 240 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall have until 12/20/11 to file any Dispositive Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Denying as Moot 234 Motion for Exhibit Stickers. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Granting 227 Motion for Court to Issue an Order Setting a New Dispositive/Summary Judgment Schedule. Motions due by 12/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER that plaintiff Christopher A. Jones motion for district judge to reconsider magistrate judges order 224 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Denying as moot 211 Motion for Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 9/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Denying as Moot 210 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Denying as Moot 211 Motion for Orders, and Denying 212 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Denying 188 Motion for Sanctions, Granting in Part and Denying in Part 189 Motion to Determine Sufficiency of Answers and to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted, and Granting 191 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Granting 204 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to 190 Statement of Additional Discovery. (Reply due by 8/29/2011.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/24/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 199 Motion to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 8/4/2011 re 188 MOTION for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER that findings and recommendations of Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr 181 regarding the plaintiffs motion to modify scheduling order 179 are AFFIRMED in their entirety. Plaintiffs motion to modify scheduling order 179 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Denying 186 Motion for Order Requiring the Clerk to Cease Artificially Inflating Response Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 7/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time 183 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall until 7/15/11 to file the Statement of Additional Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Denying 136 Motion for Order to Show Cause, Denying 138 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Order, Denying 146 Motion for Sanctions, Denying without Prejudice 153 Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Denials and Answers and/or Deem Admissions Admitted, Denying without Prejudice 163 Motion to Compel, and Denying as Moot 169 Emergency Motion to Require the Presence of Marc A. Fox. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Granting 139 Motion to Unseal 52 Exhibit. The Court will file an unsealed copy of the medical records attached to Defendants motion to dismiss (# 52 ) with Plaintiffs date of birth and social security number redacted. The Court will also send a copy of the unsealed records to Plaintiff for Plaintiff to keep in his cell. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting 167 Motion to File a Late Reply. Clerk shall file Reply to Response to the Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Granting in Part 133 MOTION to Compel and Setting Hearing on 133 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2011 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting 129 Supplement to Motion to Compel. The Nevada Department of Corrections and Ely State Prison officials shall allow Plaintiff to keep his personal medical records, including the medical records attached to Defendants motion to dismiss (# 52 ), in his possession in his prison cell. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER for the Filing of Objections or Joinder to 42 Proposed Pretrial Order by 3/25/2011. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 3/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 119 Motion to Compel. Supplement due by 3/9/2011. Discovery due by 6/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting 114 Motion to attach the supplemental exhibits to the amended complaint and file the amended complaint and exhibits as one document in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER that Plaintiff Christopher A. Jones Motion To Depose an Incarcerated Person and Motion for an Order 112 is granted. Plaintiff shall make arrangements with prison officials to determine a date and time in the near future when the deposition m ay take place. In the event that Plaintiff and Mr. Wardell are not housed in the same prison, the deposition may be taken telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification 115 is granted to the extent that Plaintiff requests a status conference. The parties shall appear for a status conference on Wednesday, March 2, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3A before the unders igned magistrate judge. The Attorney General shall make arrangements for Plaintiff to be available telephonically for this hearing and shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (702) 464-5418 two (2) days prior to this hearing to advise the Court of the telephone number where the plaintiff may be reached the day of the hearing. The plaintiff shall be available (10) minutes prior to the hearing so the Courtroom Deputy may initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Clarification of Scheduling Order 104 . See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Denying 102 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 97 Motion to Order Defendants to file an Answer to the Complaint. Defendants' Answers 1/4/2011. Discovery due by 3/15/2011. Motions due by 4/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Denying 95 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/17/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Baca
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loeman Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorena Flores
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Graham
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven MacArthur
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashawn Miller
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Morrow
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Schlottman
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Venneman
Represented By: A Wayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?