Rainero v. Archon Corporation
Plaintiff: David Rainero
Defendant: Archon Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv01553
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that 46 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Vacating 42 Order on Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Defendant shall have until 12/2/10, in which to depose the named Plaintiff in this action. Plaintiff shall have until 12/6/10, in which to file a motion for class certification. A status and scheduling conference is set for 12/16/10, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall have until 12/14/10 at 4:00 p.m. in which to file a Joint Status Report addressing any scheduling issues or additional discovery required to complete briefing and decision on Plaintiffs motion for class certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainero v. Archon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rainero
Represented By: Steven J. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?