Moxley v. Neven et al
Petitioner: |
John Tole Moxley |
Respondent: |
Neven and The Attorney General Of The State Of Nevada |
Case Number: |
2:2007cv01123 |
Filed: |
August 22, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
County: |
Clark |
Presiding Judge: |
George W Foley |
Presiding Judge: |
Roger L. Hunt |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER that the petition shall be DENIED on the merits and that this action shall be DISMISSED with prejudice. Certificate of appealability is DENIED. Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment accordingly in favor of respondents and against petitioner, dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
64
ORDER that petitioner's motion 62 is GRANTED such that Ground 2 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 9/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
August 15, 2011 |
Filing
61
ORDER Denying 54 Motion to Stay. Petitioner shall have 14 days to file a motion either for dismissal without prejudice of the entire petition, for partial dismissal only of the unexhausted claims, and/or for other appropriate relief. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/15/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
58
ORDER Denying 57 Motion to Extend Time.Respondents shall have until 12:00 noon on 8/8/2011 to file an opposition to 54 Motion to stay. Petitioner shall have until 12:00 noon on 8/12/2011 to file a reply. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 27, 2011 |
Filing
53
ORDER that petitioner shall have 21 days to file a motion for dismissal without prejudice or the entire petition for partial dismissal. Within 28 days of this order, petitioner shall file supplemental exhibits. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 6/27/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Dismiss Ground 7 without Prejudice. Answer due 8/20/2010. Replies due by 9/20/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 7/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing
47
ORDER Denying 43 Motion for a Stay and Abeyance Order. Motion to Dismiss or for Other Appropriate Relief due by 6/24/2010. Requests for extension of time will not be entertained absent the most compelling circumstances, such as counsel being on health-related leave. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 6/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing
42
ORDER Dismissing Grounds Sua Sponte. Motion to Dismiss due by 5/13/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/12/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?